Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-20336

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:24-bk-20337
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2024
Claims Deadline:Dec 13, 2024
Terminated:Dec 06, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Kentucky Apple LLC
Three Brickell City Centre 98 Southeast Seventh Suite 1100
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Eyal Berger, Esq.
Akerman LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130


Docket last updated: 50 minutes ago
Sunday, December 08, 2024
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 12/09 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 12/08/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Notice and Acknowledgment from Western District of Louisiana (Lafayette) of Receipt of Case Number: 24-51061 JWK
Friday, December 06, 2024
21 21 court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 12/06 10:40 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
20 20 court Notice of Transfer of Case [With New Case Number] Fri 12/06 10:39 AM
Notice and Acknowledgment from Western District of Louisiana (Lafayette) of Receipt of Case Number: 24-51061 JWK (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
19 19 3 pgs order Order Transferring Case Out Wed 11/20 10:59 AM
Order Transferring Case To Western District of Louisiana. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
18 18 trustee Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded [PAPERLESS] Wed 11/06 12:35 PM
Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee. (Schneiderman, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
17 17 misc Schedules/Statements or Amended Schedules/Statements Wed 10/30 9:35 PM
Initial Schedules Filed: [Summary of Your Assets/Liabilities,Schedule A/B,Schedule D,Schedule E/F,Schedule G,Schedule H,Statement of Financial Affairs,Declaration re Schedules,] Filed by Debtor Kentucky Apple LLC. (Berger, Eyal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Local Form 4
Thursday, October 10, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 10/10 3:29 PM
Order Granting Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules, Declaration Concerning Schedules, and Statement of Financial Affairs. (Rodriguez, Olga)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 10/10 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/09/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Notice of Incomplete Filings Due Required Chapter 11 Case Management Summary. Chapter 11 debtors (other than individuals not engaged in business) must file Local Form "Chapter 11 Case Management Summary" on the earlier of three business days after the petition date, or one business day before the first scheduled hearing on any motion. [See Local Rule 2081-1(B)]. Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 10/18/2024. Schedule A/B due 10/18/2024. Schedule D due 10/18/2024. Schedule E/F due 10/18/2024. Schedule G due 10/18/2024. Schedule H due 10/18/2024.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 10/18/2024.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 10/18/2024. [Incomplete Filings due by 10/18/2024].
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 10/10 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/09/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business, Close Pre-Petition Bank Accounts, and Open Debtor in Possession Bank Accounts . (Rodriguez, Olga)
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Thu 10/10 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/09/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 11/6/2024 at 12:00 PM by TELEPHONE [See Meeting Notice for details]. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 1/6/2025. Proofs of Claim due by 12/13/2024.
Monday, October 07, 2024
12 12 court Meeting of Creditors 11 Mon 10/07 4:23 PM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 11/6/2024 at 12:00 PM by TELEPHONE [See Meeting Notice for details]. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 1/6/2025. Proofs of Claim due by 12/13/2024. (Covington, Katrinka)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Joint Administration Order Mon 10/07 3:22 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration on Lead Case 24-20336 RAM with Member Case 24-20337 RAM Related [+] (Covington, Katrinka)
Related: [-] # 7
10 10 court Notice of Deficiency Mon 10/07 10:50 AM
Notice of Incomplete Filings Due Required Chapter 11 Case Management Summary. Chapter 11 debtors (other than individuals not engaged in business) must file Local Form "Chapter 11 Case Management Summary" on the earlier of three business days after the petition date, or one business day before the first scheduled hearing on any motion. [See Local Rule 2081-1(B)]. Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 10/18/2024. Schedule A/B due 10/18/2024. Schedule D due 10/18/2024. Schedule E/F due 10/18/2024. Schedule G due 10/18/2024. Schedule H due 10/18/2024.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 10/18/2024.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 10/18/2024. [Incomplete Filings due by 10/18/2024]. (Rodriguez, Olga)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business Mon 10/07 10:44 AM
Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business, Close Pre-Petition Bank Accounts, and Open Debtor in Possession Bank Accounts . (Rodriguez, Olga)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
8 8 misc Case Management Summary Fri 10/04 4:02 PM
Ch 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Debtor Kentucky Apple LLC. (Berger, Eyal)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Joint Administration Fri 10/04 3:42 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Jointly Administer Case(s) 24-20337 24-20340 24-20341 into Lead Case 24-20336 Filed by Debtor Kentucky Apple LLC (Berger, Eyal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
6 6 notice Notice of Filing Fri 10/04 2:16 PM
Notice of Filing Certificate of Relatedness , Filed by Debtor Kentucky Apple LLC. (Berger, Eyal)
Related: [-]
5 5 attydoc Disclosure of Compensation Fri 10/04 12:51 PM
Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney Eyal Berger Esq.. (Berger, Eyal)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Fri 10/04 12:50 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor Kentucky Apple LLC. (Berger, Eyal)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Equity Security Holders Fri 10/04 12:49 PM
Equity Security Holders Filed by Debtor Kentucky Apple LLC. (Berger, Eyal)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Document Fri 10/04 12:47 PM
Declaration with Chapter 11 List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Filed by Debtor Kentucky Apple LLC. (Berger, Eyal)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Ch 11 [ECF] Fri 10/04 12:41 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1738] Proofs of Claim due by 12/13/2024. (Berger, Eyal)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 10/04 12:43 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-20337 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A44936468. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]