Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Michael H Watson
Referred: Kimberly A Jolson
Case #: 2:24-cv-04001
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Case Filed:Oct 01, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 6:05 AM EDT
Defendant
M.D. Lyndon B. Gaines
Represented By
John B. Welch
Arnold Todaro Welch & Foliano
contact info
Robert W Hojnoski
Hojnoski Law
contact info
Defendant
Holzer Clinic, LLC
100 Jackson Pike
Gallipolis, OH 45631
Represented By
John B. Welch
Arnold Todaro Welch & Foliano
contact info
Robert W Hojnoski
Hojnoski Law
contact info
Defendant
Holzer Health System
100 Jackson Pike
Gallipolis, OH 45631
Represented By
John B. Welch
Arnold Todaro Welch & Foliano
contact info
Robert W Hojnoski
Hojnoski Law
contact info
Defendant
Holzer Hospital Foundation
100 Jackson Pike
Gallipolis, OH 45631
Represented By
John B. Welch
Arnold Todaro Welch & Foliano
contact info
Robert W Hojnoski
Hojnoski Law
contact info
Defendant
Holzer Medical Center Physician Services, LLC
100 Jackson Pike
Gallipolis, OH 45631
Represented By
John B. Welch
Arnold Todaro Welch & Foliano
contact info
Robert W Hojnoski
Hojnoski Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly Zuspan
2912 Spruce Ave.
Point Pleasant, WV 25550
Represented By
William L Mundy
Mundy & Associates
contact info
Jeffery Lee Finley
Finley & Eachus
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
44 44 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 05/01 3:17 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Holzer Hospital Foundation. (Welch, John)
Related: [-]
43 43 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 05/01 3:15 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Holzer Health System, Holzer Health System identifying Corporate Parent Holzer Health System for Holzer Health System.. (Welch, John)
Related: [-]
42 42 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement - 7.1(a)(2) Thu 05/01 3:10 PM
Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement by Defendant Holzer Medical Center Physician Services, LLC. (Welch, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
41 41 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 04/28 2:46 PM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS the parties' proposed deadlines (Doc.40 ) and the case schedule is modified as follows: Motions to Amend due by 7/12/2025; Primary Experts due by 9/1/2025; Rebuttal Experts due by 10/1/2025; Settlement Demand due by 11/1/2025; Discovery due by 1/1/2026; Dispositive Motions due by 2/1/2026. The Court expects no further extensions . Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/28/2025. (kk2)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
40 40 misc Status Report Fri 04/25 5:06 PM
STATUS REPORT JOINT by Plaintiff Kimberly Zuspan. (Mundy, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
39 39 2 pgs order Order Thu 04/24 1:14 PM
SECOND DEFICIENCY ORDER: The parties have submitted only their citizenship disclosures. Upon review, Defendant Holzer Medical Center Physician Services LLC's citizenship disclosure is not complaint (Doc.38 at 2). Therefore, Defendant is ORDERED to file a revised citizenship disclosure statement on or before May 1, 2025 . As a reminder, the corporate Defendants must also file their corporate disclosures on or before May 1 . A sample of this form can be found on the Court's website. Deficiency Deadline due by 5/1/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/24/2025. (kk2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
38 38 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement - 7.1(a)(2) Wed 04/23 12:58 PM
Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement by Defendants Holzer Clinic, LLC, Holzer Health System, Holzer Hospital Foundation, Holzer Medical Center Physician Services, LLC. (Welch, John)
Related: [-]
37 37 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement - 7.1(a)(2) Wed 04/23 12:56 PM
Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement by Defendant Lyndon B. Gaines. (Welch, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
36 36 3 pgs order Order Tue 04/22 3:35 PM
ORDER: The Court VACATES the status conference scheduled for 4/24/2025. The parties are ORDERED to confer, either by telephone or by video conference, on appropriate dates for the four depositions. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report on or before April 25, 2025, informing the Court of the agreed-upon deposition dates and proposed deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/22/2025. (er)
Related: [-]
35 35 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement - 7.1(a)(2) Tue 04/22 11:49 AM
Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Kimberly Zuspan. (Mundy, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
34 34 misc Status Report Mon 04/21 5:12 PM
STATUS REPORT JOINT by Plaintiff Kimberly Zuspan. (Mundy, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Thursday, April 17, 2025
33 33 2 pgs order Order Thu 04/17 5:28 PM
DEFICIENCY ORDER issued in that the parties are ORDERED to file their Rule 7.1 disclosures within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. As noted, in their citizenship disclosures, the LLC Defendants must provide the names and citizenship of all their members and sub-members. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/17/25. (sem)
Related: [-]
32 32 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 04/17 9:28 AM
NOTATION ORDER - This matter is before the Court on a discovery dispute. The parties are ORDERED to meet and confer and submit a joint status report by 4/21/2025. A Status Conference will be held on 4/24/2025 at 10:00 AM. Counsel shall call 1-646-828-7666 to participate in the telephone conference with Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. The Meeting ID is 160 043 5255 and the Meeting Passcode is 454760. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/17/25. (jr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
31 31 discov Notice to Take Deposition Tue 04/01 2:15 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Christa Grady, PT by Plaintiff Kimberly Zuspan. (Finley, Jeffery)
Related: [-]
30 30 discov Notice to Take Deposition Tue 04/01 2:14 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Brianne Willis, NP by Plaintiff Kimberly Zuspan. (Finley, Jeffery)
Related: [-]
29 29 discov Notice to Take Deposition Tue 04/01 2:13 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Robert S. Bradley, MD by Plaintiff Kimberly Zuspan. (Finley, Jeffery)
Related: [-]
28 28 discov Notice to Take Deposition Tue 04/01 2:11 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Glen A. Fisher, MD by Plaintiff Kimberly Zuspan. (Finley, Jeffery)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
27 27 service Certificate of Service Tue 03/11 12:21 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Kimberly Zuspan Rule 26(A)(1) Disclosures (Mundy, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
26 26 service Certificate of Service Fri 02/21 4:20 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Kimberly Zuspan Plaintiff's Request for Admissions (Mundy, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
25 25 service Certificate of Service Tue 02/18 3:03 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Kimberly Zuspan Requests for Production of Documents (Mundy, William)
Related: [-]
24 24 service Certificate of Service Tue 02/18 3:02 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Kimberly Zuspan Interrogatories (Mundy, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
23 23 order Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order Wed 02/12 10:53 AM
MEMORANDUM OF FIRST PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Disclosures due by 3/12/2025. Joinder of Parties/Motions to Amend due by 5/12/2025. Primary Expert due by 6/1/2025. Rebuttal Expert due by 8/1/2025. Discovery due by 11/1/2025. Dispositive motions due by 12/1/2025. Case is referred to Mediation. Case referred to Clerk for assignment of mediator. Settlement Demand due by 9/1/2025. Response to Settlement Demand due by 10/1/2025. Mediation Deadline: 10/1/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 2/12/2025. (er)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 02/12 10:08 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/12/2025. (jr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
21 21 misc Rule 26(f) Report Wed 02/05 2:13 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants Lyndon B. Gaines, Holzer Clinic, LLC, Holzer Health System, Holzer Hospital Foundation, Holzer Medical Center Physician Services, LLC. (Welch, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
20 20 motion Appear Tue 02/04 9:19 AM
Notice of Appearance of William L. Mundy by Plaintiff Kimberly Zuspan. (Mundy, William) Modified text and termed motion event on 2/4/2025 (mas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
19 19 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 01/21 12:09 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2025 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/17 9:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John B. Welch for Defendants Lyndon B. Gaines, Holzer Health System, Holzer Clinic, LLC, Holzer Hospital Foundation, Holzer Medical Center Physician Services, LLC (Welch, John)
Related: [-]
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/17 9:45 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by All Defendants. (Welch, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
16 16 service Acknowledgment of Service Fri 01/03 10:06 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed - Dr. Lyndon Gaines, M.D. (certified mail #7019 1120 0000 1283 4379). (mve)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 01/03 9:31 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Holzer Medical Center Physician Services, LLC, Kevin Yeager, Agent. Holzer Medical Center Physician Services, LLC, Kevin Yeager, Agent served on 12/20/2024, answer due 1/10/2025. (Certified Mail #7019 1120 0000 1283 4331). (mve)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 12/27 8:32 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Holzer Clinic, LLC, Holzer Health System, Holzer Hospital Foundation. (er)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
13 13 misc Certificate of Clerk Tue 12/17 8:43 AM
CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk - A copy of the complaint and issued summons were sent to the named defendants via certified mail (7019 1120 0000 1283 4355/4379/4348/4362/4331). (mas)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
12 12 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 12/16 9:18 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Lyndon B. Gaines on 12/10/2024, answer due 2/10/2025. (Finley, Jeffery)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 12/16 9:17 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Holzer Clinic, LLC on 12/10/2024, answer due 2/10/2025. (Finley, Jeffery)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 12/16 9:15 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Holzer Hospital Foundation on 12/10/2024, answer due 2/10/2025. (Finley, Jeffery)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 12/16 9:13 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Holzer Medical Center Physician Services, LLC on 12/10/2024, answer due 2/10/2025. (Finley, Jeffery)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 12/16 9:11 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Holzer Health System on 12/10/2024, answer due 2/10/2025. (Finley, Jeffery)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
7 7 2 pgs service Summons Issued Wed 10/02 11:44 AM
Summons Issued as to Lyndon B. Gaines, Holzer Clinic, LLC, Holzer Health System, Holzer Hospital Foundation, Holzer Medical Center Physician Services, LLC. (ds)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Form,
Att: 2 Summons Form,
Att: 3 Summons Form,
Att: 4 Summons Form
6 6 2 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 10/02 11:23 AM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Finley, Jeffery)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 10/02 11:22 AM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Finley, Jeffery)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 10/02 11:22 AM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Finley, Jeffery)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 10/02 11:21 AM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Finley, Jeffery)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 10/02 11:20 AM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Finley, Jeffery)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/01 4:26 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10189122), filed by Kimberly Zuspan. (Finley, Jeffery)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Summons Form Gaines,
Att: 3 Summons Form Holzer Health System,
Att: 4 Summons Form Holzer Hospital Foundation,
Att: 5 Summons Form Holzer Medical Center Physician Services, LLC,
Att: 6 Summons Form Holzer Clinic, LLC,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet