Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:22-bk-50228

North Carolina Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Paul M Black
Case #: 3:24-ap-03062
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 03, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Advantage Media Management, Inc. d/b/a ami+partners
Represented By
Advantage Media Management, Inc. d/b/a ami+partners
contact info
Interested Party
Jimmy R. Summerlin, Jr
Young, Morphis, Bach & Taylor, LLP P.O. Drawer 2428
Hickory, NC 28603
Plaintiff
Jimmy R Summerlin, Jr, in his capacity as Chapter 7 bankruptcy trustee for the Estate of Power Home Solar, LLC d/b/a Pink Energy
Represented By
Melanie D. Johnson Raubach
Hamilton Stephens Steele Martin PLLC
contact info
Jimmy R. Summerlin, Jr.
Young, Morphis, Bach & Taylor, L.L.P.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
5 5 motion Approve Settlement Mon 04/21 2:02 PM
Motion to Approve Settlement with Notice of Opportunity for Hearing If a response or objection is filed - DUE: 21 days from the date of the Notice, a hearing will be held on DATE: 5/28/2025, TIME: 10:30 a.m., LOCATION: Zoom for Government. filed by Melanie D. Johnson Raubach on behalf of Jimmy R Summerlin Jr. (Raubach, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, April 14, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Intent to Dismiss Mon 04/14 1:05 PM
Court Notice of Intent to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding without Prejudice for want of Prosecution. Related [+]. Objections to Dismissal Due 5/14/2025, (adf)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Jimmy R Summerlin
Thursday, December 12, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Thu 12/12 1:17 PM
Summons Service Executed. Advantage Media Management, Inc. d/b/a Ami+Partners served on 10/9/2024. (Raubach, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 10/04 3:55 PM
Summons Issued (ADI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Thu 10/03 1:08 PM
Adversary case 24-03062 Complaint 12 by Jimmy R Summerlin Jr against Advantage Media Management, Inc. d/b/a ami+partners - Fee Amount $ 350. Pre-Trial Order due by 01/31/2025. (Raubach, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
utility Receipt of Fee Payment Thu 10/03 3:22 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee Payment - Receipt Number: 30000293. Amount Paid $350.00 Related [+]. (cch)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Jimmy R Summerlin
crditcrd none Thu 10/03 3:30 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint([LINK 24-03062 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number VOID - Fee PD Check, amount $ 350.00. (ale)
Related: [-]