Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:23-bk-01545

Iowa Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lee M Jackwig
Case #: 4:24-ap-30029
Nature of Suit41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
Case Filed:Oct 01, 2024
Terminated:Feb 26, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Paul Vincent Owens
2007 SW Chautauqua Lane
Ankeny, IA 50023
Represented By
Paul Vincent Owens
contact info
Defendant
Shantelle Danyel Owens
2007 SW Chautauqua Lane
Ankeny, IA 50023
Represented By
Shantelle Danyel Owens
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles Smith
25 Main Place Suite 200
Council Bluffs, IA 51503
Represented By
Charles L Smith
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM CDT
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
court Close Case - Adversary Wed 02/26 9:25 AM
Adversary Case Closed 24-30029 ccc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
15 15 order Motion to Dismiss 11 USC Sec 727 Complaint - Order Tue 02/11 4:08 PM
Docket Text Order Granting Motion to Dismiss 727 Complaint. There being no timely objection to the motion, it is hereby Ordered that: The motion is granted and this adversary proceeding is dismissed with prejudice. As required by any applicable federal rule or statute, the filer shall serve this order on all appropriate parties (except those parties who will receive notice of electronic filing). This order has been entered on the docket as directed by the Judge assigned to this proceeding. Related [+]. (acw)
Related: [-] #11
Sunday, January 19, 2025
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 01/19 11:11 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/19/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12
Friday, January 17, 2025
13 13 court Court's Certificate of Service by Mail Fri 01/17 12:41 PM
Court's Certificate of Service by Mail. Parties Served: United States Trustee in Bankruptcy Case 23-1545 Related [+] (kam)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of Bar Date for Objections
12 12 court Notice of Bar Date - 21 day Fri 01/17 12:39 PM
Notice of Bar Date for Objections Related [+]. Objections Due By 02/07/2025. (akam)
Related: [-] #11 Motion to Dismiss 11 U.S.C. § 727 Complaint Filed by Charles L Smith on behalf of Charles Smith
11 11 motion Dismiss 11 USC Sec 727 Complaint Fri 01/17 12:33 PM
Motion to Dismiss 11 U.S.C. § 727 Complaint Filed by Charles L Smith on behalf of Charles Smith (ccc)
Related: [-]
10 10 court Notice of Dismissal Fri 01/17 11:54 AM
Error: Incorrect docket code. See Docket Event #11. Notice of Dismissal Filed by Charles Smith on behalf of Charles Smith. (Smith, Charles)Modified on 1/17/2025 (ccc)
Related: [-]
court Corrective Entry Fri 01/17 12:29 PM
Corrective Entry Incorrect docket code. Related [+](ccc)
Related: [-] 10 Notice of Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Charles Smith
Thursday, January 16, 2025
9 9 order Order Thu 01/16 10:17 AM
DOCKET TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CHANGE IN LOCATION FOR JANUARY 22, 2025 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Whereas the Chief District Judge's April 12, 2024 directive that no courtroom hearings be conducted at the new United States Courthouse in Des Moines remains in effect, the Court will conduct the conference in Room 145 (First Floor South) in the Historic United States Courthouse located at 123 East Walnut Street. Beyond notice of electronic filing, service of this notice is waived. This notice has been entered on the docket as directed by Judge Jackwig. Related [+] (tls)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice Issued
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
8 8 court Hearing Continued or Rescheduled Tue 11/12 7:31 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER ON UNCONTESTED MOTION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND DOCKET TEXT NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. (1) The motion to continue the November 20, 2024 scheduling conference is granted. (2) The rescheduled conference will commence on January 22, 2025 during the 9:00 a.m. session. (No separate notice and order regarding conference will be entered. The parties shall abide by the directives in the prior notice and order.) (3) Beyond notice of electronic filing, service of this order and notice is waived. This order and notice has been entered on the docket as directed by the Judge assigned to the case. Related [+] Hearing scheduled 1/22/2025 at 09:00 AM at US Bk Ct, 4th Floor, Courtroom 430. (tls)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice Issued
Monday, November 11, 2024
7 7 motion Continue Hearing Mon 11/11 4:06 PM
Motion to Continue Hearin Related [+] Filed by Charles Smith on behalf of Charles Smith (Smith, Charles)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice Issued2
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 10/30 3:42 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Paul Vincent Owens, Shantelle Danyel Owens. (acw)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Certificate Of Service Wed 10/30 2:27 PM
Certificate Of Service Filed by Defendants Paul Vincent Owens, Shantelle Danyel Owens Related [+]
Related: [-] 6 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Paul Vincent Owens, Defendant Shantelle Danyel Owens. Modified on 10/30/2024 to correct linkage (acw)
4 4 objectio Objection Wed 10/30 2:26 PM
Error: Incorrect Docket Code. See Docket Event #6. Objection Filed by Paul Vincent Owens, Shantelle Danyel Owens Related [+](Janssen, Dallas Modified on 10/30/2024 (acw).
Related: [-] related documents(s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles Smith
court Corrective Entry Wed 10/30 3:41 PM
Corrective Entry Incorrect Docket Code. Related [+](acw)
Related: [-] 4 Objection filed by Defendant Paul Vincent Owens, Defendant Shantelle Danyel Owens
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 10/02 9:03 AM
Summons Service Executed On Paul Vincent Owens 10/2/2024; Shantelle Danyel Owens 10/2/2024 (Smith, Charles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
2 2 court Summons and Notice Issued Tue 10/01 4:03 PM
Summons and Notice Issued on Paul Vincent Owens Answer Due 10/31/2024; Shantelle Danyel Owens Answer Due 10/31/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 11/20/2024 at 09:00 AM at US Bk Ct, 4th Floor, Courtroom 430. (ajmk)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/01 3:33 PM
Adversary case 24-30029 Complaint by Charles Smith against Paul Vincent Owens, Shantelle Danyel Owens. Receipt Number Deferred, Fee Amount $350 (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) Lead Case No. 4:23-bk-1545 (Smith, Charles)
Related: [-]