Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:24-mj-08391
Case Filed:Oct 01, 2024
Last checked: Friday Oct 04, 2024 12:49 AM MST
Defendant
Noel Quiroz-Garcia (1)
Represented By
Gregory Solares
Law Office Of Gregory Solares PC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jose Ruben Solis, Jr.
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/04/2024 3:00 AM MST
Monday, September 30, 2024
Arrest of Noel Quiroz-Garcia on 9/30/2024. (SGG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Noel Quiroz-Garcia. (SGG)
Related: [-]