Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Nitza I Quinones Alejandr
Case #: 2:24-cv-05332
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2024
Terminated:Oct 28, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 31, 2025 4:30 AM EDT
Defendant
AMERICAN EXPRESS COMPANY
Defendant
AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK
Defendant
CFO CHRISTOPHER LE CAILLEC
Plaintiff
JESSE CALLOWAY, IV
PRINCIPAL 2857 N. MARSTON STREET
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19132
Plaintiff
CALLOWAY IV, JESSE
AGENT 2857 N. MARSTON STREET
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19132

GPO Oct 28 2024
MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 10/28/2024. 10/28/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED(ahf)
GPO Oct 28 2024
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED, WITH PREJUDICE, FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE COURT'S MEMORANDUM. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 10/28/2024. 10/28/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
7 7 appeal USCA Notice of Docketing ROA Tue 05/06 5:39 PM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re6 Notice of Appeal filed by JESSE CALLOWAY, IV. USCA Case Number 25-1871 (va)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Order Mon 10/28 9:53 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED, WITH PREJUDICE, FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE COURT'S MEMORANDUM. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 10/28/2024. 10/28/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf)
Related: [-]
4 4 7 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Mon 10/28 9:51 AM
MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 10/28/2024. 10/28/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED(ahf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 10/21 1:09 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by CALLOWAY IV, JESSE..(va)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines Fri 10/04 11:21 AM
PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES. EMAILED TO PRO SE ON 10/4/2024.(ahf)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/04 11:02 AM
COMPLAINT against AMERICAN EXPRESS COMPANY, AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, CHRISTOPHER LE CAILLEC, filed by JESSE CALLOWAY, IV, CALLOWAY IV, JESSE. (NO FEE PAID, NO IFP FILED).(ahf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Page