Maryland District Court
Judge:Deborah K Chasanow
Case #: 8:24-cv-02900
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:77 Securities Fraud
Case Filed:Oct 07, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 5:42 AM EDT
Defendant
Harish Chidambaran
Suite 300
Bethesda, MD 20817
Represented By
Laura G. Ferguson
Miller & Chevalier Chartered
contact info
Defendant
Sayyed Farhan Naqvi
Suite 300
Bethesda, MD 20817
Represented By
Castell Abner, III
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky And Popeo, P.C.
contact info
John F. Sylvia
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky And Popeo, P.C.
contact info
Movant
Austin Alsup
The Rosen Law Firm, P.A. 275 Madison Avenue 40th Floor
New York, NY 10016
Represented By
Cynthia L Leppert
Law Office Of Cynthia Leppert
contact info
Movant
Erik Bayard
Represented By
Scott E Nevin
Law Office Of Peter T Nicholl
contact info
Movant
Louis Leveque
Represented By
Brian Daniel Stewart
Levi & Korsinsky, LLP
contact info
Nicholas Ian Porritt
Levi & Korsinsky, LLP
contact info
Movant
Yolanda Castaneda
275 Madison Avenue, 40th Floor
New York, NY 10016
Represented By
Cynthia L Leppert
Law Office Of Cynthia Leppert
contact info
Plaintiff
Danny Walker
Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated 350 E Georgia Ave.
Many, LA 71449
Represented By
William Emerson Jacobs
Weisbrod Matteis & Copley PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
iLearningEngines, Inc.
Terminated: 12/27/2024
6701 Democracy Blvd. Suite 300
Bethesda, MD 20817
Represented By
Anthony Jankozski
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath
contact info

GPO Feb 27 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 2/27/2025. (sat, Chambers)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
50 50 service Summons Issued as to USA Wed 04/30 9:28 AM
Summons Issued 60 days as to Matthew Barger, Balakrishnan Arackal, Ian Davis, Marcum LLP, Bruce Mehlman, Michael Moe, Thomas Olivier, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
49 49 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/29 7:22 PM
NOTICE by Louis Leveque, Iqbal al Hamid re41 Amended Complaint, Amended Complaint Redline Version (Porritt, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
48 48 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/29 1:38 AM
NOTICE by Louis Leveque, Iqbal al Hamid For the clerk to issue summons. (Porritt, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
47 47 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/29 1:33 AM
NOTICE by Louis Leveque, Iqbal al Hamid For the clerk to issue summons. (Porritt, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
46 46 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/29 1:31 AM
NOTICE by Louis Leveque, Iqbal al Hamid For the clerk to issue summons. (Porritt, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
45 45 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/29 1:29 AM
NOTICE by Louis Leveque, Iqbal al Hamid For the clerk to issue summons. (Porritt, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
44 44 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/29 1:26 AM
NOTICE by Louis Leveque, Iqbal al Hamid For the clerk to issue summons. (Porritt, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
43 43 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/29 1:23 AM
NOTICE by Louis Leveque, Iqbal al Hamid For the clerk to issue summons. (Porritt, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
42 42 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/29 1:17 AM
NOTICE by Louis Leveque, Iqbal al Hamid For the clerk to issue summons. (Porritt, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
41 41 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 04/28 11:59 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Harish Chidambaran, Sayyed Farhan Naqvi, Balakrishnan Arackal, Matthew Barger, Ian Davis, Bruce Mehlman, Michael Moe, Thomas Olivier, Marcum LLP, filed by Louis Leveque, Iqbal al Hamid.(Porritt, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Certification,
Att: 2 Exhibit B. Master Agreement