California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando M Olguin
Referred: Patricia Donahue
Case #: 2:24-cv-08550
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2024
Terminated:Dec 09, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 02, 2025 2:32 AM PDT
Defendant
Merrick B. Garland
Represented By
Oil Appellate
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
Represented By
Oil Appellate
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By
Oil Appellate
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Defendant
David M. Radel
Represented By
Oil Appellate
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Defendant
USCIS
Represented By
Oil Appellate
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Plaintiff
Sergey Akopyan
Represented By
Sassoun A Nalbandian
Nalbandian Law Apc
contact info
Sassoun A. Nalbandian
Nalbandian Law Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, December 09, 2024
11 11 motion Dismiss Case Mon 12/09 3:41 PM
First REQUEST to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Sergey Akopyan. (Nalbandian, Sassoun)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
10 10 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Fri 10/11 12:05 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sergey Akopyan, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (Nalbandian, Sassoun)
Related: [-]
9 9 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 10/11 11:45 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
8 8 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89) Tue 10/08 2:13 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge George H Wu. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge George H Wu to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-08550 FMO(PDx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
4 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties2 filed by plaintiff SERGEY AKOPYAN. (Nalbandian, Sassoun)
Related: [-]
3 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff SERGEY AKOPYAN. (Nalbandian, Sassoun)
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff SERGEY AKOPYAN, (Nalbandian, Sassoun)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38341930 - Fee: $405, filed by plaintiff SERGEY AKOPYAN. (Attorney Sassoun A Nalbandian added to party SERGEY AKOPYAN(pty:pla))(Nalbandian, Sassoun)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D