California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando M Olguin
Referred: A Joel Richlin
Case #: 2:24-cv-08555
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2024
Terminated:Feb 14, 2025
Case in other court:Los Angeles Superior Court, 24STCV19095
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 02, 2025 2:33 AM PDT
Defendant
Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.
Represented By
Mellania E. Safarian
Wilson Turner Kosmo LLP
contact info
Leticia C Butler
Wilson Turner Kosmo LLP
contact info
Leticia C Stevens
Wilson Turner Kosmo LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Alireza Alivandivafa
Represented By
Alireza Alivandivafa
Law Offices Of Alireza Alivandivafa
contact info
Plaintiff
Gina Golde
Represented By
Brian I. Vogel
Vogel Law Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order Wed 03/12 3:37 PM
ORDER ON STIPULATION17 GRANTING DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
17 17 stip Dismiss Case Wed 03/05 12:09 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Settlement reached filed by Defendant Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc..(Safarian, Mellania)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
16 16 order Dismissing Case Fri 02/14 1:51 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin, Re: Mediation Report15 .(Case Terminated; Made JS-6) (vdr)
Related: [-]
15 15 adr Mediation Report (ADR-3) Completely Settled Fri 02/14 10:05 AM
MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Alireza Alivandivafa: Mediation held on 2/13/2025 and the case has been completely settled. With the filing of this Report, the parties are advised that they must notify the trial judge's deputy courtroom clerk of the fact of settlement and to promptly file documents regarding the final disposition of the case. Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link:[LINK:MediationParticipantSurvey] (Alivandivafa, Alireza)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
14 14 attorney Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06) Wed 02/05 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Leticia Stevens counsel for Defendant Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. Changing Attorney Name to Leticia C. Stevens. Changing e-mail to lstevens@wilsonturnerkosmo.com. Filed by Defendant Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. (Stevens, Leticia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
13 13 adr Notice of Mediation Date (ADR-13) Wed 01/29 1:31 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATION DATE filed. Mediation set for 2/13/2025.(Alivandivafa, Alireza)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
12 12 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form Thu 12/05 7:24 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Alireza Alivandivafa has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
11 11 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 11/04 9:58 AM
ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
Related: [-]
10 10 18 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Mon 11/04 9:55 AM
SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the hearing. Jury Trial set for 9/9/2025 at 9:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See order for dates, deadlines and requirements imposed.* (vdr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
9 9 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Thu 10/31 12:23 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Defendant Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc... (Butler, Leticia)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
8 8 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 10/11 12:05 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 11/14/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
Related: [-]
7 7 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 10/11 12:03 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
6 6 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89) Wed 10/09 3:24 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-08555 FMO(AJRx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 10/08 12:47 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 10/08 12:47 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin. (car)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
3 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., identifying York Risk Services Group, Inc.; Sedgwick, L.P.; Sedgwick Holdings, Inc.; Lightning Cayman Merger Sub, Ltd.; Stone Point Capital; Caisse de dpt et placement du Qubec (CDPQ); The Carlyle Group; Onex Corporation.(Butler, Leticia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc..(Butler, Leticia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 24STCV19095 Receipt No: ACACDC-38342479 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. (Attorney Leticia C Butler added to party Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Butler, Leticia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Leticia C. Butler,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Leticia C. Butler,
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Leticia C. Butler,
Att: 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Leticia C. Butler,
Att: 5 Declaration of Doug Foster,
Att: 6 Certificate of Service
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Tue 10/08 1:14 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-100 Inclusive, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Gina Golde. Filed in State Court on 7/31/2024 Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]
othcmp Amended Complaint Tue 10/08 1:27 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT against Defendant Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by plaintiff Gina Golde. The plaintiff, having designated a defendant in the complaint by the incorrect name of: Sedgewick Claims Management Services, Inc. and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be: Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. amends the complaint [Filed in State Court on 8/28/2024 Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Tue 10/08 1:58 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. Filed in State Court on 10/1/2024 Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal1 .(car) Modified on 10/8/2024 (car)
Related: [-]