Minnesota District Court
Judge:Laura M Provinzino
Referred: David T Schultz
Case #: 0:24-cv-03809
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 03, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 01, 2025 3:24 AM CDT
Defendant
Alexander Mark Graham
Represented By
Brett Bacon
Office Of The Ramsey County Attorney
contact info
Kevin Scott Plaisance
Ramsey County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Martel Le'Shawn Riley
Represented By
Eric A Rice
Law Office Of Eric A. Rice, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/07 4:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Scott Plaisance on behalf of Alexander Mark Graham. (Plaisance, Kevin)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/07 3:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brett Bacon on behalf of Alexander Mark Graham. (Bacon, Brett)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
13 13 order Order/Notice to Attorney Mon 01/06 3:06 PM
ORDER REGARDING LR 5.6. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 1/6/2025. (TJB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 ex 1,
Att: 2 ex 2
12 12 order Scheduling Order Mon 01/06 3:02 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/10/2025. Fact Discovery due by 10/30/2025. Motions (non-disp) due 12/19/2025. Motions (disp) due by 4/14/2026. Ready for trial due by 8/17/2026. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 1/6/2025. (TJB)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
10 10 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Fri 12/13 5:04 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re9 Stipulation. (Plaisance, Kevin)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Stipulation Fri 12/13 5:03 PM
STIPULATION for Protective Order by Alexander Mark Graham. Jointly Signed by Martel Le' Shawn Riley and Alexander Mark Graham. (Plaisance, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
11 11 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Mon 12/30 11:18 AM
(Text-Only) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 12/10/2024: Rule 16 Pretrial Conference. No Digital Recording Minneapolis Courthouse, Courtroom 9E Time: 3:30p / 3:45p Total Time: 15 min APPEARANCES: For Plaintiff(s): Eric Rice For Defendant(s): Brett Bacon PROCEEDINGS: Discussion of Pretrial Deadlines. Pretrial Scheduling Order to be issued. (TJB)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
8 8 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Fri 12/06 3:34 PM
(Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference reset for 12/10/2024 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. ** TIME CHANGE ONLY ** Ordered by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 12/6/2024. (TJB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
7 7 misc Rule 26(f) Report Tue 11/19 9:13 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Alexander Mark Graham. Jointly Signed by Martel Le'Shawn Riley.(Bacon, Brett)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
6 6 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Thu 11/14 9:20 AM
ORDER/NOTICE OF SCHEDULING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 12/3/2024. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/3/2024. Confidential letters due 12/3/24. Pretrial Conference set for 12/10/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 11/14/2024. (TJB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 11/12 4:09 PM
Defendant Ramsey County's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Alexander Mark Graham. (Bacon, Brett)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 10/25 10:10 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martel Le'Shawn Riley. Alexander Mark Graham served on 10/24/2024, answer due 11/14/2024. (Rice, Eric)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 10/04 10:32 AM
Summons Issued as to Alexander Mark Graham. (MMG)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Fri 10/04 10:31 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Laura M. Provinzino per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 24-cv-3809 LMP/DTS. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MMG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/03 1:55 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11402911) filed by Martel Le'Shawn Riley. Filer requests summons issued. (Rice, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet