California Eastern District Court
Judge:John A Mendez
Referred: Chi Soo Kim
Case #: 2:24-cv-02670
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2024
Terminated:Oct 10, 2024
Defendant
Ann Greth
Defendant
Charles Smiley
Defendant
Clare Keithley
Defendant
Clarence Don Clay
Defendant
Delbert C. Gee
Defendant
J.S. Hermanson
Defendant
James F Reilley
Defendant
Jeffrey Harner
Defendant
Larry J. Goodman
Defendant
Michael R. Deems
Defendant
Noel Wise
Defendant
Renee C. Day
Defendant
Robert G. Gusman
Defendant
Sandra L. Margulies
Defendant
Tara M. Desautels
Defendant
Thomas Kolpacoff
Defendant
Thomas Reardon
Plaintiff
Steven Wayne Bonilla, VEXATIOUS LITIGANT

GPO Oct 10 2024
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/9/2024 DISMISSING this case. No further documents will be accepted in this action. CASE CLOSED. (Mendez Licea, O)

Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, October 10, 2024
3 3 order Judgment Thu 10/10 9:28 AM
JUDGMENT dated *10/10/2024* pursuant to order signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/9/2024. (Mendez Licea, O)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 10/10 9:28 AM
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/9/2024 DISMISSING this case. No further documents will be accepted in this action. CASE CLOSED. (Mendez Licea, O)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Thu 10/10 9:29 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:2 Order and3 Judgment served on Steven Wayne Bonilla, VEXATIOUS LITIGANT. (Mendez Licea, O)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
misc IFP Application Tue 10/01 2:38 PM
LODGED COMPLAINT filed by Vexatious Litigant - Court Action Required. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
1 1 cmp Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint Tue 10/01 2:37 PM
LODGED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT by Steven Wayne Bonilla, VEXATIOUS LITIGANT. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]