Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:24-mj-12424
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 06, 2024 12:37 AM MST
Defendant
Gregorio Chub-Coc (1)
Represented By
Natalie Hubbs Haywood
Law Office Of Natalie H Haywood PC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jose Ruben Solis, Jr.
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/06/2024 1:56 AM MST
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
Arrest of Gregorio Chub-Coc on 10/1/2024. (SGG) Modified on 10/4/2024 to correct name (SGG).
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Gregorio Chub-Coc. (SGG) Modified on 10/4/2024 to correct name (SGG).
Related: [-]