Washington Western District Court
Judge:Tana Lin
Case #: 2:24-mc-00062
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2024
Terminated:Feb 10, 2025
Case in other court:Middle District of Florida, Tampa, 8:23-cv-01450-VMC-LSG

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, February 10, 2025
15 15 2 pgs misc Status Report Mon 02/10 1:48 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by In Re Microsoft Corporation (Howard, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
14 14 order 2 - Minute Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 02/04 9:31 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The Parties are ORDERED to file a status report by 02/10/2025. Authorized by Judge Tana Lin. (APH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
13 13 9 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Wed 01/15 11:26 AM
ORDER ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION re9 Motion for Reconsideration. Accordingly, Respondent Microsoft Corporation's Motion for Reconsideration (Dkt.No. 9) is DENIED. Respondent SHALL produce documents responsive to the subpoena, if any, within fourteen (14) days of this Order. Signed by Judge Tana Lin. (RE)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
12 12 7 pgs respm Response to Motion Mon 01/13 8:45 AM
RESPONSE, by All Plaintiffs, to9 MOTION for Reconsideration re8 Order on Motion to Compel .(Skurky, Caitlin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Anthony Sampson with Exhibits
Monday, January 06, 2025
11 11 order 2 - Minute Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Noting Date Mon 01/06 11:06 AM
MINUTE ORDER: On 1/3/2025, Respondent filed a Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order on Motion to Compel. Dkt. No.9 . Petitioners are ORDERED to file a response of no more than four (4) pages no later than 1/10/2025. The Clerk SHALL renote the motion accordingly. Authorized by Judge Tana Lin. (SB)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
10 10 respm Declaration Fri 01/03 5:23 PM
DECLARATION of Mark Murphy filed by In Re Microsoft Corporation re9 MOTION for Reconsideration re8 Order on Motion to Compel (Howard, James)
Related: [-]
9 9 5 pgs motion Reconsideration Fri 01/03 5:20 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re8 Order on Motion to Compel , filed by In Re Microsoft Corporation. Noting Date 1/3/2025, (Howard, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Proposed Order
Friday, December 20, 2024
8 8 7 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Fri 12/20 4:17 PM
ORDER granting Petitioners'1 Motion to Compel. Respondent SHALL produce documents responsive to the subpoena, if any, within fourteen (14) days of this Order. Signed by Judge Tana Lin. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
7 7 10 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 10/31 6:11 PM
REPLY, filed by All Plaintiffs, TO RESPONSE to1 MOTION to Compel(Skurky, Caitlin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Reply Declaration of Anthony Sampson,
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 3 6 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 4 18 pgs Exhibit C,
Att: 5 7 pgs Exhibit D,
Att: 6 3 pgs Exhibit E,
Att: 7 9 pgs Exhibit F,
Att: 8 18 pgs Exhibit G,
Att: 9 13 pgs Exhibit H
Thursday, October 24, 2024
6 6 respm Declaration Thu 10/24 5:01 PM
DECLARATION of Mark Murphy ISO Opposition filed by In Re Microsoft Corporation re1 MOTION to Compel (Howard, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 14 pgs respm Response to Motion Thu 10/24 4:59 PM
RESPONSE, by In Re Microsoft Corporation, to1 MOTION to Compel. (Howard, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
4 4 2 pgs discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Tue 10/22 9:28 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Howard, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
3 3 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/21 4:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney James E Howard on behalf of In Re Microsoft Corporation. (Howard, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
2 2 2 pgs notice Notice of Motion Re-Noted Fri 10/18 11:11 AM
NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED:1 MOTION to Compel. Filed by All Plaintiffs. Noting Date 10/31/2024, (Skurky, Caitlin)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
misc Pay Filing Fee - Miscellaneous Case Filing Fee Fri 10/04 5:40 PM
Miscellaneous Case Filing Fee payment receipt number AWAWDC-8660643 (Skurky, Caitlin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
1 1 17 pgs motion Compel Fri 10/04 3:49 PM
MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena for Production of Documents by Non-Party Microsoft Corporation, filed by Plaintiffs Charlene Bavencoff, Janet Sihler. (Filer advised to submit payment via ECF) Noting Date 10/23/2024. (RE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 14 pgs Exhibit A- Subpoena,
Att: 2 12 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 3 4 pgs Exhibit C,
Att: 4 33 pgs Exhibit D,
Att: 5 34 pgs Exhibit E,
Att: 6 22 pgs Exhibit F,
Att: 7 28 pgs Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Declaration of Anthony Sampson in Support of the Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena for Production of Documents by Non-Party Microsoft Corporation,
Att: 9 2 pgs PROPOSED Order Granting Movants' Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena for Production of Documents by Non-Party Microsoft Corporation