Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Charles Esque Fleming
Case #: 1:24-cv-01720
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 03, 2024
Terminated:Mar 17, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 01, 2025 4:32 AM EDT
Defendant
Air France
Represented By
Tyler G. Tarney
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani- Columbus
contact info
Andrea Hofer
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani - Columbus
contact info
Defendant
Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By
Derek D. McLeod
Taft Stettinius & Hollister - Southfield
contact info
Scott R. Torpey
Taft Stettinius & Hollister - Southfield
contact info
Plaintiff
Chidimma Okocha
Represented By
Victor O. Chukwudelunzu
Law Office Of Victor O. Chukwudelunzu
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, March 17, 2025
15 15 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 03/17 8:34 AM
Marginal Order of Case Dismissal with prejudice. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 3/17/2025. Related Document14 . (S,SR)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
14 14 notice Stipulation (atty event) Fri 03/14 3:00 PM
Proposed Stipulation Stipulated Order of Dismissal With Prejudice and Without Costs to Any Party filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Torpey, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
minutes 1 - Terminate Hearings Order Mon 02/10 12:32 PM
Order: [non-document] The parties have notified the Court that they have reached a settlement and will file a stipulated dismissal within 45 days. The stipulated dismissal shall be filed by March 27, 2025. The case management conference scheduled for 2/18/2025 is hereby canceled pending further order of the Court. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 2/10/2025. (S,SR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
13 13 order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Tue 01/07 10:00 AM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with telephonic case management conference to be held on 2/18/2025 at 01:00 PM. Counsel will receive, via email, instructions on accessing the call prior to the conference. See Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 1/7/2025.(S,SR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/24 10:51 AM
Answer to1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Air France. (Tarney, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
order Order Wed 12/04 8:32 AM
Order: [non-document] approving11 Stipulation of time to answer. Air France answer due December 24, 2024. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 12/4/2024. (S,SR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
11 11 notice Stipulation (atty event) Tue 12/03 5:02 PM
Proposed Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Air France.(Tarney, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, November 08, 2024
10 10 service Return of Service Executed - USA Defendant Fri 11/08 1:57 PM
Return of Service by Process Server executed upon Air France on 10/31/2024 filed on behalf of Chidimma Okocha Related document(s)4 ,1 . (Chukwudelunzu, Victor)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
9 9 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Tue 10/29 4:47 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Endeavor Air, Inc., Other Affiliate Delta Sky Club, Inc., Other Affiliate Delta Sky Club Alaska, LLC, Other Affiliate Epsilon Trading, LLC, Other Affiliate Delta Material Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Delta Receivables, LLC, Other Affiliate Northwest Airlines, LLC, Other Affiliate Delta Flight Products, LLC, Other Affiliate Delta India Investments I, LLC, Other Affiliate Delta India Investments II, LLC, Other Affiliate NW Red Baron LLC, Other Affiliate Aero Assurance, Ltd., Other Affiliate Montana Enterprises, Inc., Other Affiliate New Sky, Ltd., Other Affiliate Delta Professional Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Air4 Passenger Service Systems, LLC, Other Affiliate Delta Vacations, LLC, Other Affiliate Monroe Energy, LLC, Other Affiliate DL International Enterprises, LLC, Other Affiliate SkyMiles Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Delta International Aircraft Leasing Limited, Other Affiliate Delta Air Lines Dublin Limited, Other Affiliate DAL Foreign Holdings CV, Other Affiliate DL Investment Partners, LP, Other Affiliate AM DL MRO JV S.A.P.I. de C.V. Mexico, Other Affiliate Delta Air Lines Private Limited for Delta Airlines, Inc. filed by Delta Airlines, Inc.. (Torpey, Scott)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Tue 10/29 4:34 PM
Attorney Appearance by Derek D. McLeod filed by on behalf of Delta Airlines, Inc.. (McLeod, Derek)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 10/29 4:30 PM
Answer to1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc.s Answer and Affirmative Defenses and Avoidances to Plaintiffs Complaint for Breach of Contract of Carriage Under the Montreal Convention and Reliance Upon Jury Demand filed by Delta Airlines, Inc.. (Torpey, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
6 6 service Return of Service Executed - USA Defendant Fri 10/25 2:13 PM
FILING ERROR, TO BE REFILED Return of Service by via Process Server executed upon Delta Airlines on 10/16/2024 filed on behalf of Chidimma Okocha Related document(s)4 ,1 . (Chukwudelunzu, Victor) Modified text on 10/25/2024 (S,SR)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Return of Service Unexecuted Fri 10/25 12:02 PM
Return of Service unexecuted upon Air France. Service attempted by Via Process Server on 10/17/2024 filed on behalf of Chidimma Okocha Related document(s)4 . (Chukwudelunzu, Victor)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
4 4 oth_evt Summons Issued Thu 10/10 10:27 AM
Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Air France, Delta Airlines, Inc. (H,JL)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
3 3 oth_doc Supplement (atty event) Mon 10/07 10:29 AM
Supplement to Magistrate Consent Form Issued, Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge, Utility Event, Complaint,, - Summons, filed by Chidimma Okocha. Related document(s)2 ,1 .(Chukwudelunzu, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons
2 2 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake Mon 10/07 8:11 AM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not issuable as presented. Attorney to refile. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judge Mon 10/07 7:59 AM
Judge Charles Esque Fleming assigned to case. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Mon 10/07 8:00 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/04 5:17 PM
Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 405, Receipt number AOHNDC-12771435.. Filed by Chidimma Okocha. (Chukwudelunzu, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit Round Trip Ticket issued to Plaintiff by Defendants,
Att: 4 Exhibit Boarding Passes issued to Plaintiff by Defendants,
Att: 5 Exhibit Reference Numbers for Delayed Luggage issued to Plaintiff by Defendants