California Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00220
Case Filed:Sep 06, 2024
Terminated:Sep 09, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 06, 2024 12:17 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Bianca Rosa Garcia Romero (1)
Terminated: 09/09/2024


Docket last updated: 10/06/2024 1:20 AM PDT
Friday, September 06, 2024
1 1 LODGED - PROB 22 (Transfer In) as to Bianca Rosa Garcia Romero. (Rivera, O)
Related: [-]