X Corp v. Media Matters
Original Case: 4:23-cv-01175
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-pcd-10900 |
Type | private civil diversity / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Oct 02, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Oct 03, 2024 3:16 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellant
Media Matters for America
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Eric Hananoki
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Angelo Carusone
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
X Corp
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/03/2024 3:16 AM CDT |
Wednesday, October 02, 2024 | ||
ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 4:23-CV-1175. Electronic ROA due on 10/17/2024. 24-10900 (CAS) | ||
![]() |
||
![]() |
||
![]() |
||
![]() REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Mr. Angelo Carusone, Mr. Eric Hananoki and Media Matters for America for stay pending appeal [9] Ruling is requested by: 10/07/2024. Date of service: 10/02/2024 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Cuenin, Hilton, Sullivan; Attorney for Appellant: LeGrand 24-10900 (Andrew Patrick LeGrand ) |
||
![]() |
||
![]() |