Arkansas Eastern District Court
Case #: 4:24-mj-00261
Case Filed:Oct 01, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Oct 03, 2024 2:17 AM CDT
Defendant
Adham Ali El-Khatib (1)
Represented By
Shea Lynn Watts
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Stephen Reese Lancaster
U. S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/03/2024 3:17 AM CDT
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Adham Ali El-Khatib (1). (cfd)
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Adham Ali El-Khatib: Initial Appearance set for 10/2/2024 at 2:00 PM in Little Rock Courtroom # 1B before Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris. (cfd)
Related: [-]