Illinois Central District Court
Judge:Jonathan E Hawley
Referred: Jonathan E Hawley
Case #: 1:24-cv-01367
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 02, 2025 4:30 AM CDT
Defendant
Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc.
Represented By
James D VanRheeden
Quinn Johnston Henderson Pretorius & Cerulo
contact info
Peter R Jennetten
Quinn Johnston
contact info
Defendant
Monica Duran
Represented By
James D VanRheeden
Quinn Johnston Henderson Pretorius & Cerulo
contact info
Peter R Jennetten
Quinn Johnston
contact info
Defendant
Jennifer Verbarg
Represented By
James D VanRheeden
Quinn Johnston Henderson Pretorius & Cerulo
contact info
Peter R Jennetten
Quinn Johnston
contact info
Plaintiff
Adrienne Huffman
Represented By
Brian M Orozco
Brian Orozco
contact info
Gregory E. Kulis
Gregory E Kulis And Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
order Order Reassigning Case - Judge Shadid Retirement Tue 04/01 11:19 AM
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/21 11:32 AM
NOTICE of Copying Records (Jennetten, Peter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
23 23 notice Notice (Other) Wed 02/19 4:36 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery Documents (Jennetten, Peter)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Wed 02/19 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery Documents (Jennetten, Peter)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Wed 02/19 9:35 AM
NOTICE of Copying Records (Jennetten, Peter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Wed 01/22 7:59 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery Documents (Jennetten, Peter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 01/07 11:42 AM
HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 1/7/2025. Motion17 is granted. SEE WRITTEN ORDER.(SAG)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Protective Order Tue 01/07 11:40 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 1/7/2025. Motion16 is granted. SEE WRITTEN ORDER.(SAG)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
17 17 motion Protective Order Mon 01/06 4:28 PM
MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants Monica Duran, Jennifer Verbarg, Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc.. Responses due by 1/21/2025(Jennetten, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 HIPAA Qualified Protective Order
16 16 motion Protective Order Mon 01/06 4:25 PM
MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants Monica Duran, Jennifer Verbarg, Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc.. Responses due by 1/21/2025(Jennetten, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Protective Order
Monday, December 30, 2024
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Mon 12/30 7:17 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery Documents (Jennetten, Peter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/03 4:51 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Monica Duran, Jennifer Verbarg, Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc..(VanRheeden, James)
Related: [-]
order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 12/03 4:21 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 12/3/2024. The Court adopts all deadlines as proposed in the parties' Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting13 , including the discovery deadline of 4/30/26 and the dispositive motions deadline of 5/29/26. (KE)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
13 13 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 12/02 5:07 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Adrienne Huffman. (Orozco, Brian)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 17, 2024
order Order Removing JEH as MJ Re DJ Hawley Apt Sun 11/17 2:48 PM
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Fri 11/15 3:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by James D VanRheeden on behalf of Monica Duran, Jennifer Verbarg, Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc. (VanRheeden, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
11 11 misc Certificate of Interest Fri 11/08 4:31 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Monica Duran, Jennifer Verbarg, Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc.. (Jennetten, Peter)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Designation of Lead Counsel Fri 11/08 4:30 PM
Designation of Lead Counsel by Peter R Jennetten on behalf of Monica Duran, Jennifer Verbarg, Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc.. (Jennetten, Peter)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Jury Demand Fri 11/08 4:30 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Monica Duran, Jennifer Verbarg, Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc.. (Jennetten, Peter)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Fri 11/08 4:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Peter R Jennetten on behalf of Monica Duran, Jennifer Verbarg, Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc. (Jennetten, Peter)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 11/08 9:48 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Adrienne Huffman. Jennifer Verbarg waiver sent on 10/4/2024, answer due 12/3/2024. (Orozco, Brian)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 11/08 9:46 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Adrienne Huffman. Monica Duran waiver sent on 10/30/2024, answer due 12/30/2024. (Orozco, Brian)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 11/08 9:45 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Adrienne Huffman. Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc. waiver sent on 10/4/2024, answer due 12/3/2024. (Orozco, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
order Order Thu 11/07 11:05 AM
TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley: Plaintiff filed this lawsuit on 10/4/2024. No effort to serve the defendant with process is reflected in the docket. Plaintiff is directed to obtain prompt service of process pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 or the case may be dismissed for failure to prosecute it. Entered: 11/7/2024 (WG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Tue 10/08 11:14 AM
NOTICE of Attorneys' Lien (Kulis, Gregory)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Tue 10/08 10:23 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Brian M Orozco on behalf of Adrienne Huffman (Orozco, Brian)
Related: [-]
order Order Reassigning Case Tue 10/08 11:07 AM
TEXT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 10/8/2024. This case and the corresponding hearings are reassigned to Senior District Judge James E. Shadid for further proceedings due to the nature of the case. (SAG)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Fri 10/04 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Gregory E. Kulis on behalf of Adrienne Huffman (Kulis, Gregory)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Attorney Complaint Fri 10/04 3:56 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AILCDC-4576753.), filed by Adrienne Huffman.(Orozco, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet