Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 4:24-mj-00776
Case Filed:Oct 03, 2024
Terminated:Oct 29, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 02, 2024 8:36 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Shawn Smith-DOJ
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Michael Kirk Baumgardner (3)
Terminated: 10/29/2024
Represented By
William Reynolds Biggs
William R Biggs PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Janice Ann McAlister (4)
Terminated: 10/29/2024
Represented By
Rose L Romero
Law Offices Of Romero | Kozub
contact info
Defendant
Mark David Webster (2)
Terminated: 10/29/2024
Represented By
Derek D Brown
Law Office Of Derek Brown
contact info
Defendant
Christopher Ray Bishop (1)
Terminated: 10/29/2024


Docket last updated: 03/14/2025 7:29 PM CDT
Thursday, October 03, 2024
Arrest of Michael Kirk Baumgardner, Janice Ann McAlister (mcrd)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to SEALED (1), SEALED (2), Michael Kirk Baumgardner (3), Janice Ann McAlister (4). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (mcrd)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney William Reynolds Biggs for Michael Kirk Baumgardner appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 10/3/2024) (mcrd)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Rose L Romero for Janice Ann McAlister appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 10/3/2024) (mcrd)
Related: [-]
4 4 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton: Initial Appearance as to Michael Kirk Baumgardner, Janice Ann McAlister held on 10/3/2024. Date of Arrest: 10/3/2024; Defts executed financial affidavits; o/appointing attys entered; Rule 5(f) admonishment given; Deft Baumgardner waives PC & Detention hearing; Court finds PC as to Deft Baumgardner; Preliminary & Detention Hearing set 10/9/24 at 2:30 p.m. before Judge Cureton as to Deft McAlister; o/temp detention entered as to Deft McAlister; o/detention pending trial entered as to Deft Baumgardner; both defts remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith; Defense - William Biggs and Rose Romero. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :06. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (USPO Mouret.) (mcrd)
Related: [-]
5 5 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Michael Kirk Baumgardner (mcrd)
Related: [-]
6 6 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Janice Ann McAlister (mcrd)
Related: [-]
7 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER As to Michael Kirk Baumgardner, Janice Ann McAlister: This written order is entered pursuant to Rule 5(f)(1) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, and is entered by the court on the first scheduled court date when both the prosecutor and defense counsel are present. By this order -- issued to the prosecution and defense counsel -- the court confirms the disclosure obligations of the prosecutor under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and the possible consequences of violating such order under applicable law. Failure to do so may result in consequences such as the dismissal of the indictment or information, dismissal of individual charges, exclusion of evidence or witnesses, adverse jury instructions, contempt proceedings, and/or sanctions by the court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 10/3/2024) (mcrd)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs MOTION for Pretrial Detention filed by USA as to Michael Kirk Baumgardner, Janice Ann McAlister (mcrd)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting8 Motion for Detention as to Michael Kirk Baumgardner (3) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 10/3/2024) (mcrd)
Related: [-]
10 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Janice Ann McAlister. Detention & Preliminary Hearing set for 10/9/2024 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 10/3/2024) (mcrd)
Related: [-]