New York Southern District Court
Judge:Mary Kay Vyskocil
Case #: 1:24-cv-07551
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2024
Terminated:Feb 26, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 02, 2025 5:46 AM EDT
Defendant
Genius Group Limited
Represented By
David S. Hoffner
Hoffner PLLC
contact info
David Scott Hoffner
Hoffner PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Roger Hamilton
Represented By
David S. Hoffner
Hoffner PLLC
contact info
Defendant
LZG International, Inc.
Represented By
John E Parker
John E. Parker, Esquire
contact info
Barry Antoine Kamar
King & Spalding
contact info
Craig Carpenito
King & Spalding
contact info
Damien Jerome Marshall
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Defendant
Michael Moe
Represented By
John E Parker
John E. Parker, Esquire
contact info
Barry Antoine Kamar
King & Spalding
contact info
Craig Carpenito
King & Spalding
contact info
Damien Jerome Marshall
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Defendant
Peter B. Ritz
Represented By
John E Parker
John E. Parker, Esquire
contact info
Barry Antoine Kamar
King & Spalding
contact info
Craig Carpenito
King & Spalding
contact info
Damien Jerome Marshall
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Brickell Capital Solo 401K Trust
Represented By
Jeffrey W. Gutchess
Axs Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Shawn Carey
Represented By
Jeffrey W. Gutchess
Axs Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Hunts Road, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey W. Gutchess
Axs Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ion1 LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey W. Gutchess
Axs Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kailey Lewis
Represented By
Jeffrey W. Gutchess
Axs Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MSS Capital, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey W. Gutchess
Axs Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Zitah McMillan-Ward
Represented By
Jeffrey W. Gutchess
Axs Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Edward Reinle
Represented By
Jeffrey W. Gutchess
Axs Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Emanuel Valadakis
Represented By
Jeffrey W. Gutchess
Axs Law Group PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 79 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
43 43 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 02/25 10:37 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Genius Group Limited, Roger Hamilton, LZG International, Inc., Michael Moe, Peter B. Ritz. Document filed by Kailey Lewis, Hunts Road, LLC, Edward Reinle, Zitah McMillan-Ward, MSS Capital, LLC, Emanuel Valadakis, Shawn Carey, Ion1 LLC, Brickell Capital Solo 401K Trust. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Gutchess, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal Tue 02/25 9:11 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Jeffrey W. Gutchess. RE-FILE Document No. 42 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): (1) the wrong filer/filers was/were selected for the voluntary dismissal (Do Not Select Any Group); (2) the wrong party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were selected (Do Not Select Any Group). Re-file the document using the event type Notice of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Notices - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (tp)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
42 42 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 02/24 5:07 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Gutchess, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 01, 2025
41 41 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 02/03 10:24 AM
ORDER granting39 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 2/1/2025) (mml)
Related: [-]
40 40 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 02/03 10:18 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by the parties hereto that: 1. Plaintiffs shall file their Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss on or before February 24, 2025; 2. The Genius Defendants shall file their Reply on or before March 10, 2025. SO ORDERED. Related [+]. Motions terminated:38 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to31 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Jeffrey W. Gutchess dated January 31, 2025. filed by Edward Reinle, Ion1 LLC, Zitah McMillan-Ward, Emanuel Valadakis, Hunts Road, LLC, Shawn Carey, MSS Capital, LLC, Brickell Capital Solo 401K Trust, Kailey Lewis. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 2/1/2025) (mml)
Related: [-] plies due by 3/10/2025. Responses due by 2/24/2025
Friday, January 31, 2025
39 39 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 01/31 8:15 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Barry Kamer dated January 25, 2025. Document filed by Michael Moe, Peter B. Ritz, LZG International, Inc...(Kamar, Barry)
Related: [-]
38 38 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 01/31 4:26 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to31 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint . addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Jeffrey W. Gutchess dated January 31, 2025. Document filed by Shawn Carey, MSS Capital, LLC, Hunts Road, LLC, Ion1 LLC, Brickell Capital Solo 401K Trust, Kailey Lewis, Edward Reinle, Emanuel Valadakis, Zitah McMillan-Ward..(Gutchess, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Stipulation
Monday, January 27, 2025
37 37 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/27 6:52 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Craig Carpenito on behalf of Michael Moe, Peter B. Ritz, LZG International, Inc...(Carpenito, Craig)
Related: [-]
36 36 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/27 6:48 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Damien Jerome Marshall on behalf of Michael Moe, Peter B. Ritz, LZG International, Inc...(Marshall, Damien)
Related: [-]
35 35 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/27 6:44 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Barry Antoine Kamar on behalf of Michael Moe, Peter B. Ritz, LZG International, Inc...(Kamar, Barry)
Related: [-]
34 34 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/27 2:24 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John E Parker on behalf of Michael Moe, Peter B. Ritz, LZG International, Inc...(Parker, John)
Related: [-]
33 33 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 01/27 9:38 AM
DECLARATION of David S. Hoffner in Support re:31 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint .. Document filed by Roger Hamilton, Genius Group Limited..(Hoffner, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Asset Purchase Agreement
32 32 27 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 01/27 9:36 AM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:31 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint . . Document filed by Roger Hamilton, Genius Group Limited..(Hoffner, David)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Dismiss Mon 01/27 9:35 AM
MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint . Document filed by Roger Hamilton, Genius Group Limited. Responses due by 2/10/2025.(Hoffner, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
30 30 3 pgs order Scheduling Order Thu 01/16 4:44 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Accordingly: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counsel for Defendants/Respondents LZG International, Inc., Ritz, and Moe shall file an appearance on both dockets on or before January 27, 2025. If Mr. Parker is unable to be admitted pro hac vice on or before that date, counsel admitted to the Southern District of New York shall appear for Respondents LZG International, Inc., Ritz, and Moe, either as substitute counsel or as local counsel for Mr. Parker. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Respondents LZG International, Inc., Ritz, and Moe shall file their brief regarding the reconsideration of the preliminary injunction on or before January 27, 2025. Any Reply from the Intervenor, addressing only newly raised issues, is due on or before 5:30 PM on January 31, 2025. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the previously entered preliminary injunction [ECF No. 34]in the Arbitration Related Action will remain in effect until the Court receives the additional briefing as Ordered and enters a decision on the reconsideration of the entry of the preliminary injunction. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to file this Order in both Carey et al v. Moe et al, Case No. 1:24-CV-07551 and Genius Group Limited v. LZG International, Inc. et al, Case No. 1:24- CV-8464. The Court will not extend these deadlines any further absent extraordinary and unforeseen circumstances. If any of the additional anticipated briefing is not submitted in accordance with the deadlines set in this Order it will not be considered. Continued failure to comply with the Court's orders or comply with the FRCP, the Local Rules for the SDNY or this Court's Individual Practice Rules, or the parties discovery or other obligations thereunder may result in sanctions, including monetary penalties on counsel and/or the parties, dismissal or preclusion of claims, defenses, arguments, or evidence. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 1/27/2025. Replies due by 1/31/2025. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 1/16/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
29 29 1 pgs misc Notice of Filing Transcript Tue 01/14 5:51 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a HEARING proceeding held on 1/6/2025 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Transcript Tue 01/14 5:50 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: HEARING held on 1/6/2025 before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Amy Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/4/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/14/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/14/2025..(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
27 27 service Amended Summons Issued Fri 01/10 4:46 PM
ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Roger Hamilton..(gp)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice (Other) Fri 01/10 2:49 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion to Consolidate re:24 Order on Motion to Approve,,,,,,,,,,13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:24-cv-08464 .. Document filed by Shawn Carey, MSS Capital, LLC, Hunts Road, LLC, Ion1 LLC, Brickell Capital Solo 401K Trust, Kailey Lewis, Edward Reinle, Emanuel Valadakis, Zitah McMillan-Ward..(Gutchess, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
25 25 2 pgs service Request for Issuance of Amended Summons Wed 01/08 11:14 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Roger Hamilton, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Shawn Carey, MSS Capital, LLC, Hunts Road, LLC, Ion1 LLC, Brickell Capital Solo 401K Trust, Kailey Lewis, Edward Reinle, Emanuel Valadakis, Zitah McMillan-Ward..(Gutchess, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
24 24 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Approve Tue 01/07 6:51 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice16 Motion to Approve. Accordingly, based on the parties' representations to the Court at the Conference: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counsel for Defendants LZG International, Inc., Ritz, and Moe shall file an appearance on both dockets on or before January 10, 2025. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for LZG International Inc.'s Shareholders shall withdraw its motions to consolidate filed at docket entry 13 in the Shareholder Action Case No. 1:24-CV-07551 and docket entry 29 in Case No. 1:24-CV-8464 on or before January 10, 2025. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants LZG International, Inc., Ritz, and Moe shall file their brief regarding the reconsideration of the preliminary injunction on or before January 10, 2025. Any Reply from LZG International Inc.'s Shareholders, addressing only newly raised issues, is due on or before 5:30 PM on January 13, 2025. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Genius Group Limited's anticipated motion to dismiss in the Shareholder Action Case No. 1:24-CV-7551 is due on or before January 27, 2025. All further briefing shall be submitted in accordance with Local Rule 6.1(b). All briefing must comply with this Court's Individual Rules of Practice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to approve alternative service filed at docket entry 16 in in the Shareholder Action Case No. 1:24-CV-7551 is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURHTER ORDERED that the motion to stay the Shareholder Action Case No. 1:24-CV-07551 filed at docket entry 35 in the Arbitration Related Action Case No. 1:24-CV-8464 is DENIED without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to file this Order in both Carey et al v. Moe et al, Case No. 1:24-CV-07551 and Genius Group Limited v. LZG International, Inc. et al, Case No. 1:24-CV-8464. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to terminate the motion pending at docket entry 16 in Carey et al v. Moe et al, Case No. 1:24-CV-07551, and to terminate the motions pending at docket entry 29 and 35 in Genius Group Limited v. LZG International, Inc. et al, Case No. 1:24-CV-8464. The parties are reminded that failure to comply with the Court's orders or comply with the FRCP, the Local Rules for the SDNY or this Court's Individual Practice Rules, or the parties discovery or other obligations thereunder may result in sanctions, including monetary penalties on counsel and/or the parties, dismissal or preclusion of claims, defenses, arguments, or evidence. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 1/7/2025) (ks)
Related: [-]
Set/Reset Deadlines: Brief due by 1/10/2025. Motions due by 1/27/2025. Replies due by 1/13/2025. (ks) Modified on 1/7/2025 (ks).
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 01/07 6:52 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Brief due by 1/10/2025. Motions due by 1/27/2025. Replies due by 1/13/2025. (ks) Modified on 1/7/2025 (ks)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
23 23 order Order Mon 01/06 3:02 PM
ORDER The Parties are directed to order a copy of today's transcript. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil) (Text Only Order) (rz)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Mon 01/06 1:46 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil: Status Conference held on 1/6/2025. (Court Reporter Amy Walker) (rz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/31 11:33 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Scott Hoffner on behalf of Genius Group Limited..(Hoffner, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
21 21 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Thu 12/26 4:00 PM
DECLARATION of Bernardo N. M. Franco in Support re:19 MOTION to Appoint Shawn Carey, Hunts Road, LLC, Ion1 LLC, Brickell Capital Solo 401k Trust, Kailey Lewis, Edward Reinle, Emanuel Valadakis, and Zitah Mcmillan-Ward to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by Shawn Carey, MSS Capital, LLC, Hunts Road, LLC, Ion1 LLC, Brickell Capital Solo 401K Trust, Kailey Lewis, Edward Reinle, Emanuel Valadakis, Zitah McMillan-Ward..(Gutchess, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 28 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 3 30 pgs Exhibit C
20 20 13 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 12/26 3:57 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:19 MOTION to Appoint Shawn Carey, Hunts Road, LLC, Ion1 LLC, Brickell Capital Solo 401k Trust, Kailey Lewis, Edward Reinle, Emanuel Valadakis, and Zitah Mcmillan-Ward to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by Shawn Carey, MSS Capital, LLC, Hunts Road, LLC, Ion1 LLC, Brickell Capital Solo 401K Trust, Kailey Lewis, Edward Reinle, Emanuel Valadakis, Zitah McMillan-Ward..(Gutchess, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
19 19 2 pgs motion Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s) Appoint Counsel Thu 12/26 3:54 PM
MOTION to Appoint Shawn Carey, Hunts Road, LLC, Ion1 LLC, Brickell Capital Solo 401k Trust, Kailey Lewis, Edward Reinle, Emanuel Valadakis, and Zitah Mcmillan-Ward to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Document filed by Shawn Carey, MSS Capital, LLC, Hunts Road, LLC, Ion1 LLC, Brickell Capital Solo 401K Trust, Kailey Lewis, Edward Reinle, Emanuel Valadakis, Zitah McMillan-Ward..(Gutchess, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approve AXS Law, PLLC as Lead Counsel
Friday, December 20, 2024
18 18 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 12/20 4:54 PM
DECLARATION of Bernardo N. M. Franco in Support re:16 MOTION to Approve Alternative Service under Rule 4(f)(3) .. Document filed by Shawn Carey, MSS Capital, LLC, Hunts Road, LLC, Ion1 LLC, Brickell Capital Solo 401K Trust, Kailey Lewis, Edward Reinle, Emanuel Valadakis, Zitah McMillan-Ward..(Gutchess, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F
17 17 17 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 12/20 4:51 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:16 MOTION to Approve Alternative Service under Rule 4(f)(3) . . Document filed by Shawn Carey, MSS Capital, LLC, Hunts Road, LLC, Ion1 LLC, Brickell Capital Solo 401K Trust, Kailey Lewis, Edward Reinle, Emanuel Valadakis, Zitah McMillan-Ward..(Gutchess, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Approve Fri 12/20 4:48 PM
MOTION to Approve Alternative Service under Rule 4(f)(3) . Document filed by Shawn Carey, MSS Capital, LLC, Hunts Road, LLC, Ion1 LLC, Brickell Capital Solo 401K Trust, Kailey Lewis, Edward Reinle, Emanuel Valadakis, Zitah McMillan-Ward..(Gutchess, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Scheduling Order Tue 12/17 3:45 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER:Accordingly, the Court directs counsel for all parties to appear at a Status Conference on January 6, 2025 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 18C of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. At this Conference the parties should be prepared to discuss the status of this action and the pending motion to consolidate this case with Genius Group Limited v. LZG International, Inc. et al, Case No. 1:24-CV-08464 filed by Plaintiffs. SO ORDERED. Status Conference set for 1/6/2025 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 12/17/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
utility Case Redesignation Mon 12/16 9:02 PM
Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so redesignated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. (laq)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
14 14 7 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 12/06 3:44 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:24-cv-08464 . . Document filed by Shawn Carey, MSS Capital, LLC, Hunts Road, LLC, Ion1 LLC, Brickell Capital Solo 401K Trust, Kailey Lewis, Edward Reinle, Emanuel Valadakis, Zitah McMillan-Ward..(Gutchess, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Consolidate Cases Fri 12/06 3:43 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:24-cv-08464 . Document filed by Shawn Carey, MSS Capital, LLC, Hunts Road, LLC, Ion1 LLC, Brickell Capital Solo 401K Trust, Kailey Lewis, Edward Reinle, Emanuel Valadakis, Zitah McMillan-Ward..(Gutchess, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
12 12 service Summons Issued Wed 10/09 2:54 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Genius Group Limited. (vf)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Issued Wed 10/09 2:53 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Roger Hamilton. (vf)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Issued Wed 10/09 2:53 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to LZG International, Inc.. (vf)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued Wed 10/09 2:52 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Peter B. Ritz. (vf)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued Wed 10/09 2:51 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Moe. (vf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
7 7 2 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 10/08 4:50 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Genius Group Limited, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Brickell Capital Solo 401K Trust, Shawn Carey, Hunts Road, LLC, Ion1 LLC, Kailey Lewis, MSS Capital, LLC, Zitah McMillan-Ward, Edward Reinle, Emanuel Valadakis..(Gutchess, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 10/08 4:49 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Roger Hamilton, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Brickell Capital Solo 401K Trust, Shawn Carey, Hunts Road, LLC, Ion1 LLC, Kailey Lewis, MSS Capital, LLC, Zitah McMillan-Ward, Edward Reinle, Emanuel Valadakis..(Gutchess, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 10/08 4:46 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LZG International, Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Brickell Capital Solo 401K Trust, Shawn Carey, Hunts Road, LLC, Ion1 LLC, Kailey Lewis, MSS Capital, LLC, Zitah McMillan-Ward, Edward Reinle, Emanuel Valadakis..(Gutchess, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 10/08 4:45 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Peter B. Ritz, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Brickell Capital Solo 401K Trust, Shawn Carey, Hunts Road, LLC, Ion1 LLC, Kailey Lewis, MSS Capital, LLC, Zitah McMillan-Ward, Edward Reinle, Emanuel Valadakis..(Gutchess, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 10/08 4:43 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Moe, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Brickell Capital Solo 401K Trust, Shawn Carey, Hunts Road, LLC, Ion1 LLC, Kailey Lewis, MSS Capital, LLC, Zitah McMillan-Ward, Edward Reinle, Emanuel Valadakis..(Gutchess, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 10/07 11:50 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 10/07 11:51 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 10/07 11:51 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 10/07 11:52 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jeffrey W. Gutchess. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:78;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1331;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Mon 10/07 11:54 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jeffrey W. Gutchess. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Shawn Carey; MSS Capital, LLC; Hunts Road, LLC; Ion1 LLC; Brickell Capital Solo 401K Trust; Kailey Lewis; Edward Reinle; Emanuel Valadakis; Zitah McMillan-Ward. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 10/04 4:59 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gutchess, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
1 1 40 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 10/04 4:55 PM
COMPLAINT against Genius Group Limited, Roger Hamilton, LZG International, Inc., Michael Moe, Peter B. Ritz. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29994252)Document filed by Kailey Lewis, Hunts Road, LLC, Edward Reinle, Zitah McMillan-Ward, MSS Capital, LLC, Emanuel Valadakis, Shawn Carey, Ion1 LLC, Brickell Capital Solo 401K Trust..(Gutchess, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Certification and Authorization of Named Plaintiff Pursuant to Federal Securities Laws