Tennessee Middle District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00177
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 05, 2024 7:01 AM CDT
Defendant
Yusef Ibn Abdul Jabbar Hunter (1)
Represented By
Robert Lynn Parris
Robert L. Parris Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Robert E. McGuire
U.S. Attorney'S Office (nashville)
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/05/2024 8:24 AM CDT
Friday, September 06, 2024
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT filed as to Yusef Ibn Abdul Jabbar Hunter. (Attachment: #1 Criminal Cover Sheet) (ln) [3:24-mj-04367]
Related: [-]
2 2 Warrant Issued as to Yusef Ibn Abdul Jabbar Hunter. (ln) [3:24-mj-04367]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
Arrest of Yusef Ibn Abdul Jabbar Hunter (kp) [3:24-mj-04367]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Yusef Ibn Abdul Jabbar Hunter. (McGuire, Robert) [3:24-mj-04367]
Related: [-]
4 4 Warrant Returned Executed on 9/9/2024 as to Yusef Ibn Abdul Jabbar Hunter. (kp) [3:24-mj-04367]
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley: Initial Appearance as to Yusef Ibn Abdul Jabbar Hunter held on 9/9/2024. Defendant appeared with appointed counsel Robert Lynn Parris. Defendant temporarily detained. Preliminary and detention hearing continued to 9/17/2024, at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 5B. (kp) [3:24-mj-04367]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Yusef Ibn Abdul Jabbar Hunter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 9/9/2024. (kp) [3:24-mj-04367]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER APPOINTING CJA PANEL ATTORNEY AND DIRECTING U.S. MARSHAL TO SERVE SUBPOENAS AT GOVERNMENT EXPENSE as to Yusef Ibn Abdul Jabbar Hunter: IT IS ORDERED that Robert Lynn Parris, Esq., is hereby appointed to represent Defendant, Yusef Ibn Abdul Jabbar Hunter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 9/9/2024. (kp) [3:24-mj-04367]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER regarding Brady Materials as to Yusef Ibn Abdul Jabbar Hunter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 9/9/2024. (kp) [3:24-mj-04367]
Related: [-]
9 9 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Yusef Ibn Abdul Jabbar Hunter. (kp) [3:24-mj-04367]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER as to Yusef Ibn Abdul Jabbar Hunter: A Preliminary and Detention Hearing is set for 9/17/2024 1:00 PM in Courtroom 5B. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 9/9/2024. (kp) [3:24-mj-04367]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
11 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley: Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing as to Yusef Ibn Abdul Jabbar Hunter held on 9/17/2024. Defendant appeared with appointed counsel Robert Parris. Defendant waived preliminary hearing. Defendant waived detention hearing, rights reserved. Defendant to remain in federal custody. (ln) [3:24-mj-04367]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
12 12 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Yusef Ibn Abdul Jabbar Hunter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 9/17/2024. (ln) [3:24-mj-04367]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
13 13 INDICTMENT as to Yusef Ibn Abdul Jabbar Hunter. (Attachment: #1 Criminal Cover Sheet) (jm)
Related: [-]
14 14 SEALED DOCUMENT: Indictment with grand jury foreperson signature. Document sealed pursuant to Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Criminal Case Files. THIS DOCUMENT IS NOT FOR PUBLIC DISCLOSURE. (jm)
Related: [-]