District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Jia M Cobb
Case #: 1:24-cv-02836
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
CausePetition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2024
Terminated:Apr 11, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 02, 2025 5:33 AM EDT
Defendant
ANTONY BLINKEN
Represented By
Christina Greer
Us Department Of Justice, Civil Division
contact info
Jessica Dawgert
Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By
Christina Greer
Us Department Of Justice, Civil Division
contact info
Jessica Dawgert
Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Represented By
Christina Greer
Us Department Of Justice, Civil Division
contact info
Jessica Dawgert
Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS
Represented By
Christina Greer
Us Department Of Justice, Civil Division
contact info
Jessica Dawgert
Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
AMR MOHAMMED ALI MUGAIDEA
Represented By
Daniel Joseph Porcerelli
Elsharnoby & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
FAHMI MOHAMMED ALI MUGAIDEA
Represented By
Daniel Joseph Porcerelli
Elsharnoby & Associates
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
MAJID MOHAMMED ALI MUGAIDEA
Terminated: 01/07/2025
Represented By
Daniel Joseph Porcerelli
Elsharnoby & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
SARAH MOHAMMED ALI MUGAIDEA
Terminated: 01/07/2025
Represented By
Daniel Joseph Porcerelli
Elsharnoby & Associates
contact info

GPO Apr 11 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION re 10 Motion to Dismiss. See document for details. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on April 11, 2025. (lcjmc2)

Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 11, 2025
12 12 order .Order Fri 04/11 12:53 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Dismiss, without prejudice, as conceded. See document for details. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on April 11, 2025. (lcjmc2)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Fri 04/11 12:52 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION re10 Motion to Dismiss. See document for details. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on April 11, 2025. (lcjmc2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
10 10 motion Dismiss Wed 03/19 10:33 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, ANTONY BLINKEN.(Dawgert, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support memorandum in support,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, Dus Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, Hoatson Declaration,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order proposed order
Friday, February 28, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 02/28 3:31 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer: Having considered the motion, and for good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the motion. It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' complaint by March 20, 2025. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on February 28, 2025. (lcjmc2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 02/27 9:50 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re5 Amended Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, ANTONY BLINKEN.(Dawgert, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order
Friday, January 31, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 01/31 10:25 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer: Having considered the motion, and for good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the motion. It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' complaint by March 6, 2025. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on January 31, 2025. (lcjmc2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 01/30 2:21 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re5 Amended Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, ANTONY BLINKEN.(Dawgert, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/29 5:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Dawgert on behalf of All Defendants (Dawgert, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 01/14 12:25 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting6 Consent Motion for Leave to file Amended Complaint and for Extension of Time: Having considered the motion, and for good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the motion for leave to file an amended complaint nunc pro tunc , and GRANTS the motion for extension of time to file an answer. It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs'5 amended complaint by February 4, 2025. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on January 14, 2025. (lcjmc2)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
6 6 motion Leave to File Document Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 01/13 6:37 PM
Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint , Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re5 Amended Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, ANTONY BLINKEN. (Greer, Christina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 01/07 10:31 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by AMR MOHAMMED ALI MUGAIDEA, FAHMI MOHAMMED ALI MUGAIDEA.(Porcerelli, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/17 1:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Greer on behalf of All Defendants (Greer, Christina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Wed 10/23 12:59 PM
SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to ANTONY BLINKEN, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(zmtm) Modified on 10/23/2024 as to the number of summons issued (zmtm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 10/23 12:53 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. (zmtm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
2 2 misc Errata Tue 10/22 12:44 PM
ERRATA by AMR MOHAMMED ALI MUGAIDEA, FAHMI MOHAMMED ALI MUGAIDEA, MAJID MOHAMMED ALI MUGAIDEA, SARAH MOHAMMED ALI MUGAIDEA. (Porcerelli, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
notice Notice of Error- New Case Mon 10/21 2:09 PM
NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR regarding1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus,. The following error(s) need correction: Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file a Notice of Errata stating the error and attach the corrected initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party and file using the event Errata. SECOND NOTICE. Continued non-compliance will result in an Order to Show Cause and/or dismissal of case. (zmtm)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Mandamus Fri 10/04 3:22 PM
PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11211351) filed by AMR MOHAMMED ALI MUGAIDEA, FAHMI MOHAMMED ALI MUGAIDEA, MAJID MOHAMMED ALI MUGAIDEA, SARAH MOHAMMED ALI MUGAIDEA.(Porcerelli, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits for writ of mandamus,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet,
Att: 3 Summons Summons for all defendants
notice Notice of Error- New Case Fri 10/04 4:08 PM
NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR The following error(s) need correction: Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file a Notice of Errata stating the error and attach the corrected initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party and file using the event Errata. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zmtm)
Related: [-]