New York Southern District Court
Judge:Arun Subramanian
Case #: 1:24-cv-07465
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12132 Americans with Disabilities Act - Discrimination
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2024
Terminated:Nov 27, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 31, 2025 4:27 AM EDT
Defendant
Topo Designs, LLC
Represented By
David Stein
Stein & Nieporent LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Alvin Suarez
Represented By
Gabriel Levy
Gabriel A. Levy, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Wed 11/27 11:01 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL.... The Court having been advised at ECF No. 10 that all claims asserted herein have beensettled in principle, it is ORDERED that the above-entitled action be and is hereby DISMISSEDand discontinued without costs, and without prejudice to the right to reopen the action within sixtydays of the date of this Order if the settlement is not consummated.To be clear, any application to reopen must be filed by the aforementioned deadline; anyapplication to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. Further, requests to extendthe deadline to reopen are unlikely to be granted.If the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purposes of enforcing anysettlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court by the deadline toreopen to be "so ordered" by the Court. Per Paragraph 9.B of the Court's Individual Practices forCivil Cases, unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce asettlement agreement unless it is made part of the public record.Any pending motions are moot. All conferences are canceled. The Clerk of Court isdirected to close the case.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 11/27/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 11/27 9:25 AM
NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Alvin Suarez..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/17 8:20 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Topo Designs, LLC served on 10/16/2024, answer due 11/6/2024. Service was accepted by Registered agent. Document filed by Alvin Suarez..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
8 8 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 10/10 8:15 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Topo Designs, LLC..(Stein, David)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/10 8:14 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Stein on behalf of Topo Designs, LLC..(Stein, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
6 6 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Thu 10/03 4:39 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/2/2024 at 02:00 PM before Judge Arun Subramanian.The parties should dial in by calling (646) 453-4442 and entering the Phone Conference ID: 586 128 030, followed by the pound (#) sign. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 10/3/2024) (tro)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 10/03 1:44 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Topo Designs, LLC..(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 10/03 10:15 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Arun Subramanian. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 10/03 10:16 AM
Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 10/03 10:16 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
4 4 respoth Declaration in Support (non-motion) Wed 10/02 11:03 AM
DECLARATION of Robert D. Moody in Support re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Alvin Suarez..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 10/02 11:02 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Topo Designs, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Alvin Suarez..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 10/02 11:01 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 10/02 11:00 AM
COMPLAINT against Topo Designs, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29978578)Document filed by Alvin Suarez..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]