Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:24-bk-13757

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Mark D Houle
Case #: 6:24-ap-01077
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Tracy Mont Sloan
31754 Calle Novelda
Temecula, CA 92592
Represented By
Tracy Mont Sloan
contact info
Plaintiff
Fayez Sedrak
Represented By
Mark E Madison
Mark Edward Madison Law Firm
contact info
Trustee
Lynda T. Bui (TR)
Shulman Bastian Friedman & Bui LLP 3550 Vine Street, Suite 210
Riverside, CA 92507
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (RS)
3801 University Avenue, Suite 720
Riverside, CA 92501


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
8 8 misc Status report Tue 05/13 1:50 PM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Fayez Sedrak, Defendant Tracy Mont Sloan Related [+]. (Hendrix, J.)
Related: [-] 7 Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case)
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
7 7 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Wed 12/04 3:35 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued Related [+] Status Conference hearing to be held on 5/21/2025 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 301, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Mark D. Houle (JC6)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Fayez Sedrak
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Wed 12/04 3:34 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 05/21/2025 at 02:00 PM 3420 Twelfth Street Courtroom 301 Riverside, CA 92501 for1 , (JC6)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by Fayez Sedrak
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
6 6 misc Status report Wed 11/20 9:49 PM
Status report Joint Status Report Filed by Defendant Tracy Mont Sloan Related [+]. (Hendrix, J.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 11/06 2:43 PM
Summons Service Executed on Tracy Mont Sloan 10/17/2024 (JC6)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 11/01 11:54 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Tracy Mont Sloan. (Hendrix, J.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
3 3 court Summons Issued Wed 10/02 12:11 PM
Summons Issued on Tracy Mont Sloan Date Issued 10/2/2024, Answer Due 11/1/2024 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 12/4/2024 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 301, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Mark D. Houle (JC6)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Fayez Sedrak
Monday, September 30, 2024
2 2 court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Mon 09/30 7:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by RS. Receipt Number 61001534. (admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/30 3:53 PM
Adversary case 6:24-ap-01077. Complaint by Fayez Sedrak against Tracy Mont Sloan . Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) ,(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) ,(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) (RS)
Related: [-]