New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jennifer H Rearden
Case #: 1:24-cv-07554
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 02, 2025 5:46 AM EDT
Defendant
Bitwise 10 Crypto Index Fund
Represented By
Douglas P. Baumstein
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo. P.C
contact info
Defendant
Bitwise Asset Management, Inc.
Represented By
Douglas P. Baumstein
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo. P.C
contact info
Defendant
Bitwise Hold 10 Private Index Fund, LLC
Represented By
Douglas P. Baumstein
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo. P.C
contact info
Defendant
Bitwise Investment Advisors, LLC
Represented By
Douglas P. Baumstein
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo. P.C
contact info
Defendant
James Farrell
Represented By
Douglas P. Baumstein
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo. P.C
contact info
Defendant
Teddy Fusaro
Represented By
Douglas P. Baumstein
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo. P.C
contact info
Defendant
Hunter Horsley
Represented By
Douglas P. Baumstein
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo. P.C
contact info
Defendant
Matt Hougan
Represented By
Douglas P. Baumstein
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo. P.C
contact info
Plaintiff
Vandelay Industries AM LLC
Represented By
Douglas P. Baumstein
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo. P.C
contact info
Andrew S. Lewner
Westerman Ball Ederer Miller Zucker & Sharfstein LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Vandelay Industries KM LLC
Represented By
Douglas P. Baumstein
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo. P.C
contact info
Andrew S. Lewner
Westerman Ball Ederer Miller Zucker & Sharfstein LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Vandelay Industries TM LLC
Represented By
Douglas P. Baumstein
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo. P.C
contact info
Andrew S. Lewner
Westerman Ball Ederer Miller Zucker & Sharfstein LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, February 07, 2025
22 22 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 02/07 9:14 PM
DECLARATION of Katherine Dowling in Support re:10 MOTION to Dismiss Verified Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Hunter Horsley, Matt Hougan, Teddy Fusaro, James Farrell, Bitwise Hold 10 Private Index Fund, LLC, Bitwise 10 Crypto Index Fund, Bitwise Asset Management, Inc., Bitwise Investment Advisors, LLC..(Baumstein, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit L-May 2018 Press Release
21 21 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 02/07 9:10 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:10 MOTION to Dismiss Verified Amended Complaint . . Document filed by Hunter Horsley, Matt Hougan, Teddy Fusaro, James Farrell, Bitwise Hold 10 Private Index Fund, LLC, Bitwise 10 Crypto Index Fund, Bitwise Asset Management, Inc., Bitwise Investment Advisors, LLC..(Baumstein, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
20 20 30+ pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Fri 01/17 3:29 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:10 MOTION to Dismiss Verified Amended Complaint . . Document filed by Vandelay Industries TM LLC, Vandelay Industries KM LLC, Vandelay Industries AM LLC..(Lewner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
19 19 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Fri 01/17 3:26 PM
DECLARATION of Theodore Mukamal in Opposition re:10 MOTION to Dismiss Verified Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Vandelay Industries TM LLC, Vandelay Industries KM LLC, Vandelay Industries AM LLC..(Lewner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
18 18 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Fri 01/17 3:24 PM
DECLARATION of Andrew S. Lewner, Esq. in Opposition re:10 MOTION to Dismiss Verified Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Vandelay Industries TM LLC, Vandelay Industries KM LLC, Vandelay Industries AM LLC..(Lewner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Friday, January 10, 2025
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 01/10 11:27 AM
ORDER granting16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Application GRANTED. The Court wishes counsel a speedy recovery. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition by January 20, 2025. Defendants shall file their reply by February 7, 2025. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 16. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden on 1/8/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 01/10 11:28 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 1/20/2025 Replies due by 2/7/2025. (jca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 01/08 4:54 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File addressed to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden from Andrew S. Lewner dated January 8, 2024. Document filed by Vandelay Industries TM LLC, Vandelay Industries KM LLC, Vandelay Industries AM LLC..(Lewner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 12/10 12:20 PM
ORDER granting14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Application GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition by January 10, 2025. Defendants shall file their reply by January 31, 2025. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 14. SO ORDERED. Responses due by 1/10/2025 Replies due by 1/31/2025.. (Signed by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden on 12/10/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 12/09 3:30 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to13 Declaration in Support of Motion,12 Declaration in Support of Motion,,,11 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,10 MOTION to Dismiss Verified Amended Complaint . addressed to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden from Andrew S. Lewner dated December 9, 2024. Document filed by Vandelay Industries TM LLC, Vandelay Industries KM LLC, Vandelay Industries AM LLC..(Lewner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
13 13 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 11/22 6:22 PM
DECLARATION of Paul ("Teddy") Fusaro in Support re:10 MOTION to Dismiss Verified Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Hunter Horsley, Matt Hougan, Teddy Fusaro, James Farrell, Bitwise Hold 10 Private Index Fund, LLC, Bitwise 10 Crypto Index Fund, Bitwise Asset Management, Inc., Bitwise Investment Advisors, LLC..(Baumstein, Douglas)
Related: [-]
12 12 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 11/22 6:12 PM
DECLARATION of Douglas P. Baumstein in Support re:10 MOTION to Dismiss Verified Amended Complaint .. Document filed by Hunter Horsley, Matt Hougan, Teddy Fusaro, James Farrell, Bitwise Hold 10 Private Index Fund, LLC, Bitwise 10 Crypto Index Fund, Bitwise Asset Management, Inc., Bitwise Investment Advisors, LLC..(Baumstein, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Verified Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-BITW Trust Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-Confidential Private Placement Memorandum,
Att: 4 Exhibit D-Horsley email to investors on March 27, 2020,
Att: 5 Exhibit E-BITW Conversion Documents,
Att: 6 Exhibit F-Emails between Mukamal and Farrell Mar. & Apr. 2020,
Att: 7 Exhibit G-Farrell email to BITW investors on Oct. 30, 2020,
Att: 8 Exhibit H-2021 Subscription Agreements,
Att: 9 Exhibit I-Bitwise Monthly Investor Letter April 2020,
Att: 10 Exhibit J-Defendants email to investors on Nov. 6, 2020,
Att: 11 Exhibit K-Defendants email to investors on Dec. 8, 2020
11 11 30+ pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 11/22 6:02 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:10 MOTION to Dismiss Verified Amended Complaint . . Document filed by Hunter Horsley, Matt Hougan, Teddy Fusaro, James Farrell, Bitwise Hold 10 Private Index Fund, LLC, Bitwise 10 Crypto Index Fund, Bitwise Asset Management, Inc., Bitwise Investment Advisors, LLC..(Baumstein, Douglas)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Dismiss Fri 11/22 5:55 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Verified Amended Complaint . Document filed by Hunter Horsley, Matt Hougan, Teddy Fusaro, James Farrell, Bitwise Hold 10 Private Index Fund, LLC, Bitwise 10 Crypto Index Fund, Bitwise Asset Management, Inc., Bitwise Investment Advisors, LLC..(Baumstein, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 11/08 1:44 PM
ORDER granting8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Application GRANTED. Defendants' deadline to respond to the Verified Amended Complaint is extended to November 22, 2024. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss by December 20, 2024. Defendants shall file their reply by January 10, 2024. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 8. SO ORDERED. SO ORDERED. Bitwise 10 Crypto Index Fund answer due 11/22/2024; Bitwise Hold 10 Private Index Fund, LLC answer due 11/22/2024. (Signed by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden on 11/8/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 11/08 1:45 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 12/20/2024 Replies due by 1/20/2024. (jca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 11/07 2:39 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Verified Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden from Douglas P. Baumstein dated November 7, 2024. Document filed by Hunter Horsley, Matt Hougan, Teddy Fusaro, James Farrell, Bitwise Hold 10 Private Index Fund, LLC, Bitwise 10 Crypto Index Fund, Bitwise Asset Management, Inc., Bitwise Investment Advisors, LLC..(Baumstein, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/18 11:32 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew S. Lewner on behalf of Vandelay Industries AM LLC, Vandelay Industries KM LLC, Vandelay Industries TM LLC..(Lewner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 10/09 1:17 PM
ORDER granting5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time Application GRANTED. Defendants shall respond to the Verified Amended Complaint by November 12, 2024. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 5. Pursuant to Rule 6.B of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases, "[c]ounsel for all parties must filenotices of appearance in this Court promptly upon removal." See also R. 1.A ("Counsel must register promptly as ECFfilers and enter an appearance in the case."). Counsel for Plaintiffs shall enter an appearance forthwith.SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden on 10/9/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
5 5 motion Extension of Time Tue 10/08 3:03 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to respond to the Verified Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden from Douglas P. Baumstein dated October 8, 2024. Document filed by Bitwise 10 Crypto Index Fund, Bitwise Asset Management, Inc., Bitwise Hold 10 Private Index Fund, LLC, Bitwise Investment Advisors, LLC, James Farrell, Teddy Fusaro, Hunter Horsley, Matt Hougan..(Baumstein, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
4 4 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 10/07 9:25 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent BITWISE ASSETMANAGEMENT, INC. for BITWISE 10 CRYPTO INDEX FUND, BITWISE 10 CRYPTO INDEX FUND, BITWISE ASSET MANAGEMENT, INC., BITWISE HOLD 10 PRIVATE INDEX FUND, LLC, BITWISE INVESTMENT ADVISORS, LLC. Document filed by BITWISE 10 CRYPTO INDEX FUND, BITWISE ASSET MANAGEMENT, INC., BITWISE HOLD 10 PRIVATE INDEX FUND, LLC, BITWISE INVESTMENT ADVISORS, LLC, JAMES FARRELL, TEDDY FUSARO, HUNTER HORSLEY, MATT HOUGAN..(Baumstein, Douglas)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Removal Mon 10/07 9:19 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 653436/2024..Document filed by MATT HOUGAN, BITWISE ASSET MANAGEMENT, INC., BITWISE INVESTMENT ADVISORS, LLC, TEDDY FUSARO, BITWISE 10 CRYPTO INDEX FUND, BITWISE HOLD 10 PRIVATE INDEX FUND, LLC, JAMES FARRELL, HUNTER HORSLEY..(Baumstein, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit -1-New York County Supreme Court Record
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 10/07 12:35 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 10/07 12:36 PM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 10/07 12:36 PM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 10/07 12:37 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Douglas P. Baumstein. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Origin code has been modified to 2 Related [+];. (jgo)
Related: [-] moval from State Court
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Mon 10/07 12:38 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Douglas P. Baumstein. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: BITWISE 10 CRYPTO INDEX FUND; BITWISE ASSET MANAGEMENT, INC.; BITWISE 10 CRYPTO INDEX FUND; BITWISE INVESTMENT ADVISORS, LLC; HUNTER HORSLEY; MATT HOUGAN; TEDDY FUSARO; JAMES FARRELL. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 10/04 6:24 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Baumstein, Douglas)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 10/04 5:58 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 653436/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29994695).Document filed by Vandelay Industries AM LLC, Vandelay Industries KM LLC, Vandelay Industries TM LLC..(Baumstein, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit -1-New York County Supreme Court Record