New York Southern District Court
Judge:Ronnie Abrams
Case #: 1:24-cv-07565
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Oct 06, 2024
Terminated:Mar 26, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 5:43 AM EDT
Defendant
Harman International Industries, Incorporated
400 Atlantic Street 14th and 15th Floor
Stamford, CT 06901
Represented By
Jonathan S Hong
Dentons Us, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Dennis Sumlin
Represented By
Asher Cohen
contact info
Asher H. Cohen
Equal Access Law Group, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
18 18 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 03/25 2:03 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Harman International Industries, Incorporated and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Dennis Sumlin. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Cohen, Asher)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 02/14 1:04 PM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Asher H. Cohen on behalf of Dennis Sumlin. New Address: EQUAL ACCESS LAW GROUP PLLC,..(Cohen, Asher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 02/11 6:00 PM
ORDER granting15 Letter Motion to Stay. Application granted. In view of the parties' representation that a stay will allow them to finalize a voluntary dismissal of this action, the Court will grant a limited stay of case deadlines until March 31, 2025. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/11/2025) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
15 15 motion Stay Mon 02/10 11:38 AM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Stay all Case Deadlines for Forty-Five (45) days from February 12, 2025 to March 31, 2025 addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Jonathan Hong dated February 10, 2025. Document filed by Harman International Industries, Incorporated..(Hong, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 01/10 2:12 PM
ORDER granting13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. Application granted. In addition, the parties shall comply with this Court's Order of October 8, 2024, ECF No. 6, no later than February 12, 2025. No further extensions of these deadlines will be granted absent good cause. Harman International Industries, Incorporated answer due 2/12/2025. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/10/2025) (tro)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 01/09 11:12 AM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint until February 12, 2025 addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Jonathan Hong dated January 9, 2025. Document filed by Harman International Industries, Incorporated..(Hong, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 12/11 3:51 PM
ORDER granting11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. Application granted. Furthermore, no later than January 13, 2025, the parties shall comply with this Court's Order of October 8, 2024, ECF No. 6. SO ORDERED. Harman International Industries, Incorporated answer due 1/13/2025. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/11/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 12/10 12:34 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint until January 13, 2025 addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Jonathan Hong dated December 10, 2024. Document filed by Harman International Industries, Incorporated..(Hong, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 11/14 9:52 AM
ORDER granting9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. Application granted. SO ORDERED. Harman International Industries, Incorporated answer due 12/12/2024. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 11/13/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 11/13 12:24 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint until December 12, 2024 addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Jonathan S. Hong dated November 13, 2024. Document filed by Harman International Industries, Incorporated..(Hong, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/13 12:22 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan S Hong on behalf of Harman International Industries, Incorporated..(Hong, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 11/06 7:24 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Harman International Industries, Incorporated served on 10/22/2024, answer due 11/12/2024. Service was accepted by Mr.Tim, designated by law to accept service of process. Document filed by Dennis Sumlin..(Cohen, Asher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order Tue 10/08 4:04 PM
ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of service of the summons and complaint, the parties must meet and confer for at least one hour in a good-faith attempt to settle this action. To the extent the parties are unable to settle the case themselves, they must also discuss whether further settlement discussions through the district's court-annexed mediation program or before a magistrate judge would be productive at this time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within fifteen (15) additional days (i.e., within forty-five (45) days of service of the summons and complaint), the parties must submit a joint letter requesting that the Court either (1) refer the case to mediation or a magistrate judge (and indicate a preference between the two options), or (2) schedule an initial status conference in the matter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 10/8/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 10/07 3:10 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Harman International Industries, Incorporated..(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 10/07 10:12 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 10/07 10:12 AM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 10/07 10:12 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Mon 10/07 10:14 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Asher Cohen. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Dennis Sumlin. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 06, 2024
4 4 respoth Declaration (non-motion) Sun 10/06 12:25 PM
DECLARATION of Robert D. Moody re:1 Complaint and Demand For Jury Trial . Document filed by Dennis Sumlin..(Cohen, Asher)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Sun 10/06 12:23 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Harman International Industries, Incorporated,, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Dennis Sumlin..(Cohen, Asher)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Sun 10/06 12:22 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cohen, Asher)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint Sun 10/06 12:22 PM
COMPLAINT against Harman International Industries, Incorporated. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29998336)Document filed by Dennis Sumlin..(Cohen, Asher)
Related: [-]