District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Richard J Leon
Case #: 1:24-cv-02790
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Case Filed:Oct 01, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 5:20 AM EDT
Defendant
SAHOURI INSURANCE AGENCY FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.
Represented By
Matthew William Lee
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
EMBASSY OF THE REPUBLIC OF ESTONIA
Represented By
Garry Richard Boehlert
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Ian Andrew McLin
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Thomas Sykes Schaufelberger
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 44 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 04/16 12:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that defendant's9 Consent Motion to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. Accordingly, SAHOURI INSURANCE AGENCY FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.'s responsive pleading is due on 5/31/2025. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 4/16/2025. (lcrjl3)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 04/11 3:27 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by SAHOURI INSURANCE AGENCY FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC..(Lee, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 02/26 1:44 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer1 Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that the8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer is GRANTED. Accordingly, Defendant SAHOURI INSURANCE AGENCY FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.'s Answer is due April 13, 2025. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 02/26/2025.(lcrjl3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 02/25 9:42 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, and/or File Responsive Pleading by SAHOURI INSURANCE AGENCY FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC..(Lee, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, December 30, 2024
7 7 service Waiver of Service Mon 12/30 8:10 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE. SAHOURI INSURANCE AGENCY FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. waiver sent on 12/29/2024, answer due 2/27/2025. (Boehlert, Garry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
6 6 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 10/15 12:10 PM
SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to SAHOURI INSURANCE AGENCY FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/08 12:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Sykes Schaufelberger on behalf of EMBASSY OF THE REPUBLIC OF ESTONIA (Schaufelberger, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 10/07 8:38 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (zsl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
4 4 cmp Civil Cover Sheet (USE ONLY IF INSTRUCTED) Thu 10/03 4:27 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by EMBASSY OF THE REPUBLIC OF ESTONIA re Notice of Error- New Case, filed by EMBASSY OF THE REPUBLIC OF ESTONIA. Related document: Notice of Error- New Case,.(Boehlert, Garry)
Related: [-]
misc Payment of Fee - Complaint/Petition Thu 10/03 10:58 AM
Payment for1 Complaint,. ($405; Receipt number ADCDC-11206856). (Boehlert, Garry)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Error- New Case Thu 10/03 3:36 PM
NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR regarding1 Complaint,. The following error(s) need correction: Incorrect civil cover sheet. Please file the Civil Cover Sheet (JS44) form at www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/02 8:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Andrew McLin on behalf of EMBASSY OF THE REPUBLIC OF ESTONIA / WASHINGTON, DC (McLin, Ian)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Wed 10/02 7:05 PM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by EMBASSY OF THE REPUBLIC OF ESTONIA / WASHINGTON, DC (Boehlert, Garry)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/02 7:01 PM
COMPLAINT against SAHOURI INSURANCE AGENCY FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. with Jury Demand (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by EMBASSY OF THE REPUBLIC OF ESTONIA / WASHINGTON, DC.(Boehlert, Garry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Summons