Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Julie S Sneed
Referred: Embry J Kidd
Case #: 6:24-cv-01803
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
CauseAmericans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2024
Terminated:Dec 13, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 02, 2025 5:41 AM EDT
Defendant
Summit Hotel TRS 048, LLC
Represented By
Kevin Michael Young
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Howard Cohan
Represented By
Gregory Steven Sconzo
Sconzo Law Office, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, April 10, 2025
22 22 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 04/10 11:07 AM
Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal by Howard Cohan. (Sconzo, Gregory) Modified docket text on 4/10/2025 (JOS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
21 21 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 04/02 5:49 PM
ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot 18 the parties' Joint Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal in light of 19 the parties' Second Joint Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal; granting 19 the parties' Second Joint Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal. On or before April 11, 2025, the parties shall file their dismissal documents. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on 4/2/2025. (ADH)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
20 20 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 03/17 11:12 AM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 6:24-cv-1803-JSS-UAM. Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd no longer assigned to the case. (CTR)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Fri 03/14 8:58 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Closing Documents Second by Howard Cohan. (Sconzo, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Mon 02/10 5:09 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal by Howard Cohan. (Sconzo, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
17 17 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 12/13 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 12/13 11:05 AM
60-Day ORDER. Any pending motions are DENIED as moot and the Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate all deadlines and close this case. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on 12/13/2024. (ADH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of settlement Wed 12/11 11:36 AM
NOTICE of settlement by Howard Cohan (Sconzo, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 12/02 10:58 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 13 Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. On or before December 13, 2024, Defendant shall respond to 1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on 12/2/2024. (ADH)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Mon 11/25 2:38 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint UNOPPOSED by Summit Hotel TRS 048, LLC.(Young, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, November 11, 2024
12 12 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Mon 11/11 10:33 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Summit Hotel TRS 048, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Summit Hotel TRS, Inc. for Summit Hotel TRS 048, LLC.. (Young, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 10/29 5:27 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 10 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. On or before November 29, 2024, Defendant shall respond to 1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on 10/29/2024. (ADH)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Mon 10/28 11:01 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Summit Hotel TRS 048, LLC.(Young, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
9 9 respoth Answer to court interrogatories Wed 10/23 9:20 AM
ANSWER to court interrogatories by Howard Cohan.(Sconzo, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Monday, October 21, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of a Related Action Mon 10/21 10:50 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Howard Cohan. Related case(s): No (Sconzo, Gregory)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 10/21 10:41 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Howard Cohan. (Sconzo, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
6 6 service Summons returned executed Fri 10/11 2:45 PM
RETURN of service executed on 10/09/2024 by Howard Cohan as to Summit Hotel TRS 048, LLC. (Sconzo, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
5 5 order Case Management Scheduling Order Tue 10/08 2:29 PM
ADA SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on 10/8/2024. (GNB)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
4 4 service Summons issued Mon 10/07 3:07 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Summit Hotel TRS 048, LLC. (MLB)
Related: [-]
3 3 15 pgs order Order Mon 10/07 11:23 AM
INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on 10/7/2024. (GNB)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 10/04 1:57 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Julie S. Sneed and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:24-cv-01803-JSS-EJK. (JOS)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 10/04 12:27 PM
COMPLAINT against Summit Hotel TRS 048, LLC (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22589966) filed by Howard Cohan.(Sconzo, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons