Rhode Island District Court
Judge:Mary S Mcelroy
Referred: Patricia A Sullivan
Case #: 1:24-cv-00403
Nature of Suit160 Contract - Stockholders’ Suits
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Oct 07, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 5:43 AM EDT
Defendant
C. David Brown, II
Represented By
Christopher N. Dawson
Whelan Corrente & Flanders LLP
contact info
Defendant
Mary L. Schapiro
Director Defendant 5207 38th Street NW
Washington, DC 20015
Represented By
Christopher N. Dawson
Whelan Corrente & Flanders LLP
contact info
Defendant
Michael F. Mahoney
Represented By
Christopher N. Dawson
Whelan Corrente & Flanders LLP
contact info
Defendant
Karen S. Lynch
Represented By
Christopher N. Dawson
Whelan Corrente & Flanders LLP
contact info
Defendant
J. Scott Kirby
Represented By
Christopher N. Dawson
Whelan Corrente & Flanders LLP
contact info
Defendant
Shawn M. Guertin
Represented By
Christopher N. Dawson
Whelan Corrente & Flanders LLP
contact info
Defendant
Roger N. Farah
Represented By
Christopher N. Dawson
Whelan Corrente & Flanders LLP
contact info
Defendant
Thomas F. Cowhey
Represented By
Christopher N. Dawson
Whelan Corrente & Flanders LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jeffrey R. Balser
Represented By
Christopher N. Dawson
Whelan Corrente & Flanders LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jean-Pierre Millon
Represented By
Christopher N. Dawson
Whelan Corrente & Flanders LLP
contact info
Defendant
Anne M. Finucane
Represented By
Christopher N. Dawson
Whelan Corrente & Flanders LLP
contact info
Defendant
Nancy-Ann M. Deparle
Represented By
Christopher N. Dawson
Whelan Corrente & Flanders LLP
contact info
Defendant
Alecia A. DeCoudreaux
Represented By
Christopher N. Dawson
Whelan Corrente & Flanders LLP
contact info
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
Represented By
Christopher N. Dawson
Whelan Corrente & Flanders LLP
contact info
Defendant
Fernando Aguirre
Represented By
Christopher N. Dawson
Whelan Corrente & Flanders LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Gerald Joseph Lovoi
Represented By
Vincent L. Greene, IV
Motley Rice LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, December 23, 2024
order Order Entering Stipulation Mon 12/23 10:36 AM
TEXT Order Entering (9 in 1:24-cv-00403-MSM-PAS, 10 in 1:24-cv-00393-MSM-PAS) STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO STAY DERIVATIVE ACTION . So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 12/23/2024. Associated Cases: 1:24-cv-00393-MSM-PAS, 1:24-cv-00403-MSM-PAS(Potter, Carrie)
Related: [-]
utility Case Stayed Mon 12/23 10:37 AM
Case Stayed. Associated Cases: 1:24-cv-00393-MSM-PAS, 1:24-cv-00403-MSM-PAS(Potter, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
9 9 misc Stipulation Thu 12/19 2:46 PM
STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO STAY DERIVATIVE ACTION filed by All Parties. Associated Cases: 1:24-cv-00393-MSM-PAS, 1:24-cv-00403-MSM-PAS(Greene, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
8 8 7 pgs order Order Wed 10/30 11:07 AM
ORDER consolidating cases. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 10/30/2024. Associated Cases: 1:24-cv-00393-MSM-PAS, 1:24-cv-00403-MSM-PAS(Potter, Carrie)
Related: [-]
utility Create Case Association Wed 10/30 11:06 AM
Cases associated: Create association to 1:24-cv-00393-MSM-PAS. Parties are directed to file all documents in the lead case CV24-393-MSM -PAS (Potter, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 10/18 2:40 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Health Corporation. (Dawson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/18 2:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher N. Dawson on behalf of All Defendants (Dawson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 10/10 3:13 PM
Summons Issued as to CVS Health Corporation, Shawn M. Guertin. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Issued as to CVS Health Corporation
4 4 service Summons Request Thu 10/10 3:04 PM
Summons Request filed by Gerald Joseph Lovoi.(Greene, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 10/09 9:31 AM
Summons Issued as to Fernando Aguirre, Jeffrey R. Balser, C. David Brown, II, Thomas F. Cowhey, Alecia A. DeCoudreaux, Nancy-Ann M. Deparle, Roger N. Farah, Anne M. Finucane, J. Scott Kirby, Karen S. Lynch, Michael F. Mahoney, Jean-Pierre Millon, Mary L. Schapiro. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Issued as to Balser,
Att: 2 Summons Issued as to Brown,
Att: 3 Summons Issued as to Cowhey,
Att: 4 Summons Issued as to DeCoudreaux,
Att: 5 Summons Issued as to DeParle,
Att: 6 Summons Issued as to Farah,
Att: 7 Summons Issued as to Finucane,
Att: 8 Summons Issued as to Kirby,
Att: 9 Summons Issued as to Lynch,
Att: 10 Summons Issued as to Mahoney,
Att: 11 Summons Issued as to Millon,
Att: 12 Summons Issued as to Schapiro
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
2 2 notice Case Opening Notice (Form Attached) Tue 10/08 12:50 PM
CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
Related: [-]
utility Case Conditionally Assigned Tue 10/08 12:47 PM
CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Related Case Number 24-cv-393-MSM-PAS. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
1 1 53 pgs cmp Complaint - New Case Mon 10/07 5:58 PM
COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 405.00, receipt number ARIDC-2053381 ), filed by Gerald Joseph Lovoi.(Greene, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Verification,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Supplement Summons re Aguirre,
Att: 4 Supplement Summons re Balser,
Att: 5 Supplement Summons re Brown,
Att: 6 Supplement Summons re Cowhey,
Att: 7 Supplement Summons re Schapiro,
Att: 8 Supplement Summons re Decoudreaux,
Att: 9 Supplement Summons re Deparle,
Att: 10 Supplement Summons re Farah,
Att: 11 Supplement Summons re Finucane,
Att: 12 Supplement Summons re Guertin,
Att: 13 Supplement Summons re Kirby,
Att: 14 Supplement Summons re Lynch,
Att: 15 Supplement Summons re Mahoney,
Att: 16 Supplement Summons re Millon