Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Amos L Mazzant
Case #: 4:24-cv-00885
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 02, 2025 4:35 AM CDT
Amicus
First Liberty Institute
2001 W. Plano Pkwy. Suite 1600
Plano, TX 75075
Represented By
Justin Edward Butterfield
Butterfield & Patterson
contact info
Lea Elyse Patterson
Butterfield & Patterson PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Robert Morris
Represented By
Elisha Jonathan Kobre
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Stuart Lee Cochran
Condon Tobin Sladek Thornton Nerenberg
contact info
Jason Christopher Hoggan
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton Llp - Dallas
contact info
William Bryan Mateja
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton Llp - Dallas
contact info
Blake Evan Mattingly
Condon Tobin Sladek Thornton Nerenberg PLLC
contact info
Aaron Zachary Tobin
Condon Tobin Sladek Thornton Nerenberg PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Steve Dulin
Defendant
Gateway Church
Represented By
Taryn McKenzie McDonald
Haynes And Boone, LLP
contact info
Wendi Hodges
Middlebrook Group, PLLC
contact info
Justin Manchester
Haynes And Boone LLP
contact info
Allen Ryan Paulsen
Haynes And Boone, LLP
contact info
Brad Foster
Haynes And Boone, LLP
contact info
Shari Dana Goggin
Resnick & Louis, P.C.
contact info
Ronald Wayne Breaux
Haynes And Boone, LLP
contact info
Roger Strassburg
Resnick & Louis, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Browder
Represented By
Melissa Richards Smith
Gillam & Smith, LLP
contact info
Lu Pham
Pham Harrison LLP
contact info
Caroline C Harrison
Dowell Pham Harrison, LLP
contact info
Timothy Micah Dortch
Dortch Lindstrom Livingston Law Group
contact info
Lance L. Livingston
Dortch Lindstrom Livingston Law Group
contact info
Plaintiff
Terri Browder
Represented By
Melissa Richards Smith
Gillam & Smith, LLP
contact info
Lu Pham
Pham Harrison LLP
contact info
Caroline C Harrison
Dowell Pham Harrison, LLP
contact info
Timothy Micah Dortch
Dortch Lindstrom Livingston Law Group
contact info
Lance L. Livingston
Dortch Lindstrom Livingston Law Group
contact info
Plaintiff
Garry K. Leach
Represented By
Melissa Richards Smith
Gillam & Smith, LLP
contact info
Lu Pham
Pham Harrison LLP
contact info
Caroline C Harrison
Dowell Pham Harrison, LLP
contact info
Timothy Micah Dortch
Dortch Lindstrom Livingston Law Group
contact info
Lance L. Livingston
Dortch Lindstrom Livingston Law Group
contact info
Plaintiff
Katherine Leach
Represented By
Melissa Richards Smith
Gillam & Smith, LLP
contact info
Lu Pham
Pham Harrison LLP
contact info
Caroline C Harrison
Dowell Pham Harrison, LLP
contact info
Timothy Micah Dortch
Dortch Lindstrom Livingston Law Group
contact info
Lance L. Livingston
Dortch Lindstrom Livingston Law Group
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Kevin L. Grove
Terminated: 03/07/2025
Represented By
Charles M Kibler, Jr.
The Kibler Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Thomas M. Lane
Terminated: 03/20/2025
Represented By
David R Joe
Anthony & Middlebrook, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
74 74 motion Protective Order Fri 05/02 5:08 PM
AGREED MOTION for Protective Order by Gateway Church.(Breaux, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order
73 73 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 05/02 10:48 AM
ORDER granting72 Motion to Stay All Deadlines. Signed by Chief District Judge Amos L Mazzant on 5/2/2025. (jmb)
Related: [-]