Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Amos L Mazzant
Case #: 4:24-cv-00889
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2024
Terminated:Apr 09, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 02, 2025 4:37 AM CDT
Defendant
Mary Elizabeth Liberto
Represented By
Brandy Baxter-Thompson
Baxter-Thompson Law, PLLC
contact info
Ciara Perritano
Winstead PC
contact info
Defendant
Simmons Bank
Represented By
Brian Thompson Morris
Winstead PC
contact info
Ciara Perritano
Winstead PC
contact info
Mediator
Christopher Nolland
chris@nolland.com 1717 Main Street Suite 5550
Dallas, TX 75201
Plaintiff
Camella Liberto Grau
Represented By
Robert L Redfearn, Jr
Simone Peragine Smith & Redfearn LLP
contact info
Benjamin Roth Grau
Simon Peragine Smith & Redfearn, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ignatius Paul Liberto
Represented By
Robert L Redfearn, Jr
Simone Peragine Smith & Redfearn LLP
contact info
Benjamin Roth Grau
Simon Peragine Smith & Redfearn, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Salvadore Anthony Liberto
Represented By
Robert L Redfearn, Jr
Simone Peragine Smith & Redfearn LLP
contact info
Benjamin Roth Grau
Simon Peragine Smith & Redfearn, LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Mediator
Carol M. Siebman
Terminated: 03/18/2025
Siebman Law Federal Courthouse Square 300 N. Travis Street
Sherman, TX 75090


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
28 28 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 04/09 1:08 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (Motion(s)27 ,5 terminated). Signed by Chief District Judge Amos L Mazzant on 4/9/2025. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
27 27 motion Dismiss Pursuant to Settlement Mon 04/07 10:54 AM
JOINT MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Settlement by All Plaintiffs.(Grau, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
26 26 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/18 7:24 PM
SECOND NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena to Produce Documents to Non-Parties by Ignatius Paul Liberto, Salvadore Anthony Liberto, Camella Liberto Grau (Grau, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
25 25 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 03/18 8:42 AM
ORDER granting24 Consent Motion to Set Aside Order Referring Case to Mediation. It is ORDERED that the March 11, 2025 Order Referring Case to Mediation (Dkt. #23 ) is set aside in favor of the parties' agreement to participate in the voluntary mediation with Christopher Nolland currently scheduled for March 31, 2025. (Motion(s)24 terminated). Signed by Chief District Judge Amos L Mazzant on 3/18/2025. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
24 24 motion Set Aside Wed 03/12 9:06 AM
CONSENT MOTION to Set Aside23 Order Appointing/Referring Case to Mediator, by All Plaintiffs.(Grau, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
23 23 1 pgs order Order Appointing/Referring Case to Mediator Tue 03/11 9:09 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION. The mediator assigned is the Hon. Carol M. Siebman Related [+], Siebman Law, Federal Courthouse Square, 300 N. Travis Street, Sherman, Texas 75090, (903) 870-0070, carol.siebman@siebman.com. Signed by Chief District Judge Amos L Mazzant on 3/11/2025. (jmb)
Related: [-] t.
22 22 order Scheduling Order/Docket Control Order Tue 03/11 9:06 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference SET for 1/8/2026 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before Chief District Judge Amos L Mazzant. Motions due by 5/27/2025. Discovery due by 8/5/2025. Mediation Completion due by 9/30/2025. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/9/2025. Signed by Chief District Judge Amos L Mazzant on 3/11/2025. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Fri 03/07 8:39 AM
ORDER. It is ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Protection from Plaintiffs' Discovery Requests (Dkt. #18 ) is denied as moot. Signed by Chief District Judge Amos L Mazzant on 3/7/2025. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/05 2:39 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion for Protective Order by Mary Elizabeth Liberto re18 FIRST MOTION for Protective Order -North Dallas Bank & Trust (Baxter-Thompson, Brandy)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
19 19 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 02/17 10:24 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re18 FIRST MOTION for Protective Order -North Dallas Bank & Trust filed by Ignatius Paul Liberto, Salvadore Anthony Liberto, Camella Liberto Grau .(Grau, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Friday, February 14, 2025
18 18 motion Protective Order Fri 02/14 4:46 PM
FIRST MOTION for Protective Order -North Dallas Bank & Trust by Mary Elizabeth Liberto. (Baxter-Thompson, Brandy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
utility Remark Wed 02/12 12:49 PM
The Court hereby CANCELS the February 18, 2025 Scheduling Conference; the Court will enter a Scheduling Order. (No attachment) (tls)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
17 17 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Thu 02/06 4:54 PM
Additional Attachments to Main Document:16 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Exhibit A . (Grau, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Thu 02/06 3:07 PM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Grau, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Discovery Disclosure Mon 02/03 4:09 PM
FIRST NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Simmons Bank (Perritano, Ciara)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Discovery Disclosure Mon 02/03 7:44 AM
NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Mary Elizabeth Liberto (Baxter-Thompson, Brandy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/21 11:27 AM
NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena to Produce Documents to Non-Parties by Ignatius Paul Liberto, Salvadore Anthony Liberto, Camella Liberto Grau (Grau, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Discovery Disclosure Tue 01/21 10:37 AM
NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Ignatius Paul Liberto, Salvadore Anthony Liberto, Camella Liberto Grau (Grau, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
11 11 respm Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion Mon 01/06 4:30 PM
SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response re5 MOTION to Dismiss and Supporting Brief filed by Ignatius Paul Liberto, Salvadore Anthony Liberto, Camella Liberto Grau . (Grau, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
10 10 10 pgs order Order Governing Proceedings Thu 01/02 10:09 AM
ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/6/2025. Rule 16 Management Conference SET for 2/18/2025 at 09:30 AM, to be held via Zoom or telephone; instructions will follow. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/2/2025. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 12/31 3:40 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Thompson Morris on behalf of Simmons Bank (Morris, Brian)
Related: [-]
8 8 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 12/31 2:45 PM
REPLY to Response re5 MOTION to Dismiss and Supporting Brief filed by Mary Elizabeth Liberto, Simmons Bank . (Perritano, Ciara)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 12/31 2:20 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brandy Baxter-Thompson on behalf of Mary Elizabeth Liberto (Baxter-Thompson, Brandy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
6 6 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 12/24 11:32 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re5 MOTION to Dismiss and Supporting Brief filed by Ignatius Paul Liberto, Salvadore Anthony Liberto, Camella Liberto Grau .(Grau, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
5 5 motion Dismiss Tue 12/10 4:49 PM
MOTION to Dismiss and Supporting Brief by Simmons Bank.(Perritano, Ciara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, November 01, 2024
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 11/01 11:09 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ignatius Paul Liberto, Camella Liberto Grau, Salvadore Anthony Liberto. Mary Elizabeth Liberto waiver sent on 10/11/2024, answer due 12/10/2024. (Grau, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 10/16 3:35 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ignatius Paul Liberto, Camella Liberto Grau, Salvadore Anthony Liberto. Simmons Bank waiver sent on 10/11/2024, answer due 12/10/2024. (Grau, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
2 2 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Fri 10/04 4:03 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement identifying party citizenship filed by Ignatius Paul Liberto, Salvadore Anthony Liberto (Grau, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
1 1 42 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 10/04 3:58 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10403082.), filed by Ignatius Paul Liberto, Camella Liberto Grau, Salvadore Anthony Liberto.(Grau, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 10/04 4:25 PM
Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (dlw)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Fri 10/04 4:25 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (dlw)
Related: [-]