New Mexico District Court
Judge:Margaret I Strickland
Referred: Gregory J Fouratt
Case #: 2:24-cv-01016
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Case Filed:Oct 07, 2024
Case in other court:Third Judicial District Court, D-307-CV-23-02456
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 3:54 AM MDT
Defendant
Laddi Truck Lines, Inc.
Represented By
Charles J. Vigil
Rodey Dickson Sloan Akin & Robb, P.A.
contact info
Valerie Reighard Denton
Rodey, Dickason, Sloan, Akin & Robb, P.A.
contact info
Lauren Taylor Winston
Rodey Dickason Sloan Akin & Robb PA
contact info
Defendant
Hardeep Singh
Represented By
S Carolyn Ramos
Ylaw. P.C.
contact info
Ryan F Adragna
Ylaw, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Lakhvir Singh
Represented By
Charles J. Vigil
Rodey Dickson Sloan Akin & Robb, P.A.
contact info
Valerie Reighard Denton
Rodey, Dickason, Sloan, Akin & Robb, P.A.
contact info
Lauren Taylor Winston
Rodey Dickason Sloan Akin & Robb PA
contact info
Defendant
Yuvi Carrier, Inc.
Represented By
S Carolyn Ramos
Ylaw. P.C.
contact info
Ryan F Adragna
Ylaw, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Cindy Sanchez
Represented By
Daisy Chaparro
Tawney, Acosta & Chaparro P.C.
contact info
Alejandro Acosta, III
Tawney, Acosta & Chaparro P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
ORDER TO SUBMIT CLOSING DOCUMENTS by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Counsel having advised that the case has settled, the parties shall submit closing documents no later than June 2, 2025 , absent a showing of good cause for an extension. [ THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. ] (am)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
36 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cindy Sanchez 03.18.25 Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Second Supplemental Disclosures (Chaparro, Daisy)
Related: [-]
34 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Laddi Truck Lines, Inc., Lakhvir Singh Amended Notice to take Deposition of Cindy Sanchez Related [+]
Related: [-] ighard Denton, Valerie
ORDER VACATING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. In light of the scheduling of a global mediation in which the parties will mediate this case together with a separate case arising from the same accident, the Court VACATES its20 Order Setting Settlement Conference, including all requirements and deadlines in that order as well as the settlement conference set for May 2, 2025. The Court likewise VACATES the status conference set for April 18, 2025. The parties shall update the Court following the global mediation. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (am)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
33 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cindy Sanchez 03.14.25 Certificate of Service - Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosure of Expert Testimony (Chaparro, Daisy)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
32 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Laddi Truck Lines, Inc., Lakhvir Singh Deposition of Plaintiff Cindy Sanchez Related [+]
Related: [-] ighard Denton, Valerie
Friday, March 07, 2025
31 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cindy Sanchez Certificate of Service of Written Discovery Requests to Defendants (Chaparro, Daisy)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
29 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cindy Sanchez 02.21.25 Certificate of Service (Chaparro, Daisy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
28 28 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt: Telephonic Status Conference held on 2/11/2025. (am)
Related: [-]
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 4/18/2025, at 1:15 p.m. MDT. Counsel shall call the WebEx conference line at (855) 244-8681 and enter access code 2313 888 6328 to connect to the proceedings. When prompted for an Attendee ID number, press #. Client attendance is not required. [ THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. ] (am)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
26 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Yuvi Carrier, Inc. First Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Plaintiff (Ramos, S)
Related: [-]
NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 9. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
23 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cindy Sanchez Plaintiff's Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Supplemental Disclosures (Chaparro, Daisy)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Margaret I. Strickland as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges. Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez no longer assigned to this case. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
20 20 6 pgs ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Settlement Conference set for 5/2/2025, at 10:00 AM MDT in a to-be-determined courtroom in the United States District Court, 333 Lomas Blvd. NW, Albuquerque, New Mexico. Confidential Position Statements due 4/25/2025, by 3:00 p.m. MDT. (am)
Related: [-]
19 19 2 pgs ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL DEADLINES AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Discovery due 6/9/2025. Discovery Motions due 6/30/2025. Pretrial Motions due 7/14/2025. (am)
Related: [-]
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 2/11/2025, at 2:00 p.m. MST. Counsel shall call the WebEx conference line at (855) 244-8681 and enter access code 2313 888 6328 to connect to the proceedings. Client attendance is not required. [ THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. ] (am)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
18 18 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt: Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference held on 12/11/2024. (am)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
17 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cindy Sanchez Plaintiffs' Certificate of Service of Initial Disclosures (Chaparro, Daisy)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT : Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (dkf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
15 15 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Yuvi Carrier, Inc. (Adragna, Ryan)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs SECOND AMENDED INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The10 Amended Initial Scheduling Order is amended as to the date and time of the Initial Scheduling Conference as well as the WebEx access code. The Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2024, at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED and RESET for Wednesday, 12/11/2024, at 11:00 a.m. MST . The Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan remains due by 12/3/2024. The parties shall call the WebEx conference line at (855) 244-8681 and enter access code 2313 888 6328 to connect to the proceedings. (am)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
13 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Laddi Truck Lines, Inc., Yuvi Carrier, Inc. Initial Disclosures Related [+]
Related: [-] ighard Denton, Valerie
Monday, November 25, 2024
12 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hardeep Singh, Yuvi Carrier, Inc. Initial Disclosures (Ramos, S)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
11 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Taylor Winston on behalf of Laddi Truck Lines, Inc., Lakhvir Singh (Winston, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
10 10 2 pgs AMENDED INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The8 Initial Scheduling Order is amended as to the date of the Initial Scheduling Conference and the conference line and access code. The Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/2024, at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED and RESET for Thursday, 12/12/2024, at 10:00 a.m. MST. The Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan remains due by 12/3/2024. The parties shall call the WebEx conference line at (855) 244-8681 and enter access code 2323 023 1476 to connect to the proceedings. (am)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
8 8 2 pgs INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. A Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 12/10/2024, at 10:00 AM. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 12/3/2024. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 10/30/2024. (am)
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE by Hardeep Singh Consent to Removal (Ramos, S)
Related: [-]
6 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Hardeep Singh, Yuvi Carrier, Inc.. (Ramos, S)
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE by Laddi Truck Lines, Inc., Lakhvir Singh Consent to Removal Related [+]
Related: [-] ighard Denton, Valerie
CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Hardeep Singh, Yuvi Carrier, Inc. voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Ramos, S)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
4 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
Related: [-]
3 3 Transmittal of State Court Documents by Yuvi Carrier, Inc. (Ramos, S)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J
2 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Yuvi Carrier, Inc. (Ramos, S)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Yuvi Carrier, Inc. from Third Judicial District Court, case number D-307-cv-2023-02456. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Yuvi Carrier, Inc..(Ramos, S)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C
Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9579739 re1 Notice of Removal, filed by Yuvi Carrier, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Ramos, S)
Related: [-]
Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)
Related: [-]
United States Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (jg)
Related: [-]
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
Related: [-]