Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Michael H Watson
Referred: Chelsey M Vascura
Case #: 2:24-cv-03999
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Oct 01, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 6:04 AM EDT
Defendant
Asset Security Consulting
Northwest Registered Agent, LLC 401 Ryland St. Suite 200 - A
Reno, NV 89502
Represented By
Adam Mark Runkle
Starkey & Runkle, LLC
contact info
Ronald K Starkey
Starkey & Runkle, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Kasey Henley
2340 Tampa Ave Suite H
El Cajon, CA 92020
Represented By
Adam Mark Runkle
Starkey & Runkle, LLC
contact info
Ronald K Starkey
Starkey & Runkle, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Yousif Khoury
2340 Tampa Ave Suite H
El Cajon, CA 92020
Represented By
Adam Mark Runkle
Starkey & Runkle, LLC
contact info
Ronald K Starkey
Starkey & Runkle, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Angela J Loescher
Hrabcak and Company 67 E. Wilson Bridge Rd. Suite 100
Worthington, OH 43085
Represented By
Michael Hrabcak
Hrabcak & Company, L.P.A.
contact info
Gregory Adam Wetzel
Hrabcak & Company, L.P.A.
contact info
Bryan Robert Stafford
Hrabcak &company, Lpa
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
29 29 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Tue 04/22 1:49 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part28 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 4/22/2025. (jk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
28 28 motion Amend/Correct Tue 04/15 4:10 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Schedule Pending Mediation by Plaintiff Angela J Loescher. (Stafford, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
med Notice Designating Mediator Tue 04/01 9:39 AM
NOTICE DESIGNATING MEDIATOR: Peter K Newman assigned as mediator to this case. Within 14 days, the mediator and parties will confer to set a date, time, and location for mediation in May 2025, or within 60 days of this notice . The mediator will then file a Notice Setting Mediation. (kk2)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
27 27 notice Notice Determining Readiness of Mediation (Columbus) Fri 03/21 11:13 AM
NOTICE: Counsel shall confer and notify the Court at[LINK:ADR@ohsd.uscourts.gov] within 10 days if this case should NOT proceed with mediation in May 2025 . If the case should not proceed, counsel shall indicate whether the case should be continued to another month and, if so, which one. Deadline for notifying the court is 4:00pm EST on 3/31/2025 . (kk2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
26 26 notice Notice Determining Readiness of Mediation (Columbus) Wed 02/19 11:41 AM
NOTICE: Counsel shall confer and notify the Court at[LINK:ADR@ohsd.uscourts.gov] within 10 days if this case should NOT proceed with mediation in April 2025 . If the case should not proceed, counsel shall indicate whether the case should be continued to another month and, if so, which one. Deadline for notifying the court is 4:00pm EST on 3/3/2025 . (kk2)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
25 25 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement - 7.1(a)(2) Mon 12/09 2:37 PM
Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement by Defendant Asset Security Consulting. (Starkey, Ronald)
Related: [-]
24 24 2 pgs order Order Mon 12/09 11:28 AM
ORDER - ASC is ORDERED to file a disclosure statement that identifies each of its members and their citizenships-tracing through however many layers of partners or members there may be-WITHIN SEVEN DAYS of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 12/9/2024. (mve)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
23 23 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement - 7.1(a)(2) Fri 12/06 11:16 AM
Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement by Defendant Asset Security Consulting. (Starkey, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
22 22 3 pgs order Order Thu 12/05 4:12 PM
ORDER - Defendant is therefore ORDERED to file the required disclosure statements within SEVEN DAYS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 12/5/2024. (mas)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
21 21 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 11/25 3:05 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter) filed by Defendants Asset Security Consulting, Yousif Khoury, Kasey Henley. (Starkey, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
20 20 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 11/18 6:54 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter) filed by Plaintiff Angela J Loescher. (Stafford, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Thu 11/14 4:00 PM
NOTICE by Defendant Asset Security Consulting Filing Hearing Transcript (Starkey, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Hearing Transcript
18 18 order Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order Thu 11/14 3:10 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: The November 19, 2024, preliminary pretrial conference is VACATED. Joinder of Parties and Motions to Amend due by 2/1/2025. Initial Disclosures due by 12/15/2024. Discovery due by 7/29/2025. Dispositive motions due by 9/11/2025. Primary Expert due by 4/8/2025. Rebuttal Expert due by 5/8/2025. Settlement Demand due by 12/10/2024. Response to Settlement Demand due by 12/27/2024. Mediation Deadline: 4/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 11/14/2024. (mas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
17 17 misc Rule 26(f) Report Tue 11/12 5:48 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Angela J Loescher, Defendants Asset Security Consulting, Yousif Khoury, Kasey Henley. (Wetzel, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/11 9:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Mark Runkle for Defendants Asset Security Consulting, Yousif Khoury, Kasey Henley (Runkle, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 11/04 2:50 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 11/19/2024 11:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
14 14 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 10/28 2:30 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Asset Security Consulting. (Starkey, Ronald)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 10/28 2:22 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter) by Defendants Asset Security Consulting, Yousif Khoury, Kasey Henley. (Starkey, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Ronald K Starkey
Monday, October 14, 2024
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 10/14 3:56 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Asset Security Consulting. Asset Security Consulting served on 10/14/2024, answer due 11/4/2024. (Wetzel, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Signature Page
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 10/14 3:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Kasey Henley. Kasey Henley served on 10/7/2024, answer due 10/28/2024. (Wetzel, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Signature Page
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 10/14 3:52 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Yousif Khoury. Yousif Khoury served on 10/7/2024, answer due 10/28/2024. (Wetzel, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Signature Page
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued Wed 10/09 2:19 PM
Alias Summons Issued as to Asset Security Consulting. (mas)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 10/09 12:44 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Wetzel, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued Thu 10/03 11:11 AM
Summons Issued as to Kasey Henley. (mas)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 10/03 9:40 AM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Wetzel, Gregory)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 10/03 9:38 AM
Summons Issued as to Asset Security Consulting, Yousif Khoury. (mas)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 10/03 9:21 AM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Wetzel, Gregory)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 10/03 9:19 AM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Wetzel, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 10/02 5:22 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Wetzel, Gregory)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/02 10:16 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by Angela J Loescher. (Wetzel, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
misc Filing Fee Received Wed 10/02 10:10 AM
Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number AOHSDC-10188345 (kk2)
Related: [-]