District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Jia M Cobb
Case #: 1:24-cv-02791
Nature of Suit895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act
Cause05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Case Filed:Oct 01, 2024
Terminated:Dec 27, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 5:20 AM EDT
Defendant
DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By
Elizabeth Murray Tulis
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
HERITAGE FOUNDATION
214 Massachusetts Avenue NW
Washington, D.C., DC 20002
Represented By
Eric Neal Cornett
Law Office Of Eric Neal Cornett
contact info
Max Taylor Matheu
contact info
Samuel Everett Dewey
Chambers Of Samuel Everett Dewey, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MIKE HOWELL
Represented By
Eric Neal Cornett
Law Office Of Eric Neal Cornett
contact info
Max Taylor Matheu
contact info
Samuel Everett Dewey
Chambers Of Samuel Everett Dewey, LLC
contact info

GPO Oct 25 2024
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction: See document for details. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on October 25, 2024. (lcjmc1)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, December 02, 2024
18 18 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 12/02 2:10 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by MIKE HOWELL, HERITAGE FOUNDATION. (Dewey, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
17 17 motion Dismiss Thu 11/07 2:39 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Tulis, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, October 25, 2024
16 16 16 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Fri 10/25 4:50 PM
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction: See document for details. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on October 25, 2024. (lcjmc1)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Fri 10/25 4:47 PM
ORDER denying7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction: See document for details. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on October 25, 2024. (lcjmc1)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Fri 10/25 3:45 PM
NOTICE requesting ruling by HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL re7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dewey, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Thu 10/24 2:34 PM
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL(Dewey, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 10/24 2:00 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY filed by MIKE HOWELL, HERITAGE FOUNDATION.(Dewey, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Redline,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11,
Att: 13 Exhibit 12,
Att: 14 Exhibit 13,
Att: 15 Exhibit 14
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Wed 10/23 12:16 PM
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL(Dewey, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Thursday, October 17, 2024
10 10 26 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Thu 10/17 4:55 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Tulis, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Patrick Howard,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - FOIA Request,
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Appendix A to FOIA Request,
Att: 4 Exhibit A - Appendix B to FOIA Request,
Att: 5 Exhibit A - Appendix C to FOIA Request,
Att: 6 Exhibit A - Appendix D to FOIA Request,
Att: 7 Exhibit B,
Att: 8 Exhibit C,
Att: 9 Exhibit D,
Att: 10 Exhibit E
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 10/15 2:23 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Motion for Two-Day Extension of Time To File Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Tulis, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 10/15 3:27 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension: Upon consideration of the unopposed motion, and for good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the motion. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to7 Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction by October 17, 2024. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on October 15, 2024. (lcjmc1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
8 8 misc Declaration Tue 10/08 11:00 PM
DECLARATION of Eric Neal Cornett by HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL re7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .(Dewey, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14
7 7 motion Preliminary Injunction Tue 10/08 10:57 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL.(Dewey, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, October 07, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/07 4:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Murray Tulis on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Tulis, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
5 5 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Wed 10/02 2:40 PM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(zcb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/02 2:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Everett Dewey on behalf of HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL (Dewey, Samuel)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Errata Wed 10/02 12:29 PM
ERRATA by HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL re1 Complaint,.(Cornett, Eric) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/2/2024) (zcb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit
notice Notice of Error- New Case Wed 10/02 11:30 AM
NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR regarding1 Complaint. The following error(s) need correction: Other-Complaint filer (signee) should use matching user account; Amended complaint is not applicable, as there was no initial complaint filed. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zcb)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 10/02 2:26 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. (zcb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/01 6:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Max Taylor Matheu on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Matheu, Max)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/01 5:38 PM
COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11201434) filed by MIKE HOWELL, HERITAGE FOUNDATION.(Cornett, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit