Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:24-cv-05502
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 31, 2025 4:50 AM EDT
Defendant
3M Company
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
Defendant
The Chemours Company
Defendant
National Foam, Inc.
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
Kidde PLC
Defendant
E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals, Inc.
Defendant
Corteva, Inc.
Defendant
Clariant Corp.
Defendant
Chubb Fire, LTD
Defendant
Chemours Company FC, LLC
Defendant
Chemicals, Inc.
Defendant
Chemguard, Inc.
Defendant
ChemDesign Products, Inc
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Defendant
Arkema, Inc.
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
Plaintiff
Charles Perez
Represented By
Frederick Thurman Kuykendall, III
The Kuykendall Group LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, October 04, 2024
3 3 misc MDL Member Case Opened Fri 10/04 8:55 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 10/2/2024), Charles Perez v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-05502-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: District of Minnesota (wmil)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 10/04 8:54 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (wmil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
1 1 40 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 10/04 8:53 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12026003.), filed by Charles Perez. Service due by 12/31/2024 (wmil)
Related: [-]