Member Case
Lead case is: 5:24-bk-03490

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David M Warren
Case #: 5:24-bk-03486
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Indochine Express Leland LLC
7 Wayne Dr
Wilmington, NC 28403-1233
Represented By
George M. Oliver
The Law Offices Of Oliver & Cheek, PLLC
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, April 17, 2025
55 55 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Hearing Fri 04/18 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Hearing Notice Date 04/17/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 54
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
54 54 court Hearing Set (Motion) Tue 04/15 3:00 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 5/22/2025 at 11:00 AM at Wilmington Courtroom (Donleycott, Sarah)
Related: [-] 43 Application for Compensation filed by Accountant Kenny Woodruff
utility Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar Tue 04/15 2:59 PM
Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar Related [+] (Donleycott, Sarah)
Related: [-] ument no.43 Application for Compensation filed by Accountant Kenny Woodruff,53 Objection to Professional Fees filed by Bankruptcy Administrator
Monday, April 14, 2025
53 53 answerbk Objection to Professional Fees Mon 04/14 2:53 PM
Objection to Professional Fees Related [+] filed by Kirstin E. Gardner on behalf of Bankruptcy Administrator. (Gardner, Kirstin)
Related: [-] 43 Application for Compensationument no.43 Application for Compensation
52 52 audio Mon 04/14 2:00 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [04/14/2025 12:44:05 PM]. File Size [ 28743 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:01:33 ]. (Hearing on Confirmation of Chapter 11 Plan). (admin)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
51 51 misc Report on Ballots Fri 04/11 4:09 PM
Report on Ballots filed by George M. Oliver on behalf of Indochine Express Leland LLC. (Oliver, George)
Related: [-]
utility Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar Fri 04/11 4:12 PM
Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar - 4/14/25 Related [+] (Donleycott, Sarah)
Related: [-] ument no.51 Report on Ballots filed by Debtor Indochine Express Leland LLC