Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Case #: 2:24-cv-00820
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:145 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 07, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 4:47 AM CDT
Defendant
Sony Group Corporation
Represented By
Gregory S Gewirtz
Lerner David LLP
contact info
Deron R Dacus
The Dacus Firm, PC
contact info
Defendant
Sony Interactive Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By
Gregory S Gewirtz
Lerner David LLP
contact info
Deron R Dacus
The Dacus Firm, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
INGENIOSPEC, LLC
Represented By
Shani M Tutt
Russ August & Kabat - Los Angeles
contact info
Benjamin T Wang
Russ August & Kabat - Los Angeles
contact info
Matthew D. Aichele
Russ August & Kabat
contact info
Daniel Benjamin Kolko
Russ August & Kabat - Los Angeles
contact info
Marc A Fenster
Russ August & Kabat - Los Angeles
contact info
Gregory Phillip Love
Steckler Wayne Cherry & Love, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
35 35 motion Change Venue Wed 05/14 4:27 PM
OPPOSED MOTION to Change Venue (Motion to Transfer Venue to the Southern District of California or, in the Alternative, to the Northern District of California) by Sony Group Corporation, Sony Interactive Entertainment, Inc..(Gewirtz, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Gregory S. Gewirtz,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 [IngenioSpec webpage],
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 [IpVenture webpage],
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 [redacted version of Memorandum and Order to transfer venue, C.A. No. 2:23-CV-00607-JRG],
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 [Flights - San Francisco Int'l Airport to San Diego Int'l Airport],
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 [Flights - Tokyo to East Texas Regional Airport],
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 [Flights - Tokyo to Shreveport Regional Airport],
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 [Flights - Tokyo to Dallas Fort Worth Int'l Airport],
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 [Flights - Tokyo to George Bush Intercontinental Airport],
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 [Flights - Tokyo to San Diego Int'l Airport],
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 [Flights - Tokyo to San Francisco Int'l Airport],
Att: 12 Exhibit 11 [Flights - Tokyo to San Jose Airport],
Att: 13 Declaration of Sarah Houghton,
Att: 14 Declaration of Jose Martinez,
Att: 15 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
34 34 order Protective Order Fri 04/25 9:33 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER (Motion(s)31 terminated). Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 04/23/2025. (mdj)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
33 33 notice Notice of Compliance Fri 04/18 2:39 PM
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by INGENIOSPEC, LLC REGARDING SERVICE OF INITIAL AND ADDITIONAL DISCLOSURES (Wang, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
32 32 notice Notice of Compliance Thu 04/17 1:06 PM
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by Sony Group Corporation (Notice of Compliance re service of Initial Disclosures and Additional Disclosures) (Caro-Esposito, Daniela)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
31 31 motion Protective Order Wed 04/16 4:10 PM
JOINT MOTION for Protective Order by Sony Group Corporation, Sony Interactive Entertainment, Inc..(Caro-Esposito, Daniela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order
30 30 7 pgs order Order Wed 04/16 12:06 PM
FIRST AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER (Motion(s)25 terminated). Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 04/15/2025. (KLC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
29 29 12 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 04/15 3:38 PM
DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 04/15/2025. (KLC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
28 28 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/09 6:04 PM
JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DISCOVERY ORDER by INGENIOSPEC, LLC.(Kolko, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Discovery Order
27 27 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/09 3:40 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by James A Vezeris on behalf of Sony Group Corporation, Sony Interactive Entertainment, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-10773940. (Vezeris, James)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/09 2:43 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Orville R Cockings on behalf of Sony Group Corporation, Sony Interactive Entertainment, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-10773607. (Cockings, Orville)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Amend/Correct Wed 04/09 12:55 PM
JOINT MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Sony Group Corporation, Sony Interactive Entertainment, Inc..(Gewirtz, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (Proposed First Amended Docket Control Order)
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
24 24 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/08 2:51 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Daniela Caro-Esposito on behalf of Sony Group Corporation, Sony Interactive Entertainment, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-10771179. (Caro-Esposito, Daniela)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
22 22 order Scheduling Order/Docket Control Order Thu 03/27 1:20 PM
DOCKET CONTROL ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 7/27/2026 at 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Jury Selection set for 8/31/2026 at 09:00AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Markman Hearing set for 2/19/2026 at 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 03/27/2025. (KLC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
23 23 minutes Scheduling Conference/Case Management Conference Thu 03/27 4:21 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference/Case Management Conference held on 3/26/2025 from 09:33 AM - 10:36 AM. Counsel for the parties appeared. Court asked whether the parties consented to trial before the U.S. Magistrate Judge and proceeded to provide counsel with Claim Construction and Jury Selection/Trial dates. (Court Reporter - Shawn McRoberts) (Text entry only; no document attached) (aeb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
21 21 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Wed 03/12 12:18 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Sony Group Corporation, Sony Interactive Entertainment, Inc. (Dacus, Deron)
Related: [-]
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 03/12 12:17 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Sony Group Corporation, Sony Interactive Entertainment, Inc..(Dacus, Deron)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Wed 03/12 1:47 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (NKL)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
19 19 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 03/10 1:55 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Sony Group Corporation, Sony Interactive Entertainment, Inc. (Dacus, Deron)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 02/25 9:58 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Phillip Love on behalf of INGENIOSPEC, LLC (Love, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
17 17 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Mon 02/24 8:16 AM
ORDER - Scheduling/Case Management Conference set for 3/26/2025 at 09:30 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/21/2025. (NKL)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 01/31 12:39 PM
ORDER granting15 CORRECTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint. Sony Group Corporation answer due 3/12/2025. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/31/2025. (NKL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 01/30 1:09 PM
CORRECTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, (CORRECTED UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer) by Sony Group Corporation.(Gewirtz, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 01/30 12:20 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Sony Group Corporation.(Gewirtz, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
13 13 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 01/30 12:17 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory S Gewirtz on behalf of Sony Group Corporation, Sony Interactive Entertainment, Inc. (Gewirtz, Gregory)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Deficiency Thu 01/30 1:08 PM
Clerk's LR CV-10(d) Notice of Deficiency as to 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer - LR CV-7(i) or LR CR-47(a)(3) requires this document to include a certificate of conference that complies with the rule. Recommended cure: Within one day, Filer must refile with the word Corrected in the title of the document. The filer should use the same ECF event and when offered the docket text enhancement dropdown, select CORRECTED so it will also appear in the docket text. (NKL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
12 12 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 01/09 2:17 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by INGENIOSPEC, LLC. (Fenster, Marc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 12/24 1:22 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by INGENIOSPEC, LLC. Sony Interactive Entertainment, Inc. served on 12/17/2024. (Fenster, Marc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 12/12 9:26 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by INGENIOSPEC, LLC. Sony Group Corporation waiver sent on 11/4/2024, answer due 2/10/2025. (Fenster, Marc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 12/11 2:51 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by INGENIOSPEC, LLC. Sony Group Corporation waiver sent on 12/11/2024, answer due 2/10/2025. (Fenster, Marc)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 11/08 2:21 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shani M Tutt on behalf of INGENIOSPEC, LLC (Tutt, Shani) (Main Document 8 replaced with flattened image on 11/8/2024) (slo)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 11/08 2:15 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew D. Aichele on behalf of INGENIOSPEC, LLC (Aichele, Matthew) (Main Document 7 replaced with flattened image on 11/8/2024) (slo)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 11/08 2:04 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Benjamin Kolko on behalf of INGENIOSPEC, LLC (Kolko, Daniel) (Main Document 6 replaced with flattened image on 11/8/2024) (slo)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 11/08 2:01 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin T Wang on behalf of INGENIOSPEC, LLC (Wang, Benjamin) (Main Document 5 replaced with flattened image on 11/8/2024) (slo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 10/08 10:23 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to Sony Group Corporation, Sony Interactive Entertainment, Inc..(NKL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Additional Attachment(s)
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 10/08 9:17 AM
Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (NKL)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Tue 10/08 9:17 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (NKL)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
3 3 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Mon 10/07 6:59 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fenster, Marc)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Mon 10/07 6:57 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement identifying party citizenship filed by INGENIOSPEC, LLC (Fenster, Marc)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 10/07 6:54 PM
COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10406812.), filed by INGENIOSPEC, LLC.(Fenster, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 7 pgs Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 27 pgs Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet