Maryland District Court
Judge:Charles D Austin
Case #: 8:24-cv-02879
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983ed Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Oct 03, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 01, 2025 4:28 AM EDT
Defendant
Brandon Christopher Harrison-Difranco
Defendant
Frank Richard Taitano
Defendant
University of Maryland - Department of Transportation Services
Defendant
Attorney at Law Jay Rossello
Plaintiff
Smith Kwame Oliver Vodi
1810 Metzerott Road
Adelphi, MD 20783


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
24 24 service Summons Issued Fri 05/02 1:26 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Jay Rossello.(c/em 5/2/2025 ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USM-285
23 23 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 05/02 1:24 PM
ORDER directing the Clerk to ISSUE summons and forward same togetherwith the Complaint, the U.S. Marshal form, and order to the U.S. Marshal; DIRECTING the U.S. Marshal to effectuate service of process on Defendant; directing Plaintiff to SERVE Defendant University of Maryland Department ofTransportation Services within 14 days; granting20 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles D. Austin on 5/2/2025. (c/m & e/m as directed 5/2/2025 ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
22 22 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 04/30 12:52 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint filed by Smith Kwame Oliver Vodi.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/28 2:51 PM
Proposed Summons by Smith Kwame Oliver Vodi re16 Supplement (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
20 20 motion Extension of Time Thu 04/24 12:08 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Brandon Christopher Harrison-Difranco, Frank Richard Taitano(Rowan, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
19 19 corresp Miscellaneous Wed 04/16 10:49 AM
Correspondence re: Cover Letter With Exhibits filed by Smith Kwame Oliver Vodi(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16,
Att: 17 Exhibit 17,
Att: 18 Exhibit 18,
Att: 19 Exhibit 19,
Att: 20 Exhibit 20,
Att: 21 Exhibit 21,
Att: 22 Exhibit 22,
Att: 23 Exhibit 23,
Att: 24 Exhibit 24,
Att: 25 Exhibit 25,
Att: 26 Exhibit 26,
Att: 27 Envelope
Thursday, April 10, 2025
18 18 corresp Miscellaneous Thu 04/10 3:02 PM
Correspondence re: Inquiry regarding email filed by Smith Vodi (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/09 3:27 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Frank Richard Taitano served on 4/8/2025, answer due 4/29/2025.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
16 16 misc Supplement Mon 03/24 10:39 AM
Supplement to1 Complaint, filed by Smith Kwame Oliver Vodi (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Issued Fri 03/21 2:49 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Brandon Christopher Harrison-Difranco, Frank Richard Taitano, University of Maryland - Department of Transportation Services.(c/em USMS 3/21/2025 ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/21 2:46 PM
Proposed USM-285 forms by Smith Kwame Oliver Vodi (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
13 13 2 pgs order Order Mon 03/17 8:42 AM
ORDER granting Plaintiff 14 days to SHOW CAUSE why the Complaint should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles D. Austin on 3/14/2025. (c/m 3/17/2025 ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
12 12 order 25 Pct Mag - Order Cancelling Show Cause Hearing Mon 12/23 3:13 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re:10 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles D. Austin on 12/23/2024. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
10 10 order 25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause Wed 11/13 8:07 AM
ORDER directing Smith Kwame Oliver Vodi to show cause for failure to comply with[LINK:Standing Order 2019-07] . Show Cause Hearing set for 12/27/2024 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Smith Kwame Oliver Vodi files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles D. Austin on 11/13/2024. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
8 8 order 25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order Tue 10/29 2:06 PM
Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles D. Austin on 10/29/2024. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
6 6 corresp Miscellaneous Tue 10/29 2:04 PM
Response to Order filed by Smith Kwame Oliver Vodi(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USM-285
notice 25 Pct Mag - Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge Tue 10/29 2:05 PM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Charles D. Austin. Smith Kwame Oliver Vodi or counsel for Smith Kwame Oliver Vodi are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 11/12/2024. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Tue 10/29 2:44 PM
QC NOTICE:6 Miscellaneous Correspondence was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - USM-285 form for each defendant. There must be a USM-285 form for each defendant. To correct this problem, file USM-285 form for each defendant using the event Notice (Other) and link USM-285 form for each defendant to 6 . (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
5 5 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 10/22 9:02 AM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing the Clerk to mail U.S. Marshal form to Plaintiff; granting Plaintiff 21 days to complete and return U.S. Marshal forms and return them to the Clerk; directing the Clerk to issue Summons upon receipt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles D. Austin on 10/21/2024. (c/m w forms 10/22/2024 ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
4 4 misc Supplement Thu 10/10 7:45 AM
Supplement to1 Complaint, filed by Smith Kwame Oliver Vodi(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Determination and Notice of Rights
Thursday, October 03, 2024
3 3 misc Consent to Receive Electronic Notice Fri 10/04 10:08 AM
Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Kwame Oliver Smith Vodi. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 10/04 10:06 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kwame Oliver Smith Vodi(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/04 9:57 AM
COMPLAINT against Brandon Christopher Harrison-Difranco, Frank Richard Taitano, University of Maryland - Department of Transportation Services, filed by Kwame Oliver Smith Vodi.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons