California Southern District Court
Judge:Todd W Robinson
Referred: Karen S Crawford
Case #: 3:24-cv-01767
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1441fl Removal- Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Oct 03, 2024
Terminated:Mar 17, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, 24CU005474C
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 01, 2025 1:20 AM PDT
Defendant
Does 1-10
Defendant
Driftwood Hospitality Management II, LLC
Represented By
Marco Garcia
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Maia Mdinaradze
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Andrea Faye Oxman
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Cherish Iler
Represented By
Shaheen Anthony Etemadi
Manahan O'Dell LLP
contact info
Amanda E. Manahan
Manahan Flashman & Brandon
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, March 17, 2025
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 03/17 11:36 AM
ORDER granting11 ,12 Joint Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 3/17/2025. (sjt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
12 12 motion Dismiss Wed 03/12 4:55 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Driftwood Hospitality Management II, LLC. (Mdinaradze, Maia)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Dismiss Wed 03/12 2:41 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Driftwood Hospitality Management II, LLC. (Mdinaradze, Maia)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
10 10 minutes ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Terminate Hearings Mon 02/03 4:01 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: A settlement has been reached in this case with respect to all claims and all parties. Doc. No. 9. The attorneys must appear for a telephonic Settlement Disposition Conference ("SDC") on April 11, 2025 , at 9:30 a.m. unless a joint motion for dismissal is filed with the Court, and a separate proposed order for dismissal is e-mailed to the district judge's e-mail address, prior to the SDC. To participate in the conference, counsel must dial 1-669-254-5252 and enter Meeting ID 161 634 0675. Participants will remain on hold until prompted to enter the passcode 953664, when the Court activates the call. The SDC will be vacated if the parties file the appropriate dismissal papers beforehand. The March 14, 2025 Status Conference and April 16, 2025 Mandatory Settlement Conference are vacated.(no document attached) (kxb)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 02/03 1:20 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Cherish Iler (Etemadi, Shaheen) (sjt)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
8 8 order Scheduling Order Mon 11/18 3:50 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/14/2025 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 4/16/2025 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 1/2/2026. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/22/2026. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/29/2026 01:30 PM before Judge Todd W. Robinson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 11/18/2024.(sjt)
Related: [-]
7 7 minutes Early Neutral Evaluation Conference Case Management Conference Mon 11/18 3:25 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference held on 11/14/2024. Scheduling Order issued. (Plaintiff Attorneys Amanda E. Manahan & Shaheen A. Etemadi). (Defendant Attorney Maia Mdinaradze). (no document attached) (kxb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
6 6 notice Joint Discovery Plan Thu 11/07 12:40 PM
JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Cherish Iler, Driftwood Hospitality Management II, LLC (Garcia, Marco)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
5 5 5 pgs order Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Fri 10/04 2:17 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference Early Neutral Evaluation set for 11/14/2024 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2024 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Joint Discovery Plan due 11/7/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 10/4/2024.(sjt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Thu 10/03 4:30 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Driftwood Hospitality Management II, LLC. Identifying Other Affiliate DHM Holdings, LP, Other Affiliate DHM Holdings, PG, LLC for Driftwood Hospitality Management II, LLC. (axi)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 10/03 4:27 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Driftwood Hospitality Management II, LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (axi)
Related: [-]
2 2 respoth Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Thu 10/03 4:25 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Driftwood Hospitality Management II, LLC. (axi)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 10/03 4:24 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-19238331.), filed by Driftwood Hospitality Management II, LLC. The new case number is 3:24-cv-1767-TWR-KSC. Judge Todd W. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case.(axi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Declaration of Andrea F. Oxman,
Att: 3 Declaration of Nasima Baerde,
Att: 4 28 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 5 Exhibit B,
Att: 6 Exhibit C,
Att: 7 Exhibit D