Washington Western District Court
Judge:Lauren King
Case #: 2:24-cv-01589
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Fair Credit Reporting
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2024
Case in other court:Skagit County Superior Court, 24-00002-00961-29
Last checked: Monday Mar 31, 2025 1:36 AM PDT
Defendant
SB&C Ltd
Represented By
Timothy J. Fransen
Cosgrave Vergeer Kester
contact info
Plaintiff
Mikrae E Preston
Represented By
Roblin John Williamson
Williamson & Williams
contact info
Samuel R Leonard
Leonard Law, PLLC
contact info
Amanda Martin
Northwest Consumer Law Center
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
27 27 order Order on Stipulated Motion Fri 05/02 4:18 PM
ORDER granting the Parties'26 Stipulated Motion to Stay Deadlines in Scheduling Order. All upcoming case deadlines in the Court's scheduling order (Dkt. No.22 ) will be stayed pending the Court's order on SB&C's motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (APH)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Stipulated Motion Fri 05/02 1:52 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Stay Deadlines in Scheduling Order , filed by All Parties. Noting Date 5/2/2025, (Martin, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
25 25 misc Brief Thu 04/17 4:39 PM
Defendant's Supplemental BRIEF re23 Order, Regarding Application of Rooker-Feldman Doctrine by All Defendants (Fransen, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
24 24 misc Brief Thu 04/10 3:51 PM
Plaintiff's Supplemental BRIEF re23 Order, Regarding Application of the Rooker-Feldman Doctrine to Plaintiff's Claims by Plaintiff Mikrae E Preston (Martin, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
23 23 order 1 - Order Thu 03/27 5:00 PM
ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. The Court requests supplemental briefing regarding whether this action must be dismissed. Plaintiff's supplemental brief is due by 04/10/2025, and Defendant's supplemental brief is due by 04/17/2025. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (APH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
22 22 order Scheduling Order Thu 12/05 5:08 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
21 21 misc Joint Status Report Wed 12/04 10:53 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 5. (Martin, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
20 20 misc Amended Document Thu 11/21 6:39 PM
AMENDMENT to19 Reply to Response to Motion by All Defendants (Fransen, Timothy)
Related: [-]
19 19 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 11/21 5:03 PM
REPLY, filed by All Defendants, TO RESPONSE to13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Alternative Motion to Certify Questions to the Washington Supreme Court (Fransen, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
18 18 respm Response to Motion Tue 11/12 2:17 PM
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Mikrae E Preston, to13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Alternative Motion to Certify Questions to the Washington Supreme Court . Oral Argument Requested. (Martin, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
17 17 order 2 - Minute Order Fri 11/01 9:58 AM
MINUTE ORDER (text only) authorized by Judge Lauren King. In light of Defendant's16 Response which includes a certification of conferral and word count, the Court DISCHARGES its 15 Order to Show Cause. The Court cautions that future violations of the Local Civil Rules or other applicable law may result in sanctions. (NAW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
16 16 misc Response (non motion) Thu 10/31 1:20 PM
RESPONSE by All Defendants re 15 Minute Order,,,, (Fransen, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
15 15 order 2 - Minute Order Fri 10/25 12:10 PM
MINUTE ORDER (text only) authorized by Judge Lauren King. Defendant SB&C Ltd is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why its13 Motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Alternative Motion to Certify Questions to the Washington Supreme Court should not be stricken. The Court's Standing Order for All Civil Cases instructs parties to "make a meaningful effort to confer prior to filing a dispositive motion," and requires any dispositive motion to "contain a certification of conferral" that is "clearly visible within either the first substantive paragraph or the final paragraph of the motion." Dkt. No. 6-1 at 4. SB&C Ltd's motion does not contain a certification of conferral, nor does it contain a word count as required by Local Civil Rule 7(e)(6). The Court may discharge this order to show cause if SB&C Ltd files a certification within 10 days of the date of this Order that (1) certifies that it has made a meaningful effort to confer with Plaintiff regarding the substance of its motion, (2) describes whether that effort has resulted in agreement on any aspects of the motion, and (3) certifies the number of words in the motion. (NAW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
14 14 respm Declaration Thu 10/24 4:18 PM
DECLARATION of Timothy J. Fransen filed by All Defendants re13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Alternative Motion to Certify Questions to the Washington Supreme Court(Fransen, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
13 13 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 10/24 4:17 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Alternative Motion to Certify Questions to the Washington Supreme Court , filed by All Defendants. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 11/21/2024, (Fransen, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 10/11 1:29 PM
MINUTE ORDER (text only) GRANTING Defendant's9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Finding good cause, the Court extends the deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's complaint to October 24, 2024. The Court reminds the parties that "[a]bsent extraordinary delay or other special circumstances, the parties are free to agree among themselves to extend the answer deadline without a Court order." Dkt. No.6 -1 at 3. Authorized by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Proposed Order (Unsigned) Fri 10/11 12:38 PM
PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal, (Fransen, Timothy)
Related: [-]
10 10 respm Declaration Fri 10/11 12:36 PM
DECLARATION of Timothy J. Fransen filed by All Defendants re9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal, (Fransen, Timothy)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 10/11 12:36 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal, , filed by All Defendants. Noting Date 10/11/2024, (Fransen, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
8 8 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Thu 10/10 4:37 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by All Defendants. (Fransen, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
7 7 order Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Wed 10/09 10:40 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/6/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/20/2024, Joint Status Report due by 12/4/2024. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
Related: [-]
6 6 order LK Standing Order for All Civil Cases (FORM) Wed 10/09 10:39 AM
STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Standing Order
5 5 order LK Standing Order re 28 USC 455 (FORM) Wed 10/09 10:38 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. § 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 10/04 2:44 PM
MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lauren King for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge David W. Christel no longer assigned to case, by Clerk, Ravi Subramanian. (KEB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
3 3 misc Consent Letter & Form Thu 10/03 10:58 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 10/10/2024. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KEB)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only) Thu 10/03 9:54 AM
LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Skagit County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (HH)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 10/03 9:49 AM
Judge David W. Christel added. (HH)
Related: [-]
utility Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines Thu 10/03 9:52 AM
NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Defendant SB&C Ltd must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 10/10/2024. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents.(HH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 10/02 12:03 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Skagit County Superior Court, case number 24 2-00961 29; Related [+] Attorney Timothy J. Fransen added to party SB&C Ltd(pty:dft) filed by SB&C Ltd.(Fransen, Timothy)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8654727
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet