California Eastern District Court
Judge:Jennifer L Thurston
Case #: 1:24-cv-01173
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Oct 01, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 30, 2025 2:17 AM PDT
Defendant
Kay And Associates, Inc.
Represented By
David G. Litman
Sagaser, Watkins & Wieland, PC
contact info
Ian Blade Wieland
Sagaser, Watkins & Wieland, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Amy Harden
Represented By
Michael Freiman
Law Office Of Michael Freiman
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, March 13, 2025
12 12 order Scheduling Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Thu 03/13 1:14 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/13/2025: Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures: March 27, 2025; Non-Expert Discovery: December 19, 2025; Expert Disclosure: December 19, 2025; Rebuttal Expert Disclosure: January 26, 2026; Expert Discovery: February 23, 2026. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filing: March 02, 2026; Hearing: Pursuant to Local Rules. Pretrial Conference set for June 22, 2026 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Jury Trial set for August 18, 2026 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. 5 days. (Deputy Clerk JN)
Related: [-]
11 11 minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 03/13 10:18 AM
MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via video conference before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone: INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 03/13/2025. The Court to issue Scheduling Conference Order. NOTE: "SAB Chambers Procedures" emailed to the parties. Plaintiff's Counsel: Michael Freiman present via video. Defendant's Counsel: William Woolman present via video for David Litman. Court Reporter/CD Number: Not Reported. (Deputy Clerk JN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
10 10 misc Scheduling Report Thu 03/06 12:03 PM
JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT filed by Kay And Associates, Inc.. (Litman, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 11/08 3:16 PM
ANSWER with Jury Demand by Kay And Associates, Inc.. Attorney Litman, David G. added. (Litman, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/22 1:32 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Kay And Associates, Inc. served on 10/10/2024, answer due 10/31/2024. (Freiman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
7 7 order JLT Standing Order Tue 10/08 9:26 AM
STANDING ORDER signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on October 8, 2024.. (Munoz, I)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
6 6 misc Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case Fri 10/04 9:51 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston and Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The new case number is: 1:24-cv-01173-JLT-SAB. (Marrujo, C)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
5 5 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Thu 10/03 9:04 AM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Freiman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
4 4 misc Civil New Case Documents for Magistrate as Presider Wed 10/02 1:36 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/13/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Flores, E)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix A(m),
Att: 2 Consent Form,
Att: 3 VDRP
3 3 service Summons Wed 10/02 1:34 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Kay And Associates, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael Freiman* *Law Office of Michael Freiman* *100 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 700* *Santa Monica, CA 90401*. (Flores, E)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
2 2 utility Civil Cover Sheet Wed 10/02 7:53 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Amy Harden. (Rivera, O)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Kay And Associates, Inc. by Amy Harden. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11782727) (Freiman, Michael)
Related: [-]