Arizona District Court
Judge:Sharad H Desai
Case #: 2:24-cv-02657
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Oct 01, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 3:47 AM MST
Defendant
OneAZ Credit Union
Represented By
Jill J Ormond
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Shawn J Alves
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Plaintiff
Deyra Pamela Carranza Aguilar
Represented By
Eduardo Casas
Maldef - Los Angeles, Ca
contact info
Thomas Andrew Saenz
Maldef - Los Angeles, Ca
contact info
Daniel R Ortega, Jr.
Ortega Law Firm PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM MST
Thursday, May 01, 2025
28 28 misc Supplement Thu 05/01 4:34 PM
SUPPLEMENT Joint Supplemental Response to Rule 26(f) Report re:27 Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,24 Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan) by Plaintiff Deyra Pamela Carranza Aguilar. (Ortega, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
27 27 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/22 11:31 AM
ORDER: Case Management Conference rescheduled to Tuesday, 5/6/2025 at 10:30 AM , in Courtroom 502, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003. The parties shall file a supplement to their Rule 26(f) Joint Case Management Report by no later than 3 business days before the Case Management Conference . [See attached for additional information.} Signed by Judge Sharad H. Desai on 4/22/2025. (RMW)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines Fri 03/21 4:47 PM
ORDER: The Court has received and reviewed the parties' Response to Court's Order to Show Cause as to Joint Case Management Report, (Doc.25 ), and is satisfied with the cause shown. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the Court will not take no further action on the show cause Order issued 3/17/2025 (Doc. 23). Ordered by Judge Sharad H. Desai on 3/21/2025. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
25 25 misc Response Thu 03/20 3:44 PM
RESPONSE Response to Court's Order to Show Cause as to Joint Case Management Report by Defendant OneAZ Credit Union. (Alves, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
24 24 misc Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan) Mon 03/17 4:35 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Deyra Pamela Carranza Aguilar.(Ortega, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Case Management Order
order Order to Show Cause Mon 03/17 4:29 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: On 2/12/2025, the Court entered an Order Setting Rule 16 Case Management Conference ordering the parties to file a Joint Case Management Report within 30 days (Doc.22 ). No Report has been received. Therefore, IT IS ORDERED that the parties show cause by no later than Friday, 3/21/2025 , as to why this case should not be dismissed, or the parties otherwise sanctioned, for failure to comply with an order of the Court. Ordered by Judge Sharad H. Desai on 3/17/2025. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
22 22 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 02/12 12:41 PM
ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE for Tuesday, 4/22/2025 at 10:00 AM , in Courtroom 502, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Sharad H. Desai. The parties are directed to meet, confer, and develop a Rule 26(f) Joint Case Management Report, which must be filed within 30 days of this order. See the attached order for additional information. Signed by Judge Sharad H. Desai on 2/12/2025. (RMW)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
minute_ord ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges Mon 02/10 8:41 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Due to the appointment of a new District Judge in the Phoenix Division, this case is hereby reassigned by the Clerk to the Honorable District Judge Sharad H Desai. All future filings shall reflect the following case number: CV 24-2657 PHX-SHD. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CKS)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
20 20 misc Disclosure Statement Fri 12/20 12:47 PM
Disclosure Statement by OneAZ Credit Union. (Alves, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement Mon 12/09 4:03 PM
NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to OneAZ Credit Union. (KMB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Thu 12/05 2:11 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee for all further proceedings. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV 24-02657 PHX-SMM. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 12/5/2024. (RMV)
Related: [-]
minute_ord Minute Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges ~Util - Terminate Hearings Thu 12/05 8:28 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Roslyn O Silver. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 24-2657 PHX-ROS. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for December 20, 2024 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
misc 25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge Thu 12/05 8:26 AM
Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
14 14 misc Demand for Jury Trial by Defendant Mon 12/02 6:14 PM
DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by OneAZ Credit Union. (Ormond, Jill)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/02 6:12 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by OneAZ Credit Union.(Ormond, Jill)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc 25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause (LRCiv 3.7(b)) Mon 12/02 3:57 PM
ORDER that OneAZ Credit Union show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Judge John J Tuchi. Show Cause Hearing set for 12/20/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi.(MAP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Instructions,
Att: 2 Consent Form
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 11/12 11:18 AM
ORDER granting9 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall have until 12/2/2024 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles on 11/12/24. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
10 10 misc 25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Election Form Deadline Tue 11/12 8:25 AM
Magistrate Election Form Deadline.(MAP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 11/08 2:16 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Stipulation for 30-Day Extension of Time for Defendant to File Its Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by OneAZ Credit Union.(Ormond, Jill)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Friday, October 25, 2024
8 8 minute_ord Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings Fri 10/25 7:13 AM
MINUTE ORDER: that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for November 12, 2024 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
7 7 misc 25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Fri 10/25 7:11 AM
Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
5 5 misc 25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause (LRCiv 3.7(b)) Mon 10/21 10:51 AM
ORDER that Deyra Pamela Carranza Aguilar show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Judge John J Tuchi. Show Cause Hearing set for 11/12/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi.(MAP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Instructions,
Att: 2 Consent Form
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Tue 10/08 1:43 PM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Thomas Andrew Saenz, Eduardo Casas on behalf of Plaintiff Deyra Pamela Carranza Aguilar. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 10/02 2:11 PM
Summons Issued as to OneAZ Credit Union. (REK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
3 3 misc New Case Opened Wed 10/02 2:09 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-23520473. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Camille D Bibles. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 24-02657 PHX-CDB. Magistrate Election form attached.(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
2 2 service Summons Submitted Wed 10/02 2:08 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Deyra Pamela Carranza Aguilar. (submitted by Daniel Ortega) (REK)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 10/02 2:07 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23520473 filed by Deyra Pamela Carranza Aguilar. (submitted by Daniel Ortega)(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet