Maryland District Court
Judge:Adam B Abelson
Case #: 1:24-cv-02832
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Oct 01, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 5:31 AM EDT
Defendant
Robin Shusko
Represented By
Elizabeth S Skilling
Harman Claytor Corrigan & Wellman
contact info
Defendant
Kirk Henneberry
Represented By
Kevin Bock Karpinski
Karpinski, Cornbrooks & Karp, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Kevin Poole
Represented By
Elizabeth S Skilling
Harman Claytor Corrigan & Wellman
contact info
Plaintiff
Shaun Porter
6583 Edgewood Rd
New Market, MD 21774


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, February 17, 2025
20 20 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 02/17 11:19 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re12 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment ,19 MOTION for Leave to File Out of Time Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Kirk Henneberry's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Kirk Henneberry.(Karpinski, Kevin)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Leave to File Document Mon 02/17 11:01 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Out of Time by Kirk Henneberry(Karpinski, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, February 03, 2025
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Mon 02/03 1:28 PM
NOTICE by Kirk Henneberry re12 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Filing Tangible Item (Karpinski, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 01/30 10:20 AM
ORDER granting13 Defendant's Motion to Permit Filing of Video Recordings as Exhibits; directing that parties shall confer and file a joint status report that is responsive to the requests in the Court's letter order, ECF No.10 , no later than 2/7/2025. Signed by Judge Adam B Abelson on 1/30/2025. (c/m p 1/30/2025 bg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 01/23 2:50 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re12 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Shaun Porter. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, December 30, 2024
15 15 service Certificate of Service Mon 12/30 8:14 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kirk Henneberry re12 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment ,13 MOTION to Permit Video Recordings as Exhibits re12 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment Amended Certificate of Service (Karpinski, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
14 14 misc Rule 12/56 Fri 12/27 8:26 AM
Rule 12/56 notice mailed to Shaun Porter (c/m p 12/27/2024 bg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
13 13 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 12/24 11:43 AM
MOTION to Permit Video Recordings as Exhibits re12 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment by Kirk Henneberry(Karpinski, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
12 12 motion Dismiss Summary Judgment Tue 12/24 11:38 AM
MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative , MOTION for Summary Judgment by Kirk Henneberry(Karpinski, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit a,
Att: 3 Exhibit b,
Att: 4 Exhibit c,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, December 19, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order Thu 12/19 11:11 AM
ORDER re: Informal Discovery Dispute Procedure. Signed by Judge Adam B Abelson on 12/19/2024. (c/m p 12/19/2024 bg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order Thu 12/19 11:10 AM
ORDER re: case management. Signed by Judge Adam B Abelson on 12/19/2024.(c/m p 12/19/2024 bg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Scheduling Order
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 12/17 3:23 PM
ANSWER to5 Amended Complaint by Robin Shusko.(Skilling, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 12/17 3:21 PM
ANSWER to5 Amended Complaint by Kevin Poole.(Skilling, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 12/10 2:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Kirk Henneberry served on 11/25/2024, answer due 12/16/2024; Kevin Poole served on 11/25/2024, answer due 12/16/2024; Robin Shusko served on 11/25/2024, answer due 12/16/2024.(bg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 11/05 3:25 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Kirk Henneberry, Kevin Poole.(c/m p 11/5/2024 bg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 11/01 1:38 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Robin Shusko, Kirk Henneberry, Kevin Poole, filed by Shaun Porter.(bg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 10/16 2:50 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Robin Shusko.(c/m p 10/16/2024 bg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs order Order Wed 10/16 2:49 PM
ORDER directing the Clerk to take all necessary steps to issue summons and to return summons to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Adam B Abelson on 10/16/2024. (c/m p 10/16/2024 bg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
2 2 misc New Case Notification Letter Tue 10/01 3:50 PM
New Case Notification Letter sent to Shaun Porter. (c/m to P 10/1/24 - av4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/01 3:45 PM
COMPLAINT against Jane Doe, John Doe, Robin Shusko ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 10182.), filed by Shaun Porter. (av4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Receipt