Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00423
Case Filed:Oct 01, 2024
Last checked: Friday Oct 04, 2024 2:29 AM CDT
Defendant
Alex Aguirre (3)
Defendant
Raymundo Bernal Saucedo (1)
Represented By
James Max Kennedy
Schaffer Kennedy Johnson
contact info
Defendant
Jairo Villa Velasquez (2)
Represented By
Hugo Aguilar
Law Office Of Hugo Aguilar PC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
John Kull-DOJ
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/04/2024 4:25 AM CDT
Thursday, September 05, 2024
Arrest of Raymundo Bernal Saucedo. (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00855-BK]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION for Detention and MOTION to Continue Detention Hearing filed by USA as to Raymundo Bernal Saucedo. (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00855-BK]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
4 4 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver: Initial Appearance as to Raymundo Bernal Saucedo held on 9/9/2024. Date of Arrest: 9/5/2024. Defendant refused to fill out a financial affidavit. Expressed his intent to hire private counsel. The court has continued both Detention and Preliminary Hearings to 9/16/2024 10am before Judge McKay. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - John Kull; Defense - NA. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :05. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (Interpreter Yovana Gonzalez.) (USPO Acosta.) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00855-BK]
Related: [-]
5 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting3 Motion to Continue as to Raymundo Bernal Saucedo (1). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 9/9/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00855-BK]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Raymundo Bernal Saucedo. Detention/PC Hearing set for 9/16/2024 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1566, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before US Magistrate Judge Brian W McKay. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 9/9/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00855-BK]
Related: [-]
7 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER As to Raymundo Bernal Saucedo: by this order -- issued to the prosecution and defense counsel -- the court confirms the disclosure obligation of the prosecutor under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and the possible consequences of violating such order under applicable law. This written order is entered pursuant to Rule 5(f)(1) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, and is in addition to the oral order entered by the court on the first scheduled court date when both the prosecutor and defense counsel were present. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 9/9/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00855-BK]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
8 8 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 9/4/2024 as to Raymundo Bernal Saucedo. (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00855-BK]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
9 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James Max Kennedy (Clerk to Set Designation as: Retained) appearing for Raymundo Bernal Saucedo (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (If sealed documents that you are authorized to see were previously filed by U.S. Pretrial Services or U.S. Probation, you will require assistance to gain access to them and any related filings. Please call the clerk at 214.753.2240 during business hours to request access.) (Kennedy, James) [3:24-mj-00855-BK]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
10 10 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Brian W McKay: Detention and Preliminary Hearing not held on 9/16/2024 as to Raymundo Bernal Saucedo. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - John Kull; Defense - James Kennedy. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :04. (Court Reporter: Debbie Kriegshauser) (Interpreter Yovana Gonzalez.) (USPO Acosta.) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00855-BK]
Related: [-]
11 11 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Raymundo Bernal Saucedo. (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00855-BK]
Related: [-]
12 12 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Raymundo Bernal Saucedo. (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00855-BK]
Related: [-]
13 13 DETENTION ORDER Raymundo Bernal Saucedo. (Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Brian W McKay on 9/16/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00855-BK]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
1 1 6 pgs SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until the defendant has been arrested/appeared.) as to Jairo Villa Velasquez (1). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (kaf) [3:24-mj-00897-BW]
Related: [-]
2 2 *** Arrest Warrant Issued in case as to Jairo Villa Velasquez. Excludable XM Started. (kaf) [3:24-mj-00897-BW]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION for Detention, MOTION to Continue () filed by USA as to Jairo Villa Velasquez. (kaf) [3:24-mj-00897-BW]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
4 4 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Brian W McKay: Initial Appearance as to Jairo Villa Velasquez held on 9/27/2024. The judge issued the oral order required by Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)(1). Written order to follow.Date of Arrest: 9/27/2024. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Ted Hocter; Defense - Hugo Aguilar. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :09. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (Interpreter Alma Adriano.) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00897-BW]
Related: [-]
5 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER As to Jairo Villa Velasquez: by this order -- issued to the prosecution and defense counsel -- the court confirms the disclosure obligation of the prosecutor under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and the possible consequences of violating such order under applicable law. This written order is entered pursuant to Rule 5(f)(1) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, and is in addition to the oral order entered by the court on the first scheduled court date when both the prosecutor and defense counsel were present. (Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Brian W McKay on 9/27/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00897-BW]
Related: [-]
6 6 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jairo Villa Velasquez. (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00897-BW]
Related: [-]
7 7 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Hugo Aguilar for Jairo Villa Velasquez appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Brian W McKay on 9/27/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00897-BW]
Related: [-]
8 8 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Jairo Villa Velasquez. (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00897-BW]
Related: [-]
9 9 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Jairo Villa Velasquez. (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00897-BW]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Jairo Villa Velasquez. (Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Brian W McKay on 9/27/2024) (mcrd) [3:24-mj-00897-BW]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
14 14 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by James M. Kennedy filed by Raymundo Bernal Saucedo (Kennedy, James) [3:24-mj-00855-BK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
15 15 9 pgs INDICTMENT with Forfeiture Notice as to Raymundo Bernal Saucedo (1) count(s) 1, 2-4, 5, Jairo Villa Velasquez (2) count(s) 1, 4, 5, Alex Aguirre (3) count(s) 1, 3. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (kcr)
Related: [-]