California Central District Court
Judge:Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr
Referred: Gail J Standish
Case #: 2:24-cv-08585
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Case Filed:Oct 06, 2024
Terminated:Nov 07, 2024
Case in other court:Central District of California, N/A
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 2:35 AM PDT
Defendant
Gavin Newsom
Represented By
Michael Surren Cohen
California Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Robert A. Bonta
Represented By
Michael Surren Cohen
California Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Long David Liu
Represented By
David S Milton
Law Offices Of David S. Milton
contact info
Long Z Liu
Law Offices Of David S Milton
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, November 07, 2024
27 27 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Thu 11/07 5:57 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Long David Liu Long David Liu. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Liu, Long)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
26 26 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 11/06 8:47 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: In its order denying Plaintiff's ex parte application for a temporary restraining order, the Court found that Plaintiff had failed to establish standing to obtain the requested relief. Dkt. No. 24. The Court orders Plaintiff to show cause, in writing, by November 13, 2024, why this case should not be dismissed for lack of Article III standing. (bm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
25 25 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Thu 10/31 1:27 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),22 . The following error(s) was/were found: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123 -Section II is incomplete. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
24 24 order Temporary Restraining Order Wed 10/30 5:03 PM
ORDER DENYING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER17 by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. Because there is no urgent need for ex parte relief, and because Plaintiff has not established standing to obtain the requested relief, the application for a TRO is denied. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
23 23 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Tue 10/29 3:40 PM
Defendants Preliminary Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to enjoining Governor Gavin Newsom and Attorney General Robert A. Bonta from enforcing SB1174 which prohibits a local government from enacting or enforcing any charter provision, ordinance, or reg17 filed by Defendants Robert A. Bonta, Gavin Newsom. (Cohen, Michael)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 10/29 3:13 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael Surren Cohen counsel for Defendants Robert A. Bonta, Gavin Newsom. Adding Michael S. Cohen as counsel of record for Gavin Newsom and Rob Bonta for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Gavin Newsom et al. (Attorney Michael Surren Cohen added to party Robert A. Bonta(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Surren Cohen added to party Gavin Newsom(pty:dft))(Cohen, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
21 21 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Mon 10/28 1:39 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to enjoining Governor Gavin Newsom and Attorney General Robert A. Bonta from enforcing SB1174 which prohibits a local government from enacting or enforcing any charter provision, ordinance, or reg17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rolm)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
20 20 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 10/25 12:18 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Long David Liu Long David Liu, re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to enjoining Governor Gavin Newsom and Attorney General Robert A. Bonta from enforcing SB1174 which prohibits a local government from enacting or enforcing any charter provision, ordinance, or reg17 served on 10/25/2024. (Liu, Long)
Related: [-]
19 19 respm Motion Related Document Fri 10/25 12:00 PM
Notice to Counsel of Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should not Issue re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to enjoining Governor Gavin Newsom and Attorney General Robert A. Bonta from enforcing SB1174 which prohibits a local government from enacting or enforcing any charter provision, ordinance, or reg17 filed by Plaintiff Long David Liu. (Liu, Long)
Related: [-]
18 18 13 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 10/25 11:53 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to enjoining Governor Gavin Newsom and Attorney General Robert A. Bonta from enforcing SB1174 which prohibits a local government from enacting or enforcing any charter provision, ordinance, or reg17 filed by Plaintiff Long David Liu. (Liu, Long)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Temporary Restraining Order Fri 10/25 11:51 AM
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to enjoining Governor Gavin Newsom and Attorney General Robert A. Bonta from enforcing SB1174 which prohibits a local government from enacting or enforcing any charter provision, ordinance, or regulation requiring a person to present identification for the purpose of voting or submitting a ballot at any polling place, vote center, or other location where ballots are cast or submitted. filed by Long David Liu Long David Liu. (Liu, Long)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
16 16 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 10/22 7:08 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Long David Liu, upon Defendant Robert A. Bonta served on 10/22/2024, answer due 11/12/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Robert A. Bonta, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the State of California in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Liu, Long)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 10/22 7:01 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Long David Liu, upon Defendant Gavin Newsom served on 10/22/2024, answer due 11/12/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gavin Newsom, in his official capacity as Governor of the State of California in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Liu, Long)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Issued Tue 10/22 11:19 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition12 as to Defendant Robert A. Bonta. (rolm)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
13 13 notice Summons Request Mon 10/21 11:44 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Long David Liu Long David Liu. (Liu, Long)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
12 12 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Tue 10/15 7:54 PM
First Amended Complaint AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gavin Newsom, et al. All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Long David Liu Long David Liu(Liu, Long)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
11 11 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 10/09 7:59 AM
Standing Order upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (lfa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 10/08 5:47 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Gavin Newsom. (car)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 10/08 5:43 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 10/08 5:42 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 10/08 5:42 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (car)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
10 10 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Tue 10/08 5:57 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)2 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Document 2 is the Summons e-filed under the wrong event. Document 3 is the Civil Cover Sheet e-filed under the wrong event. Corrections have been made. No further action is required unless the Court so directs. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Long David Liu. (Liu, Long)
Related: [-]
4 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Long David Liu Long David Liu. (Liu, Long)
Related: [-]
3 3 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($405 paid on 10/06/2024, receipt number 38348041), filed by Long David Liu Long David Liu.(Liu, Long)
Related: [-]
2 2 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($405 paid on 10/06/2024, receipt number 38348041), filed by Long David Liu Long David Liu.(Liu, Long)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 06, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38348041 - Fee: $405, filed by Long David Liu Long David Liu.(Liu, Long)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Unredacted Document Summons in a Civil Action