Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Robin L Rosenberg
Referred: Bruce E Reinhart
Case #: 9:24-cv-81229
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2024
Terminated:Jan 24, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 02, 2025 5:32 AM EDT
Defendant
High Risk Enforcement LLC
Represented By
Benjamin R. Dishowitz
Doumar, Allsworth, LLP
contact info
Mediator
Robyn S. Hankins
Robyn S. Hankins, PL 4600 Military Trail #217
Jupiter, FL 33458
Plaintiff
Sadaria Haliburton
Represented By
Andres Kroboth
Richard Celler Legal
contact info
Noah E Storch
Richard Celler Legal, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 27 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
20 20 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Tue 02/25 12:13 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Sadaria Haliburton (Storch, Noah)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
19 19 1 pgs order Order Staying Case Fri 01/24 2:56 PM
ORDER STAYING CASE AND DIRECTING THE CLERK OF THE COURT TO CLOSE THIS CASE FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 1/24/2025. See attached document for full details. (gqa)
Related: [-]
18 18 adr Mediation Report Fri 01/24 9:26 AM
FINAL MEDIATION REPORT held before Mediator Robyn Hankins. Prepared by: Robyn Hankins. Filed by Robyn S. Hankins. Disposition: Settled in full. Mediation held/partially held via video-conference. (Hankins, Robyn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
17 17 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Thu 12/12 11:56 AM
Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Robyn S. Hankins as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 1/22/2025 at 10:00 a.m.. (Kroboth, Andres)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
16 16 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Fri 11/22 1:35 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER re15 Telephonic Status Conference. Counsel and parties shall appear by using the following conference call instructions: Dial 1-833-435-1820; Enter meeting ID 160 225 1740#; and Enter security code 576690#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 11/22/2024. (vbi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
15 15 order Scheduling Order Wed 11/20 10:41 AM
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE: Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/9/2025 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Status Report due by 5/2/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 11/20/2024. See attached document for full details. (gqa)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
14 14 order Scheduling Order Tue 11/19 8:20 AM
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE,CALENDAR CALL, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, ANDTRIAL DATE, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MEDIATION Fact Discovery due by 6/9/2025. Expert Discovery due by 6/9/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 7/7/2025. Jury Trial set for 10/6/2025 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. Calendar Call set for 10/1/2025 10:30 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. Status Conference set for 8/20/2025 10:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 11/18/2024. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 10/31 4:04 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by High Risk Enforcement LLC. Attorney Benjamin R. Dishowitz added to party High Risk Enforcement LLC(pty:dft). (Dishowitz, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
12 12 notice Clerk's Notice - Attorney Admissions Tue 10/22 2:48 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the address information as submitted through attorneys PACER account for attorney Noah E. Storch (pt)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of CHANGE OF ADDRESS, Email or Law Firm Name Fri 10/18 3:14 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information; by Andres Kroboth (Kroboth, Andres)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of CHANGE OF ADDRESS, Email or Law Firm Name Fri 10/18 3:14 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information; by Noah E Storch (Storch, Noah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
9 9 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Thu 10/10 2:43 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Sadaria Haliburton. High Risk Enforcement LLC served on 10/7/2024, response/answer due 10/28/2024. (Storch, Noah)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 10/10 11:23 AM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sadaria Haliburton (Kroboth, Andres)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions Thu 10/10 11:22 AM
Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Sadaria Haliburton (Kroboth, Andres)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 10/10 11:22 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andres Kroboth on behalf of Sadaria Haliburton. Attorney Andres Kroboth added to party Sadaria Haliburton(pty:pla). (Kroboth, Andres)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
5 5 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Mon 10/07 7:43 AM
STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 10/4/2024. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-]
4 4 3 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 10/04 11:40 AM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGEAND ORDER OF COURT-MANDATED REQUIREMENTS ONSERVICE, DEFAULTS, AND JOINT SCHEDULING REPORTS, REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for discovery. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/4/2024. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 10/04 9:13 AM
Summons Issued as to High Risk Enforcement LLC. (gqa)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 10/04 9:08 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (gqa)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/04 8:54 AM
COMPLAINT against High Risk Enforcement LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17885311, filed by Sadaria Haliburton.(Storch, Noah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s),
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet