South Carolina District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00763
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2024
Terminated:Sep 30, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 02, 2024 3:19 AM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Katherine Anne Orville
Us Attorneys Office (chas)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Octavius Lemond Harper (1)
Terminated: 09/30/2024
Represented By
Brendan McIntyre Daniels
Federal Public Defender
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/14/2024 1:36 PM EDT
Monday, September 30, 2024
1 1 Arrest (Rule 40) of Octavius Lemond Harper (egra, )
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs Rule 5c3 Documents Received as to Octavius Lemond Harper (egra, )
Related: [-]
3 3 Sealed Document (egra, )
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Octavius Lemond Harper Initial Appearance - Rule 40 set for 9/30/2024 10:00 AM in Charleston Courtroom #5, U. S. Court House, 85 Broad St, Charleston before Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry. (egra, )
Related: [-]
5 5 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit Related [+] by Octavius Lemond Harper (egra, )
Related: [-] stricted Access
6 6 TEXT ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Octavius Lemond Harper; Brendan McIntyre Daniels for Octavius Lemond Harper. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 09/30/2024. (egra, )
Related: [-]
7 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry: Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings as to Octavius Lemond Harper held on 9/30/2024. AUSA Katie Orville present for the government. Court appoints FPD's office; AFPD Brendan Daniels present from that office. Court reviews indictment and penalties. Court review FRCrP Rule 5 disclosure and directs that a written order be filed. Defendant waives identity hearing. Defendant waives detention hearing without prejudice. Defendant remains detained and will be transferred back to the Western District of Arkansas. Alyssa Gazic, CS. (egra, )
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs WAIVER of Rule 5c3 Hearing by Octavius Lemond Harper (egra, )
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs FRCrP 5(f) DISCLOSURE ORDER as to Octavius Lemond Harper. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 09/30/2024. (egra, )
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs COMMITMENT TO ANOTHER DISTRICT as to Octavius Lemond Harper. Defendant committed to District of Western District of Arkansas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H Cherry on 09/30/2024. (egra, )
Related: [-]