New York Northern District Court
Judge:Mae A D'Agostino
Referred: Miroslav Lovric
Case #: 5:24-cv-01221
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/29 9:32 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mary Ellen Gill on behalf of Nicole Elizabeth O'Dett (Gill, Mary Ellen)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
11 11 order Order on Letter Request Mon 03/17 8:07 AM
TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion10 is GRANTED insofar as and to the extent that Plaintiff is directed to file a brief by 5/23/2025. No further extensions will be granted. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 3/17/2025. (jdc )
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 15, 2025
10 10 motion Letter Request/Motion Sat 03/15 12:46 PM
Consent Letter Motion from Justin Goldstein for Nicole Elizabeth O'Dett requesting an extension of time from March 24, 2025 through May 23, 2025 to file Plaintiffs Social Security Brief . (Goldstein, Justin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
9 9 misc Social Security Administrative Record / Transcript Wed 02/05 7:13 AM
Social Security Administrative Record / Transcript. Plaintiff Brief due by 3/24/2025. (Norwood, Vernon)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Letter Request Fri 01/03 3:07 PM
ORDER granting7 Letter Request. Social Security Administrative Transcript due is now on or before 2/5/2025.Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 1/3/2025. (jdc )
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Letter Request/Motion Fri 01/03 2:35 PM
Letter Motion from Vernon Norwood for Martin J. O'Malley requesting 30-day Extension submitted to Judge Miroslav Lovric . (Norwood, Vernon)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
6 6 order Order Mon 10/07 8:35 AM
TEXT ORDER: Defendant is directed to produce a Social Security Administrative Record/Transcript such that the bookmarks in the Social Security Administrative Record/Transcript are complete, in that, the entire transcript is linked to the index. The defendant shall produce a transcript that includes bookmarks for all of the exhibits in the administrative record, including all of the medical records. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 10/7/2024. (jdc)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 06, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Initial Attorney Appearance - Commissioner Sun 10/06 7:41 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - COMMISSIONER: Vernon Norwood appearing for Commissioner of Social Security. Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 1/6/2025. (Norwood, Vernon)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
4 4 misc G.O. 18 & SSA Case Assignment Form Fri 10/04 4:34 PM
General Order #18 Issued. (ztc)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Consent / Declination Form Fri 10/04 4:34 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY CONSENT / DECLINATION FORM filed by Nicole Elizabeth O'Dett advising of declination of consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (ztc)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Social Security Identification Form - [LODGED] Fri 10/04 4:33 PM
Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited] . (ztc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmpssa Complaint - Social Security Appeal Fri 10/04 4:32 PM
COMPLAINT - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 2(A), 2(B) and 2(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.] (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6891201).(ztc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Notice of Decision-Unfavorable,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Notice of Appeals Council Action,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet