Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:J P Boulee
Case #: 1:24-cv-04490
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petiti
Case Filed:Oct 03, 2024
Terminated:Dec 23, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 01, 2025 4:32 AM EDT
Defendant
Antonio Donis
Represented By
Aaron Joshua Ross
United States Attorney -Atl
contact info
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
Represented By
Aaron Joshua Ross
United States Attorney -Atl
contact info
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By
Aaron Joshua Ross
United States Attorney -Atl
contact info
Plaintiff
Sid Ahmed Moctar Ellahi
Represented By
Amir Ahmad Naim
Georgia Asylum And Immigration Network
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Tue 04/15 11:36 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (gww)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 04/14 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Sid Ahmed Moctar Ellahi (Naim, Amir)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Mon 12/23 11:09 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Stay. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is stayed through and including June 9, 2025. Given the length of the stay, the Clerk is DIRECTED to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case for docket management purposes. Administrative closure will not prejudice the rights of the parties to this litigation in any manner nor preclude the filing of documents. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 12/23/2024. (gww)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 12/23 11:10 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (gww)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
7 7 motion Stay Thu 12/19 2:01 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Stay All Litigation Deadlines with Brief In Support by Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M. Jaddou, Antonio Donis.(Ross, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex. A: Proposed Order
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/19 2:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Joshua Ross on behalf of Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M. Jaddou, Antonio Donis (Ross, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
5 5 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 10/09 1:05 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Ur M. Jaddou. (gww)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
4 4 service Proposed Summons Tue 10/08 9:53 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Sid Ahmed Moctar Ellahi to Ur Jaddou (corrected) (Naim, Amir)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
3 3 30+ pgs order Order Mon 10/07 10:18 AM
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on October 7, 2024. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued as to USA Fri 10/04 2:39 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Antonio Donis, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General.(tcc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Ur M. Jaddou,
Att: 2 Summons Antonio Donis,
Att: 3 Summons U.S. Attorney, NDGa.,
Att: 4 Summons U.S. Attorney General
Thursday, October 03, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint for Mandamus Relief Fri 10/04 2:29 PM
COMPLAINT for Mandamus Relief filed by Sid Ahmed Moctar Ellahi. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-13769823)(tcc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet