Idaho District Court
Judge:Amanda K Brailsford
Case #: 1:24-cv-00463
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2024
Terminated:Mar 05, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 02, 2025 3:30 AM MDT
Defendant
Attorney General of Boise, ID
Defendant
The F.B.I. Boise Office
Plaintiff
Brandie L. Meiller
1297 W. Pine Ave Apt D103
Meridian, ID 83642

GPO Dec 19 2024
INITIAL REVIEW ORDER BY SCREENING JUDGE - IT IS ORDERED that: Meiller's In Forma Pauperis Application (Dkt. 1) is GRANTED. Meiller's Complaint (Dkt. 2) is deficient because it fails to establish federal jurisdiction and fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Complaint is therefore DISMISSED with prejudice as any amendment would be futile. Meiller's pending motions (Dkts. 4, 5, and 6) are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)

Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Thursday, December 19, 2024
7 7 9 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 12/20 8:43 AM
INITIAL REVIEW ORDER BY SCREENING JUDGE - IT IS ORDERED that: Meiller's In Forma Pauperis Application (Dkt.1 ) is GRANTED. Meiller's Complaint (Dkt.2 ) is deficient because it fails to establish federal jurisdiction and fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Complaint is therefore DISMISSED with prejudice as any amendment would be futile. Meiller's pending motions (Dkts. 4, 5, and 6) are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
6 6 misc Supplement Mon 11/04 4:37 PM
Petition Begging for Relief by Plaintiff Brandie L. Meiller re. dkt.5 Supplement.(ac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, October 25, 2024
5 5 misc Supplement Fri 10/25 6:37 PM
PETITION FOR AN EMERGENCY INJUNCTION by Plaintiff Brandie L. Meiller.(ac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, October 18, 2024
4 4 motion Protective Order Fri 10/18 3:17 PM
MOTION for Protective Order and release from custody by Plaintiff Brandie L. Meiller. Responses due by 11/8/2024.(jd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter,
Att: 2 Envelope
Friday, October 04, 2024
3 3 2 pgs order Order of Conditional Filing Fri 10/04 2:07 PM
ORDER of Conditional Filing - caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Fri 10/04 2:06 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Brandie L. Meiller.(jd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 10/04 2:05 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brandie L. Meiller. Responses due by 10/25/2024. (jd)
Related: [-]